Gammarino, Trustee et al v. Sycamore Township et al
Plaintiff: Al Gammarino, Trustee, Al Gammarino, Cathy Gammarino and Anthony Gammarino
Defendant: Sycamore Township, Tom James, Jim Labarbara, Tom Wieman, Skylor Miller, Kevin Clark, Robert Porter, Ray Warrick, John Doe, Towing Companies 1-20, John Doe, 21 - 40, Tom Wiedman and Robert C. Porter
Case Number: 1:2022cv00200
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The above-captioned matter is hereby TRANSFERRED from the docket of TheHonorable Susan J. Dlott to the Clerk of this Court for reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 04/26/2022. (bjc)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Kevin Clark, Tom James, Jim Labarbara, Skylor Miller, Robert C. Porter, Sycamore Township, Ray Warrick, Tom Wiedman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Letter of March 15, 2018, #2 Exhibit B Letter of December 8, 2020, #3 Exhibit C Letter of January 14, 2021, #4 Exhibit D Declaration of February 16, 2021, #5 Exhibit E Letter of March 23, 2021, #6 Exhibit F Notice of July 6, 2021, #7 Exhibit G Declaration of August 3, 2021, #8 Exhibit H Letter of August 5, 2021, #9 Exhibit I Notice posted on August 16, 2021, #10 Exhibit J Resolution of October 19, 2021, #11 Exhibit K Posting of Notice of Resolution, #12 Exhibit L Letter of December 8, 2021, #13 Exhibit M Resolution of January 19, 2021, #14 Exhibit N Posting of Notice on March 12, 2021, #15 Exhibit O Letter of May 12, 2021, #16 Exhibit P Letter of July 6, 2021, #17 Exhibit Q Resolution of August 3, 2021, #18 Exhibit R Letter of August 5, 2021, #19 Exhibit S Posting of Notice of August 3, 2021 Resolution, #20 Exhibit T Resolution of October 19, 2021, #21 Exhibit U Posting of Notice of October 19, 2021 Resolution, #22 Exhibit V Letter of November 30, 2020, #23 Exhibit W Resolution of February 2, 2021, #24 Exhibit X Letter of February 17, 2021, #25 Exhibit Y Posting of Notice of February 2, 2021 Resolution, #26 Exhibit Z Resolution of October 19, 2021) (Wagner, Jared)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 3/17/2022 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2200960) by Cathy Gammarino, Al Gammarino, Anthony Gammarino, Al Gammarino, Trustee against Kevin Clark, John Doe, 21 - 40, John Doe, Towing Companies 1-20, Tom James, Jim Labarbara, Skylor Miller, Robert Porter, Sycamore Township, Ray Warrick, Tom Wieman. (eh)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, case number A 2200960 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8818236), filed by Tom James, Robert Porter, Jim Labarbara, Skylor Miller, Ray Warrick, Tom Wieman, Kevin Clark, Sycamore Township. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B Supplemental Civil Coversheet, #3 Exhibit C Complaint, #4 Exhibit D State Court Docket) (Wagner, Jared)
April 12, 2022 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gammarino, Trustee et al v. Sycamore Township et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Gammarino, Trustee
Represented By: Robert Gregory Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Gammarino
Represented By: Robert Gregory Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Gammarino
Represented By: Robert Gregory Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gammarino
Represented By: Robert Gregory Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sycamore Township
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom James
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Labarbara
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wieman
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylor Miller
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Clark
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Porter
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Warrick
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, Towing Companies 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 21 - 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wiedman
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Porter
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Jared A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?