Henley v. B.G.R., Inc.
Plaintiff: Donnie Henley
Defendant: B.G.R., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00198
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Judge Timothy S. Black no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/1/22. (jcw)
May 25, 2022 Set Deadlines: B.G.R., Inc. answer due 6/10/2022. (eh)
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Smith, Joshua)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #6 Waiver of Service Executed, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #6 Waiver of Service Executed as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 5/23/2022. (kh)
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant B.G.R., Inc.. (Smith, Joshua)
May 20, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Smith, Joshua)
May 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Saba for Defendant B.G.R., Inc. (Saba, Peter)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Michael Smith for Defendant B.G.R., Inc. (Smith, Joshua)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to B.G.R., Inc. (kh)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Gedling, Adam)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against B.G.R., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8816131), filed by Donnie Henley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Henley Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coffman, Matthew)
April 11, 2022 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henley v. B.G.R., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Henley
Represented By: Adam C. Gedling
Represented By: Kelsie N Hendren
Represented By: Matthew J.P. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.G.R., Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Michael Smith
Represented By: Peter A Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?