Potts et al v. The Medical Protective Company Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Marie Potts
Defendant: The Medical Protective Company Inc.,, Medpro Group, Inc. and Medical Protective Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv00507
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2024 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Rile 12(b)(6) and to Join Indispensable Parties Under Rule 12(b)(7) and Rule 19, With Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants The Medical Protective Company Inc.,, Medpro Group, Inc.. (Porotsky, Richard)
November 1, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Rile 12(b)(6) and to Join Indispensable Parties Under Rule 12(b)(7) and Rule 19, With Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Cheryl Marie Potts, Cheryl Marie Potts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jury Interrogs and Verdict) (Statman, Alan)
October 30, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiffs Cheryl Marie Potts, Cheryl Marie Potts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jury Interrogs and Verdict, #2 Exhibit Hamilotn Co Docket) (Statman, Alan)
October 11, 2024 Filing 8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Rile 12(b)(6) and to Join Indispensable Parties Under Rule 12(b)(7) and Rule 19, With Memorandum in Support by Defendants Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc.,. (Porotsky, Richard)
October 10, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Defendants Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc., Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hamilton County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Trial Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Jury Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - Appellate Brief, #5 Exhibit E - First District Judgment Entry, #6 Exhibit F - First District Judgment Entry (Adams), #7 Exhibit G - CAST Policy, #8 Exhibit H - Durrani Policy, #9 Exhibit I - Dictionary Definition, #10 Exhibit J - Judge Reece Order) (Porotsky, Richard)
October 9, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Cheryl Marie Potts, Cheryl Marie Potts of Filing Affidavit in Support of All Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Alan Statman and Ben Maraan) (Statman, Alan)
October 3, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc.,. Medpro Group, Inc. served on 9/20/2024, answer due 10/11/2024; The Medical Protective Company Inc., served on 9/20/2024, answer due 10/11/2024. (bjc)
September 17, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (kev)
September 17, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc.,. (bjc)
September 17, 2024 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
September 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10168012), filed by Cheryl Marie Potts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form The Medical Protective Company Inc., #3 Summons Form MedPro Group Inc., f/k/a Medical Protective Corporation) (Statman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potts et al v. The Medical Protective Company Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Protective Company Inc.,
Represented By: Richard D Porotsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medpro Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D Porotsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Protective Corporation
Represented By: Richard D Porotsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Marie Potts
Represented By: Alan J. Statman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?