Housing Opportunities Made Equal of Greater Cincinnati et al v. Count X LLC et al
Plaintiff: Housing Opportunities Made Equal of Greater Cincinnati, Sophia Smith and DEMEIRAKLE CARTER
Defendant: Count X LLC and M. Aaron Taylor
Case Number: 1:2024cv00308
Filed: June 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Continued Informal Preliminary Conference by telephone re #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 6/24/24. Jacob Davis appeared for Plaintiffs; Alvertis Bishop, Jr. appeared for Defendants. Plaintiffs' counsel advised the Court that the parties are continuing to discuss resolution and withdrew the motion for TRO and preliminary injunction. Defendants' counsel advised the Court that they are going to continue the eviction hearing by one week to allow plaintiffs to vacate the property. (Court Reporter: Sue Lopreato-Official). (sct)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #4 Response in Opposition to Motion, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #4 Response in Opposition to Motion as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 6/21/2024. (kh)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Count X LLC, M. Aaron Taylor. (Bishop, Alvertis)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Informal Preliminary Conference by telephone re #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 6/20/24. Jacob Davis appeared for Plaintiffs; Alvertis Bishop, Jr. appeared for Defendants. The motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction was discussed. Plaintiffs' counsel advised the Court that Ms. Smith has signed a lease for another property and is waiting for an inspection before she could move out of defendants' property, and that if the eviction matter proceeds as scheduled, she could potentially lose her Section 8 voucher. The parties agreed to confer in an attempt to resolve the matter. Continued Informal Preliminary Conference set for 6/24/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: Sue Lopreato) (sct)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Demeirakle Carter, Housing Opportunities Made Equal of Greater Cincinnati, Sophia Smith. (Davis, Charles) Modified docket text on 6/18/2024 (sct).
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Count X LLC, M. Aaron Taylor. (bjc)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Violations of the Fair Housing Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10003340), filed by Housing Opportunities Made Equal of Greater Cincinnati, DEMEIRAKLE CARTER, Sophia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet HOME Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Count X Summons, #3 Summons Form Taylor Summons) (Davis, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Housing Opportunities Made Equal of Greater Cincinnati et al v. Count X LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Housing Opportunities Made Equal of Greater Cincinnati
Represented By: Charles Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Smith
Represented By: Charles Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMEIRAKLE CARTER
Represented By: Charles Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Count X LLC
Represented By: Alvertis Walter Bishop, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Aaron Taylor
Represented By: Alvertis Walter Bishop, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?