Pharos Capital v. Deloitte & Touche, et al
Plaintiff: Pharos Capital Partners LP
Defendant: Eric R Wilkinson, Deloitte & Touche, Harold W Pote, Credit Suisse First Boston Corp, The Shattan Group LLC and Purcell & Scott Co LPA
Case Number: 2:2003cv00362
Filed: April 23, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R Abel
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2013 Filing 262 MANDATE of USCA as to #260 Notice of Appeal: The Sixth Circuit AFFIRMS the decision of the District Court. No costs taxed. (er1)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER of USCA as to #260 Notice of Appeal: The Sixth Circuit AFFIRMS the decision of the District Court. (er1)
November 21, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-4381 for #260 Notice of Appeal filed by Pharos Capital Partners LP- case manager Benjamin Alexander. (er1)
November 16, 2012 Filing 260 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #259 Judgment, #258 Order by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0648-3876324. (Murray, Joseph)
October 29, 2012 Filing 259 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (ds)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting Credit Suisse's motion for summary judgment in the Pharos action. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 10/26/2012. (jlg6)
March 7, 2012 Filing 257 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. [The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Request for Entry of Suggestion to Remand] Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
December 22, 2011 Filing 256 NOTICE by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P.'s Joinder in the Noteholder Plaintiffs' Notices Regarding The Martin Act Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
December 21, 2011 Filing 255 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re (1510 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Summary Judgment Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and Credit Suisse, New York Branch's Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment in the Noteholder Actions Notice of Issuance of Binding Decision filed by Plaintiff Chandler City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 15, 2011 Filing 254 RESPONSE to Motion re (1833 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Unseal Document [The Arizona Noteholders' and the Uat's Response to Lance Poulsen's Motion to Unseal Settlement Agreements ] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
August 22, 2011 Filing 253 NOTICE by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, LP's Joinder in Responses to Credit Suisse's Suggestion of Supplemental Authority Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
August 19, 2011 Filing 252 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (1829 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), [The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Credit Suisse's August 15, 2011 Suggestion of Supplemental Authority] Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 23, 2011 Filing 251 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. [The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Joinder in Response to Defendant Credit Suisse's Suggestion of Supplemental Authority] Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #245 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 12/13/2010. (jlg6)
December 6, 2010 Filing 249 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' December 6, 2010 Suggestion of Supplemental Authority (Assured Guaranty (UK) Ltd. v. J.P. Morgan Investment Mgt. Inc.) Relating to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
December 3, 2010 Filing 248 NOTICE by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP re (1799 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Joinder in MetLife's and Lloyds' Suggestion of Supplemental Authority re Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
November 1, 2010 Filing 247 NOTICE re (1797 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Response (non motion), (246 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA, 1796 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), (1794 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P.'s Joinder in Responses to Credit Suisse's Suggestion of Supplemental Authorities Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
October 28, 2010 Filing 246 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (1794 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) The Arizona Noteholders and Unencumbered Assets Trust's Response to Defendant Credit Suisse's October 8, 2010 and October 25, 2010 Suggestions of Supplemental Authority Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
September 30, 2010 USCA Case Number 10-4194 for (1792 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice of Appeal filed by Amedisys Inc. (er1)
September 16, 2010 Filing 245 MOTION for Joinder in the Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Suggestion of Supplemental Authority relating to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #234 and #241 Motions for Leave to File suggestion of supplemental authority. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 9/15/10. (jlg6)
September 13, 2010 Filing 243 NOTICE of the The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Suggestion of Supplemental Authority Relating to Credit Susse's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Cotner, Jeffry) Modified on 9/14/2010 to clarify text (kk2)
May 20, 2010 Filing 242 RESPONSE in Opposition re (241 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG -MRA) MOTION for Leave to File Suggestion of Supplemental Authorities Relating to Pending Motions For Summary Judgment in the Pharos and Noteholders Actions filed by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG -MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG -MRA (Millimet, Robert)
May 12, 2010 Filing 241 MOTION for Leave to File Suggestion of Supplemental Authorities Relating to Pending Motions For Summary Judgment in the Pharos and Noteholders Actions by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG -MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG -MRA (Smith, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2010 Filing 240 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (1441 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), (84 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 91 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 91 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 192 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA, 1442 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 86 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 83 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 86 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 86 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 93 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 94 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 93 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 83 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA) Brief, (1444 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) (Notice of FIling Under Seal of Certified Transcript of December 17, 2008 Telephone Hearing Before Magistrate Judge Mark Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 4, 2010 Filing 239 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Edward Dickerson Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Dickerson, Brian)
January 29, 2010 Filing 238 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
December 14, 2009 Filing 237 NOTICE by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP of Filing of Memorandum of Law in Response to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony and Reports of Glenn A. Okun Under Seal Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Murray, Joseph)
December 14, 2009 Filing 236 NOTICE by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP of Filing of Memorandum of Law In Response to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC's Motion to Strike Evidence Submitted by Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Murray, Joseph)
November 20, 2009 Filing 235 MOTION Second Joint Motion and [Proposed] Order Concerning the Briefing Schedule on Certain Motions Filed by Credit Suisse by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (Smith, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2009 Filing 234 MOTION for leave to file a Suggestion of Supplemental Authority of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Relating to Pending Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/11/2009 (er1).
