In Re: National Century Financial Enterprises Inc Investment Litigation
Plaintiff: Donna Schrader, Michael Mahoney, Barbara Poulsen, State of Arizona, John P. Houlihan, HSBC Bank USA, Larry R White, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Gary Davis, Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee, Louis Janssen, Glenn Schrader, ING Bank N.V., Laurie Davis, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, City of Chandler Arizona et al., Lance K Poulsen, New York City Police Pension Fund and New York City Fire Department Pension Fund
Defendant: Bank One National Association, Kuld Corp, Thomas G. Mendell, Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P., Purcell, Joanne D, Sam Romeo, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Mitchell Stein, Rebecca nmi Parrett, Rebecca S Parrett, Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz, Cheyenne-Blaze LLC, Purcell & Scott Co LPA, Wilkinson, Eric R., Barbara L. Poulsen, Eric R. Wilkinson, Harold W Pote, E & D Investments, Cedric Johnson, Shattan Group LLC, South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Elyse Ayers, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Suzanne K Hosch, Linda Johnson, Credit Suisse, New York Branch, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank One, N.A., John F Andrews, JPMorgan Chase & Co, Donald nmi Ayers, Kachina, Inc., Ayers LLC, Beacon Group, LLC, Eric R Wilkerson, Scott & Purcell, Co., L.P.A., Intercontinental Investment Associates, Swabb Financial LLC, Albert Marston, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Lance K. Poulsen, Cary W Purcell, TSI Technologies and Holdings LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, J.P. Morgan Chase Partners, L.P., Healthcare Capital LLC and Fitch, Inc.
In Re: Fitch Inc, Thomas Mendell, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP, CHC Clintwood Inc, Moody's Investors Service Inc, George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti, Donald H Ayers, Florida Health Plan Management Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston Corp, The Shattan Group LLC, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund L P, Pharos Capital Partners LP, Acci/Allcare of Pennsylvanie, nia, Biosource Corporation, Lance K Poulson, Amedisys Inc, Beacon Group LLC, Lloyds TSB Bank plc, National Century Financial Enterprises Inc Investment Litigation, Banc One Capital Markets Inc, Home Medical Care of America Inc, Craig W Porter, RJ Gold & Company, 1199 Health Care Employees Pension Fund, National Rehab of Florida, Cranford L Scott and H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson
Case Number: 2:2003md01565
Filed: November 18, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Mark R Abel
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 7/3/2008. (mra2, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 1371 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
July 1, 2008 Filing 1370 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1327 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by In Re Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Dickerson, Brian)
July 1, 2008 Filing 1369 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-J) (Brody, Steven)
July 1, 2008 Filing 1368 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Murray, Joseph)
July 1, 2008 Filing 1367 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1327 MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by In Re Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2) (Dickerson, Brian)
July 1, 2008 Filing 1366 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1327 MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by In Re Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER re: Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures. Signed by James L Graham on 7/1/2008. (bw)
July 1, 2008 Filing 1364 AMENDED NOTICE. Docket Entry 1363 is hereby modified. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 07/01/2008. (sr)
July 1, 2008 Filing 1363 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 7/3/2008 04:00 PM by teleconference before Mark R. Abel. The dispute regarding Pharos Capital Partners, L.P.s Rule 30(b)(6) depositions of Credit Suisse (doc. 1358) has been set for July 3 at 4:00 p.m. At the request of counsel for Wilkinson, Mendell and the Estate of Harold W. Pote (collectively, the Outside Directors), the dispute regarding their noticing Pharos employees Anna Kovalkova and Kneeland Youngblood for deposition (doc. 1359) will be heard at the same time. In addition, counsel should be prepared to discuss briefing Credit Suisses June 27, 2008 motion to modify the scheduling order filed May 6, 2008. I will not have a court reporter available for the conference. Counsel are free to engage one to make a record of the conference. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Abel, Mark)
June 27, 2008 Filing 1362 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/2/2009. Expedited Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order Dated May 6, 2008 by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
June 27, 2008 Filing 1361 STATUS REPORT Re Expert Discovery by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
June 27, 2008 Filing 1360 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
June 26, 2008 Filing 1359 NOTICE by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell Letter to Magistrate Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Lonergan, Kyle)
June 26, 2008 Filing 1358 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
June 24, 2008 Filing 1357 NOTICE by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. Joinder Of Defendant The Beacon Group III - Focus Value Fund, L.P. In The Joint Motion For Dismissal Of Rebecca Parrett's Complaint For Her Failure To appear At Deposition (Flaum, Douglas)
June 24, 2008 Filing 1356 NOTICE by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P. Of Joinder in the Notice of Fugitive Rebecca Parrett's Failure to Appear For Deposition and The Joint Motion for Dismissal of Rebecca Parrett's Complaint for Her Failure to Appear at Deposition Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Brown, Philip)
June 23, 2008 Filing 1355 NOTICE by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP re (1347 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1349 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Rebecca Parrett's Complaint for Failure to Appear at Deposition -- Joinder with Notice and Motion Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA (Miller, Tiffany)
