Ayers v. Hagedorn et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Ayers
Defendant: Brian E Sandoval, Edith Aviles, James Hagedorn, Mark D Kingdon, Peter E Shumlin, Stephen L. Johnson, David C Evans, John Randolph Vines, Katherine Hagedorn Littlefield, Adam Hanft, The Scotts Company and Thomas N. Kelly, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00402
Filed: July 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffery P Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James M. Ficaro as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for efiling through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/13/2024. (kh)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice $200 of James M. Ficaro by Plaintiff Patrick Ayers. (Ficaro, James)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys James M. Ficaro and John J. Gross. (zmc)(This document has been sent via regular mail to the attorneys listed.)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Edith Aviles, David C Evans, James Hagedorn, Adam Hanft, Stephen L. Johnson, Thomas N. Kelly, Jr., Mark D Kingdon, Katherine Hagedorn Littlefield, Brian E Sandoval, Peter E Shumlin, John Randolph Vines ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10089675), filed by Patrick Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement) (Giles, Brian)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayers v. Hagedorn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hagedorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D Kingdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter E Shumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randolph Vines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Hagedorn Littlefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Hanft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Scotts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N. Kelly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ayers
Represented By: Brian T Giles
Represented By: James M. Ficaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?