November 4, 2009 Filing 233 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Documents Produced by JP Morgan Chase and Bank One by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-11, #3 Exhibit 12-13) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
August 31, 2009 Filing 232 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. (Notice of Filing Under Seal) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
August 27, 2009 Filing 231 Response re (1667 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Objection (non motion), Objection (non motion) The Arizona Plaintiffs' Response to Credit Suisse's Objection to The Magistrate Judge's July 16, 2009 Order by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
August 14, 2009 Filing 230 MOTION to Strike [The Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike New Arguments and Evidence Included for the First Time in Credit Suisse's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion to File Surreply] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Cotner, Jeffry)
August 7, 2009 Filing 229 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Filing Under Seal the Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission of Exhibit 136A and Corrected Exhibit 300 to the Arizona Noteholders' Statement of Facts and Supporting Evidence Regarding Credit Suisse's Knowledge and Participation in the NCFE Fraud (Doc. No. 1583) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
July 24, 2009 Filing 228 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Not deliverable as addressed. Mail (doc 1642 ) sent to Acci/Allcare of Pennsylvanie, nia on 7/16/2008. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (kjm1)
July 24, 2009 Filing 227 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Insufficient Address. Mail (doc 1642 ) sent to William K Davis on 7/17/09. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (kjm1)
July 17, 2009 Filing 226 NOTICE by Plaintiff Chandler City of Notice of Filing Under Seal Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 29, 2009 Filing 225 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP re (1547 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Summary Judgment With Respect To The Second Amended Complaint Of Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. Notice of Filing of Memorandum of Law in Response to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
June 29, 2009 Reset Deadlines as to (1547 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Summary Judgment With Respect To The Second Amended Complaint Of Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. response due by 6/29/2009 Credit Suisse' reply due by 9/28/2009. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (pes1)
June 24, 2009 Filing 224 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Concerning Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule in the Pharos Litigation by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Murray, Joseph) Modified on 6/25/2009 to correct filing event. (pes1).
June 17, 2009 Filing 223 Mail Returned as Undeliverable.Mailed to Acci/Allcare of Pennsylvanie. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (rew )
June 16, 2009 Filing 222 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Houlihan Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (rew )
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting the Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' 1607 Motion to Take Deposition from Lance Poulsen in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/1/2009. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (er1 )
May 29, 2009 Filing 220 MOTION to Take Deposition from Lance Poulsen The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take the Deposition of Lance Poulsen by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 15, 2009 Filing 219 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Filing Under Seal the Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Notice of Substitution of Exhibit 232 to the Arizona Noteholders' Statement of Facts and Supporting Evidence Regarding Credit Suisse's Knowledge and Participation in the NCFE Fraud Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
May 13, 2009 Filing 218 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1559 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Strike Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC And Credit Suisse, New York Branch's Motion To Strike Evidence Submitted By Certain Noteholder Plaintiffs With Their Motions For Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC And Credit Suisse, New York Branch's Motion To Strike Evidence Submitted By Certain Noteholder Plaintiffs With Their Motions For Partial Summary Judgment The Arizona Noteholders' Response in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion to Strike Summary Judgment Evidence filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Cotner, Jeffry)
May 5, 2009 Filing 217 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Filing Under Seal the Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgement Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Cotner, Jeffry)
May 5, 2009 Filing 216 NOTICE by Plaintiff Chandler City of Notice of Filing Under Seal The Arizona Noteholders' Statement of Facts and Supporting Evidence Regarding Credit Suisse's Knowledge and Participation in the NCFE Fraud Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Cotner, Jeffry)
May 5, 2009 Filing 215 NOTICE by Plaintiff Chandler City of Notice of Filing of The Arizona Noteholders' IN CAMERA Response in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Authority to File Suit Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Cotner, Jeffry)
April 6, 2009 Motions terminated: #213 MOTION for Leave to File filed by City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (rew )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER in case 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA; granting 1550 Motion for Leave to File sur-reply on Credit Suisse motion to disqualify. case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/06/09. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (rew )
April 1, 2009 Filing 213 MOTION for Leave to File [The UAT and Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motionfor Leave to Submit Surreply on Credit Suisse's Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Cotner, Jeffry)
March 13, 2009 Filing 212 RESPONSE to Motion re (1531 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Response to Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Response to Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of Order Imposing Discovery Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
March 6, 2009 Filing 211 STIPULATION Extending Plaintiffs' Time To Respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by In Re Amedisys Inc, Plaintiff Amedisys Inc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Kessler, Marc)
February 27, 2009 Filing 210 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1457 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [The UAT and Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Response to the Motion by Credit Suisse to Disqualify Gibbs & Bruns, LLP and Plaintiffs' Request for Related Ancillary Relief] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-6, #3 Exhibit 7-9, #4 Exhibit 10 - Part 1 of 6, #5 Exhibit 10 - Part 2 of 6, #6 Exhibit 20 Part 2a of 6, #7 Exhibit 10 Part 3 of 6, #8 Exhibit 10 Part 4 of 6, #9 Exhibit 10 Part 5 of 6, #10 Exhibit 10 Part 6 of 6, #11 Exhibit 11-13, #12 Exhibit 14-15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20-21) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 26, 2009 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1455 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 198 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (1450 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 195 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA) Order on Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Reconsideration re (1450 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 195 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA) Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
February 20, 2009 Filing 208 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. [Notice of Filing the Arizona Noteholders' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Credit Suisse Under Ohio Statute R.C. 1707.43, The Ohio Blue Sky Aiding and Abetting Statute] Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 17, 2009 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1445 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Sanctions Against Certain Plaintiffs for Discovery Abuses [The Arizona Plaintiffs' Response to Credit Suisse's Omnibus Motion for Sanctions] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2 of The Arizona Plaintiffs' Response to Credit Suisse's Omnibus Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Exhibit D-H, #4 Exhibit I-O, #5 Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit Q-S, #7 Exhibit T-W, #8 Exhibit X-Z, #9 Exhibit AA-JJ, #10 Exhibit KK-OO, #11 Exhibit PP-TT, #12 Exhibit UU-ZZ) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 17, 2009 Filing 206 Joinder of The Outside Directors in Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P.'s Motion for Reconsideration by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Lonergan, Kyle)
February 17, 2009 Filing 205 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule For: Credit Suisse's Motion to Disqualify and Credit Suisse's Reply to the Arizona Noteholders and the UAT's Response to Credit Suisse's Sanctions Motion Against Lloyds and MetLife by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 12, 2009 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1465 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company and for Ancillary Relief [The Arizona Noteholders' and the UAT's Response to Credit Suisse's Motion for Sanctions Against Metlife and Lloyds] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 12, 2009 Filing 203 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP re (1484 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
February 4, 2009 Filing 202 NOTICE by Defendants Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Fellig, Thomas)
February 4, 2009 Filing 201 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Credit Suisse's Omnibus Motion for Sanctions DE 1445 by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 3, 2009 Filing 200 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP re (1466 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
January 26, 2009 Filing 199 BRIEF re(1455 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 198 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (1450 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 195 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA) Order on Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Reconsideration re (1450 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 195 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA) Order on Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert M. Millimet, #2 Affidavit of D. Robert Crants III) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
