Decastro v. Wagner et al
Defendant: Pam Wagner, Brad Spoljaric, Chance Blankenship, Evan McKnight, officer Fouch, Major Chapman, Jane Doe, City of Ironton and Lawrence County
Petitioner: Jose Maria Decastro
Case Number: 1:2022cv00204
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Fouch, Evan McKnight, Brad Spoljaric, Pam Wagner. (Frick, Dawn)
May 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M Frick for Defendants Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Fouch, Evan McKnight, Brad Spoljaric, Pam Wagner (Frick, Dawn)
May 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Joshua Reeb for Defendants Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Fouch, Evan McKnight, Brad Spoljaric, Pam Wagner (Reeb, Benjamin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Charles Turner for Defendants Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Fouch, Evan McKnight, Brad Spoljaric, Pam Wagner (Turner, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Chapman, Jane Doe, Lawrence County. (Sark, Cassaundra)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassaundra L. Sark for Defendants Chapman, Jane Doe, Lawrence County (Sark, Cassaundra)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Lee Lambert for Defendants Chapman, Jane Doe, Lawrence County (Lambert, Randall)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe, Officer Fouch, Evan McKnight, Brad Spoljaric. (eh)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chance Blankenship, "Major" Chapman, City of Ironton with Proof of Service page for Major Chapman, Jonathan Spoljaric, Pam Wagner, Lawrence County. (kl) Modified filed date, Main Document replaced to remove Summons issued on separate case. Modified text as to whom Summons Issued on 4/14/2022 (kl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2022: #1 Summons - Lawrence County) (eh).
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received: $ 402.00, receipt number 100CIN044116. (kl) Modified filed date on 4/14/2022 (kl).
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Jose Maria Decastro- USB Drive Exhibit re #1 Complaint submitted to the Clerk's Office and forwarded to the chambers of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kl) Modified filed date on 4/14/2022 (kl).
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Chance Blankenship, Chapman, City of Ironton, Jane Doe, Fouch, Lawrence County, Evan McKnight, Brad Spoljaric, Pam Wagner, filed by Jose Maria Decastro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kl) Modified filed date on 4/14/2022 (kl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decastro v. Wagner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Maria Decastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Wagner
Represented By: Dawn M Frick
Represented By: Benjamin Joshua Reeb
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Spoljaric
Represented By: Dawn M Frick
Represented By: Benjamin Joshua Reeb
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chance Blankenship
Represented By: Dawn M Frick
Represented By: Benjamin Joshua Reeb
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan McKnight
Represented By: Dawn M Frick
Represented By: Benjamin Joshua Reeb
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: officer Fouch
Represented By: Dawn M Frick
Represented By: Benjamin Joshua Reeb
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Chapman
Represented By: Randall Lee Lambert
Represented By: Cassaundra L. Sark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Randall Lee Lambert
Represented By: Cassaundra L. Sark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ironton
Represented By: Dawn M Frick
Represented By: Benjamin Joshua Reeb
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence County
Represented By: Randall Lee Lambert
Represented By: Cassaundra L. Sark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?