Cunningham v. Beasley
Plaintiff: Carol Yvonne Cunningham
Defendant: Mary Beasley
Case Number: 1:2024cv00606
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (kaf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Doc. #4 ): The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation in its entirety and ORDERS the following: 1. The Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); 2. The Court CERTIFIES pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that an appeal of this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore DENIES Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff remains free to apply to proceed in forma pauperis in the Court of Appeals. See Callihan v. Schneider, 178 F.3d 800,803 (6th Cir. 1999); and 3. This case is TERMINATED from the Court's docket. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 12/18/2024. (kaf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1) The complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). 2) The Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny Ms. Cunningham leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Ms. Cunningham remains free to apply to proceed in forma pauperis in the Court of Appeals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/29/2024. (kev)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 29, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Mary Beasley, filed by Carol Yvonne Cunningham. (kev)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/29/2024. (kev)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carol Yvonne Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons & USM Forms) (kev)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Yvonne Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?