January 26, 2009 Filing 198 MOTION for Reconsideration re (1450 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 195 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA) Order on Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
January 21, 2009 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1452 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel the Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs to Produce Documents [The Arizona Noteholders' Response in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion to Compel Production of Documents] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 8, 2009 Filing 196 Mail Returned as forward time exp rtn to send. Order #1447 sent to ACCI Allicare Inc. (rew )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (1445) Motion for Sanctions in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA Signed by Mark R. Abel on 1/08/09. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (rew )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #(1448) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs response due 2/09/09. Credit Suisse reply due 3/09/09. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 1/08/09. Order docketed in all associated cases (rew )
January 6, 2009 Filing 193 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 2/9/2009. [Agreed Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule for Credit Suisse's Omnibus Motion for Sanctions (Docket No. 1445)] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
December 10, 2008 Filing 192 BRIEF by Plaintiff State of Arizona. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
November 17, 2008 Filing 191 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Correspondence to the Honorable Mark Abel Setting Hearing for November 20, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. (EST) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
October 23, 2008 Filing 190 MOTION for Joinder of The Outside Directors in the Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant Credit Suisse's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Lonergan, Kyle)
October 8, 2008 Filing 189 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1424 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 187 in 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Joinder of The Outside Directors in the Motion by The Credit Suisse Defendants for Sanctions Against Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P., (1422 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Sanctions Motion by the Credit Suisse Defendants for Sanctions Against Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. Memorandum of Law in Response to Motion for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kenneth N. Hickox, Jr. and Exhibits 1-3, #2 Affidavit Declaration Exhibits 4-11, #3 Affidavit Declaration Exhibits 12-17) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
October 6, 2008 Filing 188 NOTICE by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell Supplemental Expert Designation of The Outside Directors Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Lonergan, Kyle)
September 22, 2008 Filing 187 MOTION for Joinder of The Outside Directors in the Motion by The Credit Suisse Defendants for Sanctions Against Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Lonergan, Kyle)
August 19, 2008 Filing 186 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-JLG-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
July 30, 2008 Filing 185 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF BAYERISCHE LANDESBANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41 by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Responses due by 8/25/2008 Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
July 29, 2008 Filing 184 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
July 24, 2008 Filing 183 AGREED ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by James L Graham on 7/23/2008. (bw)
July 21, 2008 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Order to /FOR Bar Order by Defendant Shattan Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Agreed Order and Judgment) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Sugarman, Roger)
July 18, 2008 Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1362 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/2/2009. Expedited Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order Dated May 6, 2008 Response of the Noteholder Plaintiffs and the UAT in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Expedited Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order or to Limit Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
July 18, 2008 Filing 180 NOTICE by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell Expert Designation of the Outside Directors Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Lonergan, Kyle)
July 18, 2008 Filing 179 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P.'s Identification of Experts Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
July 18, 2008 Filing 178 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' and the UAT's Identification of Experts in Compliance with the Court's July 1, 2008 Order Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
July 1, 2008 Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1327 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by In Re Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Dickerson, Brian)
July 1, 2008 Filing 176 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Murray, Joseph)
July 1, 2008 Filing 175 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 7/3/2008 04:00 PM by teleconference before Mark R. Abel. The dispute regarding Pharos Capital Partners, L.P.s Rule 30(b)(6) depositions of Credit Suisse (doc. 1358) has been set for July 3 at 4:00 p.m. At the request of counsel for Wilkinson, Mendell and the Estate of Harold W. Pote (collectively, the Outside Directors), the dispute regarding their noticing Pharos employees Anna Kovalkova and Kneeland Youngblood for deposition (doc. 1359) will be heard at the same time. In addition, counsel should be prepared to discuss briefing Credit Suisses June 27, 2008 motion to modify the scheduling order filed May 6, 2008. I will not have a court reporter available for the conference. Counsel are free to engage one to make a record of the conference. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Abel, Mark)
June 26, 2008 Filing 174 NOTICE by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell Letter to Magistrate Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Lonergan, Kyle)
June 26, 2008 Filing 173 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
June 24, 2008 Filing 172 NOTICE by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P. Of Joinder in the Notice of Fugitive Rebecca Parrett's Failure to Appear For Deposition and The Joint Motion for Dismissal of Rebecca Parrett's Complaint for Her Failure to Appear at Deposition Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Brown, Philip)
June 20, 2008 Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1327 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery [Arizona Noteholders Response to Donald Ayers' Motion to Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit C Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit D-F) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 19, 2008 Filing 170 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (75 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 72 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 78 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 75 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 169 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 72 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 1345 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 75 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 82 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 77 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 82 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 92 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 73 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 82 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Notice of Hearing Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 19, 2008 Filing 169 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Correspondence to Honorable Mark Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 12, 2008 Filing 168 NOTICE by Plaintiff Chandler City of re (1321 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Arizona Noteholders' Statement Concerning Bloomberg E-mail Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exh 3, attach 3, #2 Exhibit 3, attach 4 - Exh 3, attach 7, #3 Exhibit 3, attach 8 - Exh 3, attach 14, #4 Exhibit 3, attach 15 - Exh 3, attach 21, #5 Exhibit 3, attach 22 - Exh 4, #6 Exhibit 5-20, #7 Exhibit 21-23, #8 Exhibit 24-28, #9 Exhibit 29-40, #10 Exhibit 41-52) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 4, 2008 Filing 167 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
May 30, 2008 Filing 166 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (1321 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Correspondence to the Honorable Mark Abel Re: DE 1321 Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 30, 2008 Filing 165 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (88 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 71 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 71 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 1323 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 71 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 68 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 78 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 164 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 71 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 68 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 78 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 69 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 74 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 78 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Notice of Hearing Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 29, 2008 Filing 164 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Correspondence to the Hon. Mark Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 28, 2008 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re (72 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 68 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 65 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 65 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 65 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 82 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 72 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 62 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 72 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 62 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 1293 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 65 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 158 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 63 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel [Letter Reply to Response to Motion to Compel a Two-Day Deposition of CSFB Witness Joseph Donovan] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 28, 2008 Filing 162 STATUS REPORT [Corresp. to Hon. Mark Abel Re: Requesting the Court to Consider an Add'l Issue at the Telephone Hearing on May 29, 2008] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 27, 2008 Filing 161 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1302 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (1298) Order [The Noteholder Plaintiffs' Surreply in Opposition to the Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Correct May 7, 2008 Order] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 15, 2008 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1302 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (1298) Order [Noteholder Plaintiffs' and the UAT's Response in Opposition to the Motion of the Credit Suisse Defendants to Reconsider and Correct May 7, 2008 Order Quashing Credit Suisse's Rule 30(b)(6) Subpoena to GMAC] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: Quashing Rule 30(b)(6) subpoena issues to GMAC. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 5/07/2008. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Abel, Mark)
