Miller, et al v. Wilkinson, et al
Case Number: 2:1998cv00275
Filed: March 12, 1998
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 533 JUDGMENT is entered pursuant to the Opinion and Order filed 09/30/2010. This case is closed. (dh)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting 486 the parties' Joint Motion to Approve Stipulation for Injunctive Relief and approves the Stipulation for Injunctive Relief. The Court retains jurisdiction for the purpose of resolving any disputes that may arise. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 04/19/2010. (dh)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER granting 503 Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to allow Legal Intern Drew Laframboise to present argument on behalf of Plaintiffs at the fairness hearing set for 04/19/2010. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 04/14/2010. (dh)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER denying all pending motions for a trial date or to have the Court reject the proposed settlement 426 , 427 , 429 , 430 , 433 , 436 , 437 , 442 , 450 ; denying the motion to intervene 421 , but granting 434 the motion to direct the C lerk to mail a copy of the Court's ruling on that motion to the proposed intervenors; denying as moot the motions for a copy of the docket sheet and to compel discovery 428 , 432 ; and denying the motion to refer a matter for criminal prosecution 441 . Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 09/23/09. (dh)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting 402 Darryl Blankenship's Motion to Intervene and staying Mr. Blankenship's individual claims pending the results of settlement negotiations on that aspect of the class claims. Mr. Blankenship's motion for discovery on his work day claims 414 is denied as moot and without prejudice to its renewal should the stay of his claim be lifted. Mr. Blankenship's motion for a docket sheet 415 is denied based on class counsel's representation that counsel would provide a copy of the docket sheet to him. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/31/09. (dh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller, et al v. Wilkinson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?