June 23, 2008 Filing 1354 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation re #1345 Notice (Other) Correspondence to Honorable Mark Abel (DiCicco, Susan)
June 23, 2008 Filing 1353 RESPONSE to Motion re #1327 MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
June 23, 2008 Filing 1352 MOTION for Joinder in the NOtice of Fugitive Rebecca Parrett's Failure to Appear for Deposition, Further Supporting Credit Suisse's Motion to Dismiss Her Complaint by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
June 20, 2008 Filing 1351 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1327 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery [Arizona Noteholders Response to Donald Ayers' Motion to Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit C Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit D-F) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 20, 2008 Filing 1350 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1327 MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Linda Johnson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wilkinson, William)
June 20, 2008 Filing 1349 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Rebecca Parrett's Complaint for Failure to Appear at Deposition by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One, N.A.. Responses due by 7/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
June 20, 2008 Filing 1348 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation of rescheduling of telephone conference to June 23, 2008 (Brody, Steven)
June 20, 2008 Filing 1347 NOTICE by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. Notice Of Fugitive Rebecca Parrett's Failure To Appear For Deposition, Further Supporting Dismissal Of Her Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Flaum, Douglas)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1346 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (75 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 72 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 78 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 75 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 169 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 72 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 1345 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 75 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 82 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 77 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 82 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 92 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 73 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 82 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Notice of Hearing Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1345 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Correspondence to Honorable Mark Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 17, 2008 Filing 1344 Transcript of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on June 10, 2008, before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawna J. Evans, Telephone number 614-719-3316. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 7/8/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2008. (kk2)
June 13, 2008 Filing 1343 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
June 12, 2008 Filing 1342 Transcript of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on June 9, 2008, before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3205. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 7/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2008. (kk2)
June 12, 2008 Filing 1341 NOTICE by Plaintiff Chandler City of re (1321 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Arizona Noteholders' Statement Concerning Bloomberg E-mail Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exh 3, attach 3, #2 Exhibit 3, attach 4 - Exh 3, attach 7, #3 Exhibit 3, attach 8 - Exh 3, attach 14, #4 Exhibit 3, attach 15 - Exh 3, attach 21, #5 Exhibit 3, attach 22 - Exh 4, #6 Exhibit 5-20, #7 Exhibit 21-23, #8 Exhibit 24-28, #9 Exhibit 29-40, #10 Exhibit 41-52) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 11, 2008 Filing 1340 NOTICE by Defendant Fitch, Inc. Letter to Hon. J. Graham and Hon. M. Abel from J. Mason (Mason, Julia)
June 10, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 6/10/2008. (mra2, )
June 9, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2008. (mra2, )
June 9, 2008 Filing 1339 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Exhibit C - Part 1, #3 Exhibit C - Part 2, #4 Exhibit C - Part 3, #5 Exhibit C - Part 4, #6 Exhibit C - Part 5, #7 Exhibit C - Part 6, #8 Exhibit C - Part 7, #9 Exhibit C - Part 8, #10 Exhibit D) (Brody, Steven)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 ORDER: GMAC has requested an extension of time until 06/12/2008 to provide answers to Credit Suisse's questions as required. GMAC's request is GRANTED. GMAC is ORDERED to provide specific answers to Credit Suisse's questions no later than 06/12/2008. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 06/09/2008. (sr)
June 9, 2008 Filing 1337 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 ORDER regarding Credit Suisse's June 2, 2008 letter to the Court (doc. 1332). Signed by Mark R. Abel on 6/5/2008. (mra2, )
June 5, 2008 Filing 1335 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
June 5, 2008 Filing 1334 Transcript of Proceedings (Telephone Conference) held on May 29, 2008, before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Denise Errett, Telephone number 614-719-3029. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (kk2)
June 4, 2008 Filing 1333 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP, In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Millimet, Robert)
June 3, 2008 Filing 1332 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-D) (Brody, Steven)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 ORDER granting #1266 Motion to Compel the half day depositions of William Gross and Williams Powers. William Gross is ORDERED to submit to deposition for a period not to exceed 2 hours. Credit Suisse's counsel is DIRECTED to provide PIMCO's counsel with an itemization of its reasonable expense incurred in pursuing the motion to compel. If PIMCO contests this Order awarding expenses or the reasonableness of the itemization, its counsel should promptly notify opposing counsel and request a hearing date from Magistrate Judge Abel. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 06/02/2008. (sr)
