Green v. Scripps Corporate Headquarters/Scripps Center
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Defendant: Scripps Corporate Headquarters/Scripps Center
Case Number: 1:2022cv00009
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 Mail sent to Courtney Green as to re #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Complaint filed by Courtney Green, Mail Returned as Undeliverable.. (bjc)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Complaint filed by Courtney Green. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED with PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim for relief. Objections to R&R due by 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/20/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Scripps Corporate Headquarters/Scripps Center, filed by Courtney Green. (km)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/20/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Marshal Forms) by Plaintiff Courtney Green. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope) (kh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Scripps Corporate Headquarters/Scripps Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scripps Corporate Headquarters/Scripps Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?