April 30, 2008 Filing 158 MOTION to Compel A Two-Day Deposition of Credit Suisse Witness Joseph Donovan by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 22, 2008 Filing 157 STATUS REPORT [Correspondence to Hon. Mark Abel Re: Discovery Dispute Arising from Credit Suisse's Subpoena to Third Party GMAC] by Plaintiff Chandler City of. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 18, 2008 Filing 156 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1266 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel the Depositions of William Gross and William Powers [The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Response to Credit Suisse's Motion to Compel (Or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protection From) Credit Suisse's Notice of Certain Apex Depositions of Senior PIMCO Executives] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 15, 2008 Filing 155 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Amended Notice of Hearing Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 11, 2008 Filing 154 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (60 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 67 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 58 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 67 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 77 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 60 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 63 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 153 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 60 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 57 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 57 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 67 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 1272 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 60 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA) Status Report [Notice of Telephonic Hearing] Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2008 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT [Correspondence to Hon. Mark Abel] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 9, 2008 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1267 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 8/31/2008. Motion by the Credit Suisse Defendants to Modify the Revised Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Panarella; granting #148 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Callagy; granting #149 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joel A. Hankin; granting #150 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael C. Lynch. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 3/21/08. (kch)
March 19, 2008 Filing 150 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael C. Lynch (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
March 19, 2008 Filing 149 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joel A. Hankin (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
March 19, 2008 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Callagy (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
March 19, 2008 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Panarella (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
March 5, 2008 Filing 146 STATUS REPORT and Request for Telephone Hearing by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 22, 2008 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2008 before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter: Laura L. Samuels. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (er )
February 14, 2008 Filing 144 STATUS REPORT Correspondence to the Honorable Mark Abel by Plaintiff Chandler City of. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 1, 2008 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re (141 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 51 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 59 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 53 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 70 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 56 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 53 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 59 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 50 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 53 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 1217 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 51 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 58 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 50 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel [Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Bloomberg Emails by Credit Suisse] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 30, 2008 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1219 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Production of Bloomberg E-mail [Reply Brief to Credit Suisse's Motion to Compel] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 25, 2008 Filing 141 MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Bloomberg Emails by Defendant Credit Suisse by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 24, 2008 Filing 140 NOTICE by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc (Attachments: #1 Letter to Honorable Mark Abel with Attachment, #2 Attachment) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Coster, James)
January 18, 2008 Filing 139 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Abu Dhabi Investment Company's Claims Against Defendants Barbara Poulsen, Lance Poulsen, Kuld Corp., and Rebecca Parrett Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 138 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Abu Dhabi Investment Company's Claims Against Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. and Donald H. Ayers Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 8, 2008 Filing 137 Response to DE 1191 - Correspondence to Honorable Mark Abel by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 8, 2008 Filing 136 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Larry R White, Gary Davis, Laurie Davis, Donna Schrader, Glenn Schrader of Firm Name Change Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Arnold, James)
January 4, 2008 Filing 135 STATUS REPORT Letter to the Court Regarding PIMCO Documents by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 2, 2008 Filing 134 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Request for Additional Time to Examine Witnesses by Other Examiners The Arizona Noteholders and the UAT Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
December 26, 2007 Filing 133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 2/8/2008. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Brody, Steven)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (177); Motion to Dismiss: granting in part and denying in part (242). Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 12-20-07. (ws)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Alexander D. Widell). Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/5/07. (kch)
November 30, 2007 Filing fee for PHV for Widell: $ 200, receipt number COL 592. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (er )
November 30, 2007 Filing 130 MOTION for Leave for Alexander D. Widell to Appear Pro Hac Vice obo Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (er )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #128 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/19/2007. (sr)
November 16, 2007 Filing 128 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (Lazear, Sherri)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #126 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Daniele Chinea). Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/9/07. (kch)
November 8, 2007 Filing 126 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniele Chinea. Filing fee $ 200. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Lazear, Sherri)
September 28, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER : This case transferred for multidistrict litigation purposes to Judge Graham; this case is Administratively closed. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/28/04. (aq )
July 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Plf by Kenneth Hickox, Jr. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/27/04. (sh, )
July 23, 2004 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kenneth N Hickox, Jr for Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: (1) Filing fee rcpt #242474 $50.00)(sh, )
February 23, 2004 Filing 122 REPLY Memorandum of Law in Support of #115 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (Long, Thomas)
January 16, 2004 Filing 121 AMENDED COMPLAINT Jury Demand against all defendants, filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, Defendants Deloitte & Touche, Credit Suisse First Boston Corp, The Shattan Group LLC, Purcell & Scott Co LPA, Harold W Pote, Eric R Wilkinson.(Collins, Michael)
January 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #116 Craig D. Singer's Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Purcell & Scott on the condition that Mr. Singer accept service electronically. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/6/04. (tto, )
January 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 Pharos Capital Partners, L.P., Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #115 Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/30/2004. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/5/04. (tto, )
December 30, 2003 Filing 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
December 16, 2003 Filing 117 STIPULATION Extending Time for Plaintiff Pharos Captial Partners, L.P. to Respond to Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation LLC's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
December 15, 2003 Filing 116 MOTION for Craig Singer to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendant Purcell & Scott Co LPA. (Attachments: #1 phv rcpt for Singer)(sln, )
November 25, 2003 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. Responses due by 12/19/2003 (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 federal case sites and exhibit of Thomas Long in support)(bw) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2003 (sln, ).
