Elliott v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Petitioner: Matthew E. Elliott
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2024cv00449
Filed: August 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffery P Hopkins
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REPLY DEADLINE - Reply deadline is November 14, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 10/24/2024. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 24, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of Writ re #7 State Court Record by Respondent Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility. (Jaite, Maura)
October 24, 2024 Filing 7 State Court Record Exhibits 1 - 22. (Jaite, Maura)
September 9, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura O'Neill Jaite for Respondent Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility (Jaite, Maura)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR ANSWER; DENIAL OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL - It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall, not later than sixty days from the date of this Order, file an answer conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases. Petitioner may file and serve a reply to the answer not later than twenty-one days after the answer is filed. The Clerk is directed to serve the Petition on Respondent and the Attorney General of Ohio, Habeas Corpus Unit of the Corrections Litigation Section, c/o Brian.Higgins@ohioattorneygeneral.gov and Habeas.docketclerk@ohioattorneygeneral.gov. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 4) is denied. The Congress has not appropriated sufficient funds to allow appointment of counsel in non-capital habeas corpus cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 8/27/2024. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 26, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Matthew E. Elliott. (kpf)
August 26, 2024 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Matthew E. Elliott. (kpf)
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notation ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 8/26/2024. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 26, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Matthew E. Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Petition Under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel) (kh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Represented By: Maura O'Neill Jaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew E. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?