May 30, 2008 Filing 1330 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (1321 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Correspondence to the Honorable Mark Abel Re: DE 1321 Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 30, 2008 Filing 1329 NOTICE by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P. of Joinder in the Notice of Fugitive Status of Plaintiff Rebecca Parrett and In Further Support of Deloitte & Touche LLP'S Motion to Dismiss Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA (Brown, Philip)
May 30, 2008 Filing 1328 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (88 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 71 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 71 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 1323 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 71 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 68 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 78 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 164 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 71 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 68 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 78 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 69 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 74 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 78 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other) Notice of Hearing Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 30, 2008 Filing 1327 MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery by In Re Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dickerson, Brian)
May 30, 2008 Filing 1326 NOTICE by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP re (1317 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Joinder in the Notice of Fugitive Status of Plaintiff Rebecca Parrett and In Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA (Miller, Tiffany)
May 29, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 5/29/2008. (mra2, )
May 29, 2008 Filing 1325 Joint MOTION for Joinder in the Notice of Fugitive Status of Plaintiff Rebecca Parrett and in Further Support of Credit Suisse's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
May 29, 2008 Filing 1324 Joint MOTION for Joinder to Notice of Fugitive Status of Plaintiff Rebecca Parrett and in Further Support of Certain Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One, N.A.. (Wilkinson, William)
May 29, 2008 Filing 1323 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Correspondence to the Hon. Mark Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 29, 2008 Filing 1322 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/27/2008, before Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Denise N. Errett, Telephone number 614-719-3029. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 6/19/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2008. (pes1)
May 29, 2008 Filing 1321 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
May 29, 2008 Filing 1320 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
May 28, 2008 Filing 1319 REPLY to Response to Motion re (72 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 68 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 65 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 65 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 65 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 82 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 72 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 62 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 72 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 62 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 1293 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 65 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 158 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 63 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel [Letter Reply to Response to Motion to Compel a Two-Day Deposition of CSFB Witness Joseph Donovan] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 28, 2008 Filing 1318 STATUS REPORT [Corresp. to Hon. Mark Abel Re: Requesting the Court to Consider an Add'l Issue at the Telephone Hearing on May 29, 2008] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 27, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 5/27/2008. (mra2, )
May 27, 2008 Filing 1317 NOTICE by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. re #175 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Fugitive Status of Plaintiff Rebecca Parrett Further Supporting the Motions To Dismiss of The Beacon Group III - Focus Value Fund L.P., Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell, and Eric R. Wilkinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Flaum, Douglas)
May 27, 2008 Filing 1316 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 ORDER denying #1302 Motion for Reconsideration.Signed by Judge James L Graham on 5/27/08. (jlg4)
May 27, 2008 Filing 1314 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1293 MOTION to Compel A Two-Day Deposition of Credit Suisse Witness Joseph Donovan filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
May 27, 2008 Filing 1313 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
May 27, 2008 Filing 1312 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1302 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (1298) Order [The Noteholder Plaintiffs' Surreply in Opposition to the Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Correct May 7, 2008 Order] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 23, 2008 Filing 1311 Transcript of Proceedings (Telephone Conference) held on 5/2/08, before Judge Mark R Abel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura L Samuels. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 6/13/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2008. (jr)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 ORDER granting #1304 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine E. Russum. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 05/22/2008. (sr)
May 22, 2008 Filing fee for PHV for Katherine E. Russum: $ 200, receipt number COL 3082. (er1 )
May 22, 2008 Filing 1309 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum For Randolph H. Speer issued. (jcw).