November 20, 2003 Filing 113 STATEMENT OF SPECIFIC ERRORS Statement Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Purcell & Scott Co LPA. (Attachments: #1)(Fornshell, Matthew)
November 17, 2003 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. Eric R Wilkinson served on 11/10/2003, answer due 11/30/2003. (sh, )
November 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Defendant Deloitte & Touche Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 12/10/2003. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/12/03. (tto, )
November 10, 2003 Filing 112 Summons Issued as to Eric R Wilkinson. (sln, )
November 10, 2003 Filing 110 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 Motion to Dismiss, #106 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Deloitte & Touche. (Szolosi, Michael)
November 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #98 Jonathon M. Yarger's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Purcell & Scott, Co.., L.P.A. and designating attorney Matthew L Fornshell for Purcell & Scott Co LPA. Attorney Jonathon M Yarger terminated . Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/4/03. (tto, )
October 30, 2003 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 Motion to Dismiss Cites/Table of Authorities filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Cites / Table of Authorities)(Collins, Michael)
October 30, 2003 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 Motion to Dismiss Table of Authorities filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Authorities)(Collins, Michael)
October 30, 2003 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Collins, Michael)
October 30, 2003 Filing 105 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Credit Suisse First Boston Corp, Deloitte & Touche, Harold W Pote, Purcell & Scott Co LPA, The Shattan Group LLC, Eric R Wilkinson, filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp, Deloitte & Touche, Harold W Pote, Purcell & Scott Co LPA, The Shattan Group LLC, Eric R Wilkinson.(Collins, Michael)
October 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #102 Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 Defendant Deloitte & Touche Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 10/30/2003. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/27/03. (tto, )
October 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #97 Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 Defendant Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 10/27/2003. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/27/03. (tto, )
October 27, 2003 Filing 102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Collins, Michael)
October 24, 2003 Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Harold W Pote Re: Proposed Order (Docket #100) (Graney, Michael)
October 24, 2003 Filing 100 Reply re #94 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Extension of Time for Pote to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Graney, Michael)
October 21, 2003 Filing 98 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Purcell & Scott Co LPA. (Fornshell, Matthew) Modified on 11/4/2003 to add correct caption(sln, ).
October 20, 2003 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Document #84 resent to James Renard and William Brewer 10/21/03. Document # 83 resent to James Renard 10/21/03 (sln, )
October 20, 2003 Filing 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Collins, Michael)
October 17, 2003 Filing 99 Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC'S Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 25 . Filed by Credit Suisse (Attachments: #1 part 2 of 5#2 part 3 of 5#3 part 4 of 5#4 part 5 of 5)(sln, )
October 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Protective Order, 38 Motion for Protective Order, #74 Motion for Joinder to the following extent. As stated in the 7/14/03 Preliminary Pretrial Order, the parties remain free to serve written discovery. But the obligation to respond to those discovery requests is STAYED pending a determination by the MDL Panel whether to consolidate the related cases before one judge. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/17/03. (tto, )
October 14, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 10/20/2003. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/14/03. (tto, )
October 13, 2003 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Joinder To Defendants Deloitte & Touche LLP's and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Motions For Protective Order Staying All Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pharos Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion of Certain Former Directors to Enforce Stay)(Collins, Michael)
October 10, 2003 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Deloitte & Touche's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Collins, Michael)
October 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #91 Pharos Capital Partners, L.P, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply regarding motion for extension of time to respond to complaint Responses due by 10/13/2003 Replies due by 10/24/2003.. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/10/03. (tto, )
October 9, 2003 Filing 91 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, Defendant Harold W Pote. (Murray, Joseph)
October 8, 2003 Filing 90 NOTICE by Defendant Deloitte & Touche re #72 Reply to Response to Motion of Corrected Filing (Attachments: #1)(Szolosi, Michael)
October 6, 2003 Filing 89 EXHIBITS 1,2 & 3 to dft Deloitte & Touche's LLP's supplemental citation of authority in support of mt for protective order staying all proceedings. filed by Defendant Deloitte & Touche (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2#2 Exhibit 3)(sln, )
October 6, 2003 Mail Returned (documents # 79 & 81) as Undeliverable sent to James Renard & William Brewer (resent 10/7/03) (sln, )
October 6, 2003 Filing 88 NOTICE by Defendant Deloitte & Touche re #87 Supplemental - Supporting (non motion) Of Partial Manual Filing (Szolosi, Michael)
October 6, 2003 Filing 87 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #72 Reply to Response to Motion for Protective Order Staying All Proceedings by Defendant Deloitte & Touche. (Szolosi, Michael)
