Corbett et al v. MLINK Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karl Corbett and Brenda Corbett
Defendant: MLINK Technologies, Inc., Daniel Sweet, Jeremy Davis and Wes Parker
Case Number: 1:2022cv00628
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffery P Hopkins
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Jeremy Davis, Wes Parker, Daniel Sweet. (bjc)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Jeremy Davis (Burch, Christopher)
December 27, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Wes Parker (Burch, Christopher)
December 27, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Daniel Sweet (Burch, Christopher)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins for all further proceedings. Judge Matthew W. McFarland no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/21/22. (jcw)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Graycen Marie Wood for Plaintiffs Brenda Corbett, Karl Corbett (Wood, Graycen)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam by Plaintiffs Brenda Corbett, Karl Corbett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Burch, Christopher)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COGNOVIT JUDGMENT ENTRY: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiffs against the Defendant MLink Technologies Inc., as follows:1. On Count Three of the Complaint, a cognovit judgment on the Note against MLink Technologies Inc. in the amount, as of September 30, 2022, of $1,015,786.00 together with interest thereafter on the principal balance, at the default rate as specified therein, being ten percent, per year. 2. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), the Court finds there is no just reason for delay in awarding Plaintiffs judgment as to Count Three of the Complaint only.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/17/2022. (kaf)
November 1, 2022 Filing 4 Answer Confessing Judgment as to Count Three Only ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by MLINK Technologies, Inc.. (Fox, Justin)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Brenda Corbett, Karl Corbett Proposed Cognovit Judgment Entry (Burch, Christopher)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Brenda Corbett, Karl Corbett re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Burch, Christopher)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF with JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9120952), filed by Karl Corbett, Brenda Corbett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Stock Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit C-Declaration of Karl Corbett) (Burch, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbett et al v. MLINK Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Corbett
Represented By: Christopher B Burch
Represented By: John F Marsh
Represented By: Graycen Marie Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Corbett
Represented By: Christopher B Burch
Represented By: Graycen Marie Wood
Represented By: John F Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLINK Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?