Gurton v. McGrath et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Gurton
Defendant: Cian McGrath and City Of Cincinnati
Case Number: 1:2023cv00065
Filed: February 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2023 Filing 6 City Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Paul, Shuva)
February 16, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extension for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Defendants City Of Cincinnati, Cian McGrath. (Tidd, Kevin)
February 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by City Of Cincinnati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Tidd, Kevin)
February 6, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #1 Notice of Removal filed by City Of Cincinnati., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #1 Notice of Removal filed by City Of Cincinnati. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/7/2023. (bjc)
February 6, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against City Of Cincinnati, Cian McGrath, filed by Nathaniel Gurton in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas Case A2300319 on 01/23/2023. (bjc)
February 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by City Of Cincinnati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Tidd, Kevin)
February 6, 2023 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
February 3, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AOHSDC-9255092 (eh) Modified to correct date on 2/6/2023 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurton v. McGrath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Gurton
Represented By: Jerome Robert Linneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cian McGrath
Represented By: Shuva J. Paul
Represented By: Kevin Tidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Cincinnati
Represented By: Shuva J. Paul
Represented By: Kevin Tidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?