October 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Pharos Capital Partners Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 Defendant Deloitte & Touche LLP's Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 10/10/2003. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/6/03. (tto, )
October 3, 2003 Filing 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
October 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. is given leave to file its reply memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss the complaint on or before 10/17/03.. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/30/03. (tto, )
September 30, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P., Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 10/3/2003. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/30/03. (tto, )
September 29, 2003 Mail Returned (73) as Undeliverable to James Renard. Re mailed 9/30/03. (sln, )
September 26, 2003 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Deloitte & Touche, LLP's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
September 22, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Pharos Capital Partners L.P., Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 Defendant Deloitte & Touche LLP's Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 9/26/2003. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/22/03. (tto, )
September 16, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time until 10/9/03 to Answer re Complaint and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs should file within ten (10) days of the date of this Order any opposition they may have to Mr. Pote's second request for an extension until seven days after this Court rules on Defendants Motions to stay or until MDL Panel rules on the pending motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/15/03. (tto, )
September 16, 2003 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Deloitte & Touche, LLP's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
September 15, 2003 Filing 80 Summons Issued as to Eric R Wilkinson. (sln, )
September 12, 2003 Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint by Defendant Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Graney, Michael)
September 12, 2003 Filing 74 MOTION for Joinder To Defendants Deloitte & Touche LLP's and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Motions For Protective Order Staying All Proceedings by Defendant Harold W Pote. (Graney, Michael)
September 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion of Defendant Pote for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint to and including September 18, 2003. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/11/03. (Abel, Mark)
September 9, 2003 Filing 77 EXHIBIT C (afdt of Michael R. Szolosi Sr) to dft Deloitte & Touche's reply memo in support of their mt for protective order staying all proceedings (sln, )
September 9, 2003 Filing 76 EXHIBIT B to dft Deloitte & Touche's memo in support of their mt for protective order staying all proceedings(sln, )
September 9, 2003 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 Motion for Protective Order filed by Defendant Deloitte & Touche. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Claims in NCFE Cases#2 Exhibit Notice of Partial Manual Filing)(Szolosi, Michael)
September 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply supporting the Motion to Dismiss 25 filed by Credit Suisse First Boston. Reply brief due 10/3/2003.Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/9/03. (Abel, Mark)
September 9, 2003 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint by Defendant Harold W Pote. (Graney, Michael)
September 5, 2003 Filing 69 MOTION by dft Credit Suisse for Extension of Time to 10/3/03 to file reply brief in support of their 25 Motion to Dismiss (sln, )
September 2, 2003 Filing 68 STIPULATION : extending time to 9/16/03 for plt Pharos Capital to respond to dft Deloitte & Touche's mt to dismiss complaint 33 (sln, )
August 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting dft Harold Pote's motion to extend time to 9/11/03 to respond to cmplt [66-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
August 25, 2003 Filing 66 MOTION by dft Harold W Pote to extend time to 9/11/03 to respond to cmplt ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
August 25, 2003 Filing 65 STIPULATION: extending time to 9/9/03 for dft Deloitte & Touche to reply to plt Pharos Capital consolidated response and brief in opp to Delotte & Touche's motion for protective order staying all proceedings pending resolution of motion to consolidate and motion to dismiss [38-1] ( no pgs: 4) (sln)
August 20, 2003 Filing 64 COPY OF NOTICE of hearing to be held 10/9/03 in Washington, DC, filed by MDL Panel (cc: all counsel) (sln)
August 19, 2003 Filing 63 AMENDED RESPONSE and Supporting Brief in opp by plt Pharos Capital to dft Criedit Suisse's motion to dismiss complaint [25-1] ( no pgs: 40 + EXH) (sln)
August 19, 2003 Filing 62 NOTICE of Substituted Filing of plt's amd response and supporting brief in opp to dft Credit Suisse's mt to dismiss, by plt Pharos Capital ( no pgs: 4) (sln)
August 18, 2003 Filing 61 NOTICE of Hearing Session from the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ( no pgs: 13) (sln)
August 18, 2003 Filing 60 RESPONSE by plaintiff Pharos Capital to deft Credit Suisse's motion to dismiss complaint [25-1] ( no pgs: 45) (pl)
August 13, 2003 Filing 59 STIPULATION extending time for plt Pharos Capital's to 9/2/03 to respond to dft Deloitte & Touche's motion to dismiss [33-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
August 13, 2003 Filing 58 MOTION by plt Pharos Capital to extend time to 8/18/03 to respond to Credit Suisse's mt to dismiss cmplt ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
August 13, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting plt's motion to extend time to 8/12/03 to respond to Credit Suisse's mt for protective order and until 8/13/03 to respond to Credit Suisse's mt dismiss [50-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
