Orr v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Darllel Orr
Defendant: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility, Warden, Trumbell Correctional Institution and Mr Aderholt
Case Number: 1:2025cv00047
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Referring Judge: Caroline H Gentry
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Court therefore DENIES Plaintiff's Motion at this time, without prejudice. (Doc. No. #3 .) Plaintiff may re-file his motion if he experiences or continues to experience delays with his mail from this Court. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send Plaintiff a print-out of the case docket and another copy of the mail order (Doc. No. #2 ) for his records. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 3/13/2025. (Doc. #2 and docket sheet)(acw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 21, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Certified Service of Process At Place of Confinement by Plaintiff Darllel Orr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (acw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2025: #2 Corrected Envelope) (acw).
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER CONCERNING MAIL FROM THIS COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 2/11/2025. (acw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification, the Ohio Attorney General's Office, and the Mailroom Supervisor at Southeast Correctional Facility.)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Darllel Orr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Summons Form, #6 USM 285 Form) (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darllel Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Trumbell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Aderholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?