Franklin v. Glenwood Behavior Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Queen Charlotte Franklin
Defendant: Glenwood Behavior Hospital, Summit Behavior Hospital, Blue Ridge Vista Hospital, Beckett Springs Hospital and U.C. Ridgeway Tower
Case Number: 1:2025cv00044
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2025 Filing 18 I wish to file Objection by Plaintiff Charlotte Franklin. (eh)
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Magistrate Judge's R&R is ADOPTED in full, and the #12 Franklin's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED. Franklin is again FORMALLY WARNED that frivolous filings before the Court may result in her being declared a vexatious litigant subject to prefiling restrictions or sanctions. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/24/2025. (kkz)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 18, 2025 Filing 16 Asking to Appeal by Plaintiff Charlotte Franklin. (eh)
March 13, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Judd R Uhl for Defendant Beckett Springs Hospital (Uhl, Judd)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (doc. #12 ) be DENIED. Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(4), Defendant may file, within 30 days after service of the District Court's Order adopting this Report and Recommendation, a motion with the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals for leave to proceed as a pauper on appeal. Defendant's motion must include a copy of the affidavit filed in the District Court and this Court's statement as to the reasons for denying pauper status on appeal. Defendant is notified that if she does not file a motion within 30 days of receiving notice of the District Court's decision as required by Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5) or fails to pay the required filing fee of $455.00 within this same time period, the appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Once dismissed for want of prosecution, the appeal will not be reinstated, even if the filing fee or motion for pauper status is subsequently tendered, unless Defendant can demonstrate that she did not receive notice of the District Court's decision within the time period prescribed for by Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). Objections to R&R due by 3/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/6/2025. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 5, 2025 Filing 14 USCA Case Number 25-3134 for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Charlotte Franklin, Case Manager, Gretchen Abruzzo (513-564-7018). (kh)
March 3, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charlotte Franklin. (kev)
March 3, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #9 Clerk's Judgment, #8 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations (FILING FEE DUE) by Plaintiff Charlotte Franklin. (kev)
March 3, 2025 Filing 10 [PLEASE DISREGARD. This document was inadvertently filed and has been restricted]. Request to Appeal by Plaintiff Charlotte Franklin. (kev) Modified text and security on 3/5/2025 (kev).
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT pursuant to #8 Order signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/13/2025. (kkz)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - the Court OVERRULES #6 Franklin's objection, and ACCEPTS and ADOPTS #4 the Magistrate Judges R&R in full. Furthermore, in consideration of Franklin's record of litigation and the Magistrate Judge's memorandum order in Franklin v. J.C. Battle Funeral Home, No., 1:25-cv-52, Doc. #7 , Franklin is FORMALLY WARNED that further frivolous filings may result in her being declared a vexatious litigant subject to prefiling restrictions or sanctions. Finally, the Court CERTIFIES that an appeal of this order would not be taken in good faith and DENIES leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/13/2025. (kkz)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATIONAL COPY OF ORDER issued 2/12/2025 in case Queen Charlotte Franklin v. J.C. Battle Funeral Home, et al., 1:25-cv-00052 (doc. 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/12/2025. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 11, 2025 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Charlotte Franklin. (kev)
February 10, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey William Van Wagner for Defendant Blue Ridge Vista Hospital (Van Wagner, Jeffrey)
February 5, 2025 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Complaint filed by Charlotte Franklin. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT all claims contained in Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/5/2025. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 5, 2025 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Charlotte Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (km)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER conditionally granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with the complaint to be filed. If the pending Report and Recommendation is rejected and this case is not dismissed, the Court reserves the right to require Plaintiff to supply additional information in support of her application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall inform the Court promptly of any changes in his address which may occur during the pendency of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/5/2025. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charlotte Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons and USM-285 Forms) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Glenwood Behavior Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen Charlotte Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenwood Behavior Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Behavior Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Vista Hospital
Represented By: Jeffrey William Van Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beckett Springs Hospital
Represented By: Judd R Uhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.C. Ridgeway Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?