August 12, 2003 Filing 56 RESPONSE by plt to dft Deloitte's motion for protective order staying all proceedings pending resolution of motion to consolidate and motion to dismiss [38-1], and dft Credit Suisse's motion for protective order staying all proceedings pending resolution of motion to consolidate and motion to dismiss [37-1] ( no pgs: 16) (sln)
August 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting plt's motion to extend time to complete service on Eric Wilkinson and Harold Pote [42-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
August 8, 2003 Filing 54 STIPULATIONI: dft Harold Pote extended to 8/28/03 to respond to complaint [0-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
August 6, 2003 Filing 53 (2nd) RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon dft Harold W Pote on 7/20/03 ( no pgs: 2) (sln)
August 6, 2003 Filing 52 STIPULATION : extending time to 8/12/03 for plt to respond to dft Deloitte & Touche's motion for protective order staying all proceedings pending resolution of motion to consolidate and motion to dismiss [38-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln) Modified on 08/08/2003
August 6, 2003 Filing 51 STIPULATION : extending time to 8/19/03 for plt to respond to dft Deloitte & Touche's motion to dismiss [33-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
August 5, 2003 Filing 50 MOTION by plt Pharos Capital to extend time to 8/12/03 to respond to Credit Suisse's mt for protective order and until 8/13/03 to respond to Credit Suisse's mt dismiss ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
August 4, 2003 Filing 49 RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon dft Harold W Pote on 7/19/03 ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
August 4, 2003 Filing 48 Supplemental memorandum ( certificate from the Supreme Court of Illinois) by dft Deloitte & Touche to motion for admission of attorney Freedman pro hac vice [46-1] ( no pgs: 3) (sln)
July 30, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting dft Deloitte & Touche's motion for admission of attorney Beck, Goldman, Levine, and Freedman pro hac vice [46-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
July 30, 2003 PHV Filing Fee Paid: on 7/30/03 in the amount of $ 200.00, receipt # 237343, for atty Beck, Goldman, Levine, & Freedman (sln)
July 30, 2003 Filing 46 MOTION by dft Deloitte & Touche for admission of attorney Beck, Goldman, Levine, and Freedman pro hac vice ( no pgs: 3 + exh) (fee paid) (sln)
July 28, 2003 Filing 45 STIPULATION: plt Pharos Capital extended to 8/6/03 to respond to dft Credit Suisse's motion to dismiss complaint [25-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
July 28, 2003 Filing 44 STIPULATION: plt Pharos Capital extended to 8/5/03 to respond to Credit Suisse's motion for protective order staying all proceedings pending resolution of motion to consolidate and motion to dismiss [37-1], & motion to dismiss complaint [25-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
July 28, 2003 Filing 43 STIPULATION : plt extended to 8/5/03 to respond to dft Deloitte & Touche's motion for protective order staying all proceedings pending resolution of motion to consolidate and motion to dismiss [38-1], & motion to dismiss [33-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
July 23, 2003 Filing 42 MOTION by plt to extend time to complete service ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
July 21, 2003 Filing 41 STIPULATION : plt extended to 8/11/03 to respond to dft Deloitte & Touche's motion to dismiss complaint [25-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
July 17, 2003 Summons issued as to dft Harold W Pote (sln)
July 15, 2003 Filing 40 STIPULATION: plt Pharos Capital extended to 7/22/03 to respond to dft Credit Suisse's motion to dismiss complaint [25-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
July 14, 2003 Filing 39 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER b Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel ; Preliminary pretrial conf was held on 11:00 7/10/03; mt's to amend, if any, due 2/1/04 ( no pgs: 5) (cc: all counsel) (sln)
July 9, 2003 Filing 38 MOTION by dft Deloitte & Touche for protective order staying all proceedings pending resolution of motion to consolidate and motion to dismiss ( no pgs: 14 + exh) (sln)
July 9, 2003 Filing 37 MOTION by dft Credit Suisse First for protective order staying all proceedings pending resolution of motion to consolidate and motion to dismiss ( no pgs: 9) (sln)
July 3, 2003 Filing 36 Rule 26(f) Report of parties to Magistrate Judge filed by plaintiff Pharos Capital, defendant Deloitte & Touche, defendant Credit Suisse First, defendant Shattan Group LLC, defendant Purcell & Scott Co, defendant Harold W Pote ( no pgs: 11) (sh)
June 30, 2003 Filing 35 STIPULATION extending plt's time to 7/15/03 to respond to dft Credie Suisse's motion to dismiss [33-1] ( no pgs: 5) (sln)
June 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting plt's motion for admission of attorney William Brewer pro hac vice [31-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
June 26, 2003 Filing 33 MOTION by dft Deloitte & Touche to dismiss ( no pgs: 19 + exh) (sln)
June 26, 2003 Filing 32 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney David Stewart Cupps for Deloitte & Touche and substituting attorney Michael Roy Szolosi Sr ( no pgs: 2) (sln)
June 23, 2003 PHV Filing Fee Paid: on 6/23/03 in the amount of $ 50.00, receipt # 236778, for atty William Brewer (sln)
June 23, 2003 Filing 31 MOTION by plt for admission of attorney William Brewer pro hac vice ( no pgs: 6) (sln)
June 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting Deloitte & Touche's motion to extend time to 6/26/03 to move or plead [29-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
June 16, 2003 Filing 29 MOTION by dft Deloitte & Touche to extend time to 6/26/03 to move or plead ( no pgs: 4) (sln)
June 16, 2003 Filing 28 ANSWER by dft Shattan Group LLC ( no pgs: 13) (sln)
June 9, 2003 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by plaintiff Pharos Capital ( no pgs: 3) (sln)
June 9, 2003 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas Long in support of dft Credit Suisse's motion to dismiss complaint [25-1] ( no pgs: 3 + EXH) (sln)
June 9, 2003 Filing 25 MOTION by dft Credit Suisse First to dismiss complaint ( no pgs: 18 + EXH) (sln)
