Cross v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Petitioner: Tyree J. Cross
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2024cv00453
Filed: August 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT affirming #4 Order. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendations and dismissing with prejudice Cross's Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court also certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal of this Order would not be made in good faith, thereby denying Cross leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Finally, it denies Cross a certificate of appealability under 28 U.S.C. 2253(c) because no reasonable jurist would find Cross's failure to meet the one-year statute of limitations debatable. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 10/1/24. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 27, 2024 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Magistrate Judge respectfully recommends that the Petition be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, it is also recommended that Petitioner be denied a certificate of appealability and that the Court certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 9/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 8/27/2024. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 26, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency re: Requires a filing fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and completed Civil Cover Sheet. Electronic filers can pay the fee #online. Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee. Related Document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tyree J. Cross. Deficiency Deadline by 9/25/2024. (acw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 26, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tyree J. Cross. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (acw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyree J. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?