Stryker Corporation et al. v. Ferno-Washington, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales LLC, Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales, LLC
Defendant: Ferno-Washington, Inc. and Ferno Group, Inc., Ferno-Washington, Inc. doing business as Ferno and Ferno Group, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Ferno-Washington, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00588
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - US11458050, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - US10568787, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Operations Manual, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Stryker Booklet, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Stryker Maintenance Manual) (Overmann, Jaci)
December 5, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaci L. Overmann for Defendants Ferno Group, Inc., Ferno-Washington, Inc. (Overmann, Jaci)
November 9, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer to Amended Complaint due 12/5/2022. (kkz)
November 8, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Defendants Ferno Group, Inc., Ferno-Washington, Inc.. (Overmann, Jaci)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #17 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 11/7/2022. (kkz)
November 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9112740) of Michael Tomsa of Certificate of Good Standing (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Tomsa as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for efiling through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/4/2022. (kh)
November 1, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Ferno Group, Inc., Ferno-Washington, Inc., filed by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US7398571, #2 Exhibit B - USRE44884, #3 Exhibit C - US7725968, #4 Exhibit D - US8056950, #5 Exhibit E - US10058464, #6 Exhibit F - USD794205, #7 Exhibit G - USD833623, #8 Exhibit H - USD875950, #9 Exhibit I1 - X1 Cot, #10 Exhibit I2 - X1 Cot, #11 Exhibit J1 - INX Cot, #12 Exhibit J2 - iNX Integrated Patient Transport & Loading System, #13 Exhibit J3 - iNX Manual, #14 Exhibit K1 - F1 Fastener, #15 Exhibit K2 - Fastener Manual, #16 Exhibit L - POWER X1 & PRO F1 Cross Compatibility, #17 Exhibit M - US11090207) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
November 1, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, New date requested 12/5/2022. by Defendants Ferno Group, Inc., Ferno-Washington, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Overmann, Jaci)
October 31, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ferno-Washington, Inc.. (Overmann, Jaci)
October 31, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ferno Group, Inc.. (Overmann, Jaci)
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaci L. Overmann for Defendants Ferno Group, Inc., Ferno-Washington, Inc. (Overmann, Jaci)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Surrette as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for efilingthrough PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/31/2022. (eh)
October 31, 2022 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
October 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 27, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9112740) of Michael Tomsa filed by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC. Deficiency Deadline by 11/10/2022. (bjc). Modified to Correct Document and Docket Text to Remove Doc. 11 From Notice on 10/27/2022 (bjc).
October 27, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9113126) of Deborah A. Laughton by Plaintiffs Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9113089) of Robert A. Surrette by Plaintiffs Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Deborah A. Laughton as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/27/2022. (srb)
October 26, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9112740) of Michael Tomsa by Plaintiffs Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 21, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ferno-Washington, Inc.. Ferno-Washington, Inc. served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 21, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ferno Group, Inc.. Ferno Group, Inc. served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ferno-Washington, Inc. and Ferno Group, Inc. (srb)
October 12, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 12, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Stryker Sales, LLC, Stryker Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Stryker Sales, LLC.. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Stryker Corporation. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ferno-Washington, Inc. and Ferno Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9086315), filed by Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - US7398571, #3 Exhibit B - USRE44884, #4 Exhibit C - US7725968, #5 Exhibit D - US8056950, #6 Exhibit E - US10058464, #7 Exhibit F - USD794205, #8 Exhibit G - USD833623, #9 Exhibit H - USD875950, #10 Exhibit I1 - X1 Cot, #11 Exhibit I2 - X1 Cot, #12 Exhibit J1 - INX Cot, #13 Exhibit J2 - iNX Integrated Patient Transport Loading System, #14 Exhibit J3 - iNX Manual, #15 Exhibit K1 - F1 Fastener, #16 Exhibit K2 - Fastener Manual, #17 Exhibit L - POWER X1 PRO F1 Cross Compatibility) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stryker Corporation et al. v. Ferno-Washington, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales LLC
Represented By: Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk
Represented By: Deborah Ann Laughton
Represented By: Michael Tomsa
Represented By: Robert A. Surrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stryker Sales, LLC
Represented By: Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk
Represented By: Deborah Ann Laughton
Represented By: Michael Tomsa
Represented By: Robert A. Surrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferno-Washington, Inc. and Ferno Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferno-Washington, Inc. doing business as Ferno
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Represented By: Jaci L. Overmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferno Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Represented By: Jaci L. Overmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ferno-Washington, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Represented By: Jaci L. Overmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?