June 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting dft Purcell's motion for admission of attorneys' Villa, Cary, and Andelman pro hac vice [21-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
June 5, 2003 PHV Filing Fee Paid: on 6/5/03 in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 236492, for attys' Villa, Cary & Andelman (sln)
June 3, 2003 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by defendant Shattan Group LLC ( no pgs: 2) (sln)
June 3, 2003 Filing 22 STIPULATION: dft The Shattan Group is extended to 6/16/03 to respond to plt's cmplt [0-1] ( no pgs: 2) (sln)
June 3, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting motion for admission of attorney Jeffrey Q. Smith pro hac vice [19-1], granting motion for admission of attorney Steven Brody pro hac vice [18-1] $50.00 filing fee to be tendered w/i 30 days (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 2) (pl)
June 2, 2003 Filing 21 MOTION by defendant Purcell & Scott Co for admission of attorneys' Villa, Cary, and Andelman pro hac vice ( no pgs: 3 + exh) (sln)
May 30, 2003 PHV Filing Fee Paid: on 5/30/03 in the amount of $ 50.00, receipt # 236372, for atty Steven Brody (sln)
May 30, 2003 PHV Filing Fee Paid: on 5/30/03 in the amount of $ 50.00, receipt # 236371, for atty Jeffrey Smith (sln)
May 28, 2003 Filing 19 MOTION by dft Credit Suisse First for admission of attorney Jeffrey Q. Smith pro hac vice ( no pgs: 4) (fee not paid) (sln)
May 28, 2003 Filing 18 MOTION by defendant Credit Suisse First for admission of attorney Steven Brody pro hac vice ( no pgs: 4) (fee not paid) (sln)
May 23, 2003 RECEIPT of R & R received by OAG on 5/20/03 (sem)
May 23, 2003 Filing 17 DEMAND for jury trial by defendant Purcell & Scott Co ( no pgs: 2) (sln)
May 23, 2003 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Shattan Group LLC by Roger Philip Sugarman ( no pgs: 2) (sln)
May 21, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Algenon L. Marbley granting dft Deloitte & Touche's motion to extend time to 6/19/03 to respond to cmplt [14-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
May 20, 2003 Filing 14 MOTION by dft Deloitte & Touche to extend time to 6/19/03 to respond to cmplt ( no pgs: 3) (sln)
May 20, 2003 Filing 13 ANSWER by dft Purcell & Scott ( no pgs: 23) (sln)
May 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Stipulation and ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel : dft Credit Suisse extended to 6/9/03 to respond to plt's cmplt (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 3) (sln)
May 19, 2003 State Court records recd (sln)
May 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel granting plt's motion for admission of attorney Michael Collins pro hac vice [10-1] (cc: all counsel) ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
May 13, 2003 PHV Filing Fee Paid: on 5/13/03 in the amount of $ 50.00, receipt # 236158, for atty Michael Collins (sln)
May 13, 2003 Filing 10 MOTION by plt for admission of attorney Michael Collins pro hac vice ( no pgs: 5) (fee paid) (sln)
May 8, 2003 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by defendant Purcell & Scott Co ( no pgs: 2) (sln)
May 6, 2003 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RESERVATION OF RIGHTS AND APPEARANCE by defendant Credit Suisse First ( no pgs: 3) (sln)
May 6, 2003 Filing 7 Defendant Credit Suisse First disclosure statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 ( no pgs: 3) (sln)
May 2, 2003 Filing 6 NOTICE by defendant Deloitte & Touche of reservation of rights and appearance ( no pgs: 3) (sln)
April 29, 2003 Filing 5 STIPULATION: dft Deloitte & Touche extended to 5/20/03 to respond to complaint [0-1] ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
April 25, 2003 Filing 4 STIPULATION: dft Credit Suisse extended to 5/19/03 to respond to plt's cmplt [0-1] ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
April 25, 2003 Filing 3 STIPULATION: dft Purcell & Scott extended to 5/20/03 to resond to plt's cmplt [0-1] ( no pgs: 1) (sln) Modified on 04/30/2003
April 25, 2003 Clerk's Notice of Removal sent to counsel ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
April 25, 2003 Filing 2 NOTICE setting this action for Preliminary PTC 11:00 7/10/03 before MRA, room 208 no pgs: 2 (cc: all counsel) (sln)
April 23, 2003 Filing Fee Paid: on 4/23/03 in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 235798. (sln)
April 23, 2003 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County CPC Court, Case Number: 03 CVC 03 2949 (referred to Mag. Judge Mark R. Abel ) ( no pgs: 4 + exh) (sln)
April 15, 2003 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice, as to party Eric R Wilkinson ( no pgs.: 3) (sln)
April 9, 2003 STIPULATION: dft Purcell & Scott granted until 4/24/03 to respond to plt's complaint [0-1] ( no pgs: 1) (sln)
March 14, 2003 COMPLAINT (Summonses issued) ( no. pgs: 30 + exh) (sln) Modified on 05/20/2003

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharos Capital v. Deloitte & Touche, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric R Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte & Touche
Represented By: Sharon Katz
Represented By: Michael Roy Szolosi, Sr.
Represented By: Andrew L Goldman
Represented By: David Stewart Cupps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold W Pote
Represented By: Michael Proctor Graney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston Corp
Represented By: Steven G Brody
Represented By: Daniele Chinea
Represented By: Jeffrey Q Smith
Represented By: Thomas Leslie Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shattan Group LLC
Represented By: Roger Philip Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purcell & Scott Co LPA
Represented By: Matthew B Andelman
Represented By: Craig D. Singer
Represented By: Robert M Cary
Represented By: John K Villa
Represented By: Jonathon M Yarger
Represented By: Matthew L Fornshell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharos Capital Partners LP
Represented By: Robert M Millimet
Represented By: James S Renard
Represented By: Kenneth N Hickox, Jr
Represented By: Michael Joseph Collins
Represented By: Joseph F Murray
Represented By: William A Brewer, III
Represented By: Alexander D Widell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?