Total Quality Logistics, LLC v. Larney et al
Plaintiff: TOTAL QUALITY LOGISTICS, LLC
Defendant: Eve International Logistics, Inc. and Andrew Larney
Case Number: 1:2024cv00340
Filed: June 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Stay Briefing on Defendant Eve International Logistic, Inc. Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Eve International Logistics, Inc.. (Imm, Stephen)
July 18, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand ( Responses due by 8/8/2024), MOTION to Stay Briefing on Defendant Eve International Logistic, Inc. Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Bakota, Matthew)
July 16, 2024 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/6/2024. Please visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of the Court's required Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures. (kkz)
July 12, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION Regarding Amount in Controversy by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Bakota, Matthew)
July 9, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Andrew Larney. (Butler, Brian)
July 9, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Joseph Butler for Defendant Andrew Larney (Butler, Brian)
June 28, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Eve International Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Imm, Stephen)
June 24, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Defendant Eve International Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Imm, Stephen)
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal: The above-referenced civil action has been received and filed in this Court without the required Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. Please correct this deficiency immediately by filing a Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other). (zmc)
June 24, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, originally filed on 6/12/2024 in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2024 CVC 00744) by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (zmc)
June 24, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Eve International Logistics, Inc. and Andrew Larney, originally filed on 6/11/2024 in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2024 CVC 00744) by Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (zmc)
June 24, 2024 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (zmc)
June 21, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) from Clermont County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024 CVC 00744 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10031718), filed by Eve International Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court) (Imm, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Quality Logistics, LLC v. Larney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOTAL QUALITY LOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Bakota
Represented By: Brooke Fallyn Poling
Represented By: Michael B Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve International Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Heimlich
Represented By: Stephen E Imm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Larney
Represented By: Brian Joseph Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?