Hart v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Petitioner: Anthony L Hart
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2022cv00023
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 A $5.00 check was received by the Clerk's Office in Cincinnati this date, it has been mailed to the Cleveland Office in the Northern District of Ohio. (bjc)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - It is ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/31/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 31, 2022 Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (km)
January 31, 2022 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:22-cv-00162, filed 01/31/2022. (er)
January 13, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony L Hart. (kl)
January 13, 2022 Clerk's office received payment in the amount of $8.00. Check was returned to filer with a letter directing petitioner to remit $5, the exact amount, when paying filing fee. (kl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony L Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?