May 22, 2008 Filing 1308 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum For Roger S. Faulkenberry issued. (jcw).
May 22, 2008 Filing 1307 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum For Donald H. Ayers issued. (jcw).
May 20, 2008 Filing 1306 RESPONSE in Support re #1302 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1298 Order Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Correct May 7, 2008 Order filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Exhibit C - Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit C - Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit D - Part 1 of 3, #5 Exhibit D - Part 2 of 3, #6 Exhibit D - Part 3 of 3, #7 Exhibit E - Part 1 of 5, #8 Exhibit E - Part 2 of 5, #9 Exhibit E - Part 3 of 5, #10 Exhibit E - Part 4 of 5, #11 Exhibit E - Part 5 of 5, #12 Exhibit F - G, #13 Exhibit H - J) (Brody, Steven)
May 20, 2008 Filing 1305 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation of Deposition of Rebecca S. Parrett (Long, Thomas)
May 20, 2008 Filing 1304 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine E. Russum Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R. Wilkinson, Linda E. Johnson, Executor of the Estate of Harold W. Pote (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
May 19, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 5/19/2008. (mra2, )
May 15, 2008 Filing 1303 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1302 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (1298) Order [Noteholder Plaintiffs' and the UAT's Response in Opposition to the Motion of the Credit Suisse Defendants to Reconsider and Correct May 7, 2008 Order Quashing Credit Suisse's Rule 30(b)(6) Subpoena to GMAC] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 13, 2008 Filing 1302 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1298 Order by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 ORDER granting (1294) Motion to Take Deposition from Brian J. Stucke in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 05/08/2008. (sr)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1300 ORDER granting (1287) Motion to Take Deposition from John A. Snoble in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 05/08/2008. (sr)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 ORDER granting (1282) Motion for Discovery in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA; granting (295) Motion for Discovery in case 2:04-cv-01090-JLG-MRA. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 05/08/2008. (sr)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 ORDER: Quashing Rule 30(b)(6) subpoena issues to GMAC. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 5/07/2008. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Abel, Mark)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 ORDER granting #1267 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, all non-expert discovery deadline is 8-1-2008, expert discovery deadline is 11/28/2008. Counsel to submit a proposed schedule to the court by 6/30/2008. Signed by James L Graham on 5/6/2008. (bw)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 ORDER granting #143 Motion to Dismiss the Pharos complt and granting in part #167 and #175. Signed by James L Graham on 5/2/2008. (bw)
May 2, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 5/2/2008. (mra2, )
May 2, 2008 Filing 1295 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 05/01/2008 re: Subpoena on Thomas Hyland Acknowledgement filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, In Re Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (sr)
May 1, 2008 Filing 1294 MOTION to Take Deposition from Brian Stucke After The Criminal Proceedings Against Him In This Court Are Concluded by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. (Walker, Lawrence)
April 30, 2008 Filing 1293 MOTION to Compel A Two-Day Deposition of Credit Suisse Witness Joseph Donovan by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 30, 2008 Filing 1292 RESPONSE in Support re #1266 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of William Gross and William Powers filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F) (Brody, Steven)
April 29, 2008 Filing 1291 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Notice of May 2, 2008 Telephonic Hearing on Credit Suisse's Motion to Modify the Court's September 20, 2007 Revised Scheduling Order (Levison, Harold)
April 28, 2008 Filing 1290 Response re #1283 Order by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
April 25, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 4/25/2008. (mra2, )
April 25, 2008 Filing 1289 NOTICE by Defendant Swabb Financial LLC of Substitution of Trial Attorney and Appearance (Martin, David)
April 24, 2008 Filing 1288 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
April 22, 2008 Filing 1287 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition from John A. Snoble By Fitch, Inc., and Credit Suisse and by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Walker, Lawrence)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 ORDER/Joint Stipulation of Dismissal w/prejudice re: New Jersey case CV03-1882. Signed by James L Graham on 4/22/2008. (bw)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 ORDER/Joint Stipulation of Dismissal w/prejudice re: New Jersey case CV03-2784. Signed by James L Graham on 4/22/2008. (bw)
