Taper v. Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Joshua Taper
Respondent: Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2024cv00184
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Matthew W McFarland
3 Judge: Michael R Merz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Filing 24 Motion/OH. Const. Art. XV 7 ORC AWN 3.23 Certificate of Assignment/Certificate of Oath of Office by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (eh) Modified filing date on 5/30/2024 (eh).
May 28, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Remove District Judge from Case by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (zmc)
May 15, 2024 Filing 20 (Main Document #20 was inadvertently filed and has been restricted.) #1 Joseph Deters Summons and USM-285 Forms. (eh) Modified docket text and document security on 5/15/2024 (eh).
May 14, 2024 Filing 21 (Main Document #21 , and Attachments #1 , and 2 were inadvertently filed and have been restricted.) #3 Memorandum in Support of Writ of Habeas Amending Exhibit (eh). Modified filing date on 5/15/2024 (eh).
May 14, 2024 Filing 19 Fed. R. Civ. 60(B)(4)(1) Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (eh) Modified filing date on 5/15/2024 (eh).
May 14, 2024 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support of Petition EXHIBIT 33 by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (eh) Modified to correct filing date on 5/15/2024 (eh).
May 13, 2024 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support of Writ of Habeas Corpus USCS Sec. 2254 Case R.4 amending affidavit of fact rule 60 (B)(4)(1) by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (eh)
May 8, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend Exhibits by Plaintiff Joshua Taper. (zmc)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:23-cv-806 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/08/2024. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 7, 2024 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (kev) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2024: #1 Main Document Corrected) (kev). Modified text and security on 5/8/2024. Original document missing page. Re-filed to show full document (kev).
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (kev) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2024: #1 Main Document Corrected) (kev). Modified text and security on 5/8/2024. Original document had page cut off - refiled to show full document (kev).
May 6, 2024 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (bjc)
May 6, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 5/9/2024 (bjc).
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of the Writ of Habeas by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (bjc)
May 3, 2024 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of the Writ of Habeas by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (bjc)
April 29, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of the Petition of the Writ of Habeas by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (eh)
April 29, 2024 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition of the Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (eh)
April 29, 2024 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition of the Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (eh)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 EXHIBITS by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (eh)
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition of the Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (eh)
April 10, 2024 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support of Doc 1-1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Joshua Taper. (er)
April 10, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for the Court to grant release of Petitioner by Joshua Taper. (er)
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Joshua Taper (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition 1, #2 Habeas Petition 2, #3 Habeas Petition 3, #4 Exhibit, #5 IFP Envelope, #6 Habeas Petitions Envelope)(This case has been opened and filed pursuant to the 4/3/2024 Order in 1:23-cv-806) (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taper v. Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Taper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?