Brown v. Chambers-Smith et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Scott Brown, Jr.
Defendant: Mr. Marinich, Offick Cox, S. Cole, D. Edwards, D. Luneke, E. Collins, Brandon Hayes and Annette Chambers-Smith
Case Number: 1:2024cv00690
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs Statement of Errors (Doc. #8) be SUSTAINED; 2. The Commissioners non-disability finding be vacated; 3. No finding be made as to whether Plaintiff was under a disability within the meaning of the Social Security Act; 4. This matter be REMANDED to the Social Security Administration under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) for further consideration consistent with this Report and Recommendations and any Decision and Entry adopting this Report and Recommendations; and 5. The case be terminated on the Courts docket. re #7 Complaint filed by Jeffery Scott Brown, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/30/25. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 3, 2025 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery Scott Brown, Jr. (sem)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20 WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/3/25. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Plaintiff Jeffery Scott Brown, Jr. (er)
December 18, 2024 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jeffery Scott Brown, Jr. (er)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY- re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Jeffery Scott Brown, Jr. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit, within 30 days of the date of this order, the required trust fund statement from his prison's cashier. Deficiency Deadline by 1/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/4/2024. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 3, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency: The Court's docket reflects the initiation of the above referenced civil action. The initiating material contains the following deficiency(ies):Cover Sheet, Summons Forms, and USM-285 Forms Missing. The materials do not include the required civil cover sheet (provided) as well as USM-285 Forms and Summons Forms for each defendant. Related Document: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffery Scott Brown, Jr.. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Chambers-Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Marinich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offick Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Luneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Chambers-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Scott Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?