Hairston v. Sparks et al
Plaintiff: Rico Isaih Hairston
Defendant: Sparks, Theodore Jackson, Crawford, Warden Robert Bowen, Frelon Sparks, Ron Erdos, K. Hupka, Denney, Nolan, Oppy and Virgina
Case Number: 1:2022cv00104
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction to the extent that the Court DIRECTS the SOCF Warden or the Wardens representative to immediately place plaintiff in protective custody. The Court DENIES #15 Motion for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction. It is ordered that the USMS serve a copy of this Order on the SOCF Warden or the Warden's representative. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/7/2022. (wam)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction before April 10, 2022 by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (eh)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT filed by Rico Isaih Hairston against Denney, Ron Erdos, K. Hupka, Nolan, Oppy, Sparks, Virgina. (Attachments: #1 Summons and USM-285 Forms) (eh) Modified docket text on 4/6/2022 (eh).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Pursuant to doc. #12 , copies of the #1 Complaint, #11 Summons, #7 Motion for TRO, and #12 Order forwarded this date to the US Marshal with USM-285 forms for service. (eh)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING BY CLERK - Certified mail service has been done by the Clerk, U.S. District Court on April 1, 2022. A copy of the Complaint, Motion for TRO and Prelim Injunction and Order were sent to the following locations by certified mail and regular mail. State of Ohio, Attorney General Criminal Justice Section 150 E. Gay St., 16th Floor Corrections Litigation Unit Columbus, OH 43215 (Article Number 7018 1130 0000 7646 3728); and to the Office of the Ohio Attorney 30 East Broad Street 23rd Floor Columbus, OH 43215 (Article Number 7018 1130 0000 7646 3735) (pb)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER It is ORDERED that the United States Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons, plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and/or temporary restraining order, ant this Order upon defendant Sparks as directed by Plaintiff. Defendant is ORDERED to file a response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and/or temporary restraining order within seven (7) days of service thereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 4/1/22. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Sparks. (pb)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND ORDERING THECOLLECTION OF THE FULL FILING FEE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the institutional cashier at SOUTHERN OHIO CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, P.O. Box 45699, Lucasville, OH 45699. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 4/1/22. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE TO #3 DEFICIENCY ORDER by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A-C) (eh)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (eh)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION and Request for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction with Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A-C) (eh)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (eh)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Docs. #2 & #3 re-sent this date to plaintiff at SOCF with corrected prisoner number. (eh) Modified on 3/28/2022 (eh).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Rico Isaih Hairston - Released 01/23/2018. Order of Transfer re: 2:22-cv-579 (would not let me file this in the other case given transferred out of district) (jmb)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Rico Isaih Hairston re #3 Deficiency Order. (jmb)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER - re #1 Complaint filed by Rico Isaih Hairston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 3/1/2022. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Deficiency Deadline by 4/1/2022.
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of USDC Northern District of Ohio at Youngstown.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (pb)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Case transferred in from Eastern Division at Columbus Division on 2/25/22 Case Number 2:22-cv-579. Case assigned to Judge Susan J. Dlott., filed by Rico Isaih Hairston. (pb)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Jackson, Crawford, and Bowen be severed from this case and transferred to the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, for all future proceedings on those claims. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), 1406(a). 2. The remainder of Plaintiffs Complaint, consisting solely of his claim against Defendant Sparks, be transferred to the Western Division of this Court in Cincinnati for all future proceedings in that case. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), 1406(a); S.D. Ohio Civ. Rule. 82.1(b). Upon transfer to the Cincinnati Division, the case shall remain with the undersigned Magistrate Judge with a resident District Court Judge of the Cincinnati Division to be assigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 2/23/22. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Bowen, Crawford, Theodore Jackson, and Sparks, filed by Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hairston v. Sparks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rico Isaih Hairston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Robert Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frelon Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Erdos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Hupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?