April 22, 2008 Filing 1284 STATUS REPORT [Correspondence to Hon. Mark Abel Re: Discovery Dispute Arising from Credit Suisse's Subpoena to Third Party GMAC] by Plaintiff Chandler City of. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 ORDER re #1267 : Counsel to call Magistrate Judge Abel by 4/28/08 to schedule a telephone hearing on Credit Suisse's motion to extend the scheduling deadlines 90 days. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 4/22/08. (kch)
April 21, 2008 Filing 1282 MOTION for Discovery To Take the Depositions of Donald H. Ayers, Roger S. Faulkenberry and Randolph H. Speer by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
April 21, 2008 Filing 1281 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Judge Graham and Magistrate Judge Abel re Joint Stipulations of Dismissal of MetLife's and Lloyds's claims against defendants Bank One, N.A., Banc One Capital Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, JPMorgan Partners LLC, The Beacon Group III - Focus Value Fund, L.P., The Beacon Group, LLC, Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R. Wilkinson, and Linda E. Johnson, Executor of the Estate of Harold W. Pote (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (MetLife - JPMorgan-Bank One Parties), #2 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Lloyds - JPMorgan-Bank One Parties), #3 Certificate of Service) (Levison, Harold)
April 18, 2008 Filing 1280 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1266 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel the Depositions of William Gross and William Powers [The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Response to Credit Suisse's Motion to Compel (Or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protection From) Credit Suisse's Notice of Certain Apex Depositions of Senior PIMCO Executives] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 18, 2008 Filing 1279 RESPONSE to Motion re #1267 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 8/31/2008. Motion by the Credit Suisse Defendants to Modify the Revised Scheduling Order filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Wilkinson, William)
April 17, 2008 PHV Filing fee: For Jeffrey Coviello. $ 200, receipt number 200COL002607 (sr)
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER granting #1277 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Coviello. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 04/17/2008. (sr)
April 16, 2008 Filing 1277 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Coviello Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R. Wilkinson, Linda E. Johnson, Executor or the Estate of Harold W. Pote (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
April 15, 2008 Filing 1276 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Amended Notice of Hearing Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 14, 2008 Filing 1275 RESPONSE in Support re #1267 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 8/31/2008. Motion by the Credit Suisse Defendants to Modify the Revised Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
April 11, 2008 Filing 1274 AGREED ORDER AND JUDGMENT (re: New Jersey cases 03-1882 and 03-2784). Signed by James L Graham on 4/11/2008. (bw)
April 11, 2008 Filing 1273 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (60 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 67 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 58 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 67 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 77 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 60 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 63 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 153 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 60 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 57 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA, 57 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 67 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 1272 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 60 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA) Status Report [Notice of Telephonic Hearing] Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2008 Filing 1272 STATUS REPORT [Correspondence to Hon. Mark Abel] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2008 Filing 1271 Unopposed MOTION Bar Order by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A., Plaintiffs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA (Garland, James)
April 9, 2008 Filing 1270 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1267 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 8/31/2008. Motion by the Credit Suisse Defendants to Modify the Revised Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER granting #476 Motion to Dismiss; The motions to dismiss of the Beacon Entities and JPMorgan (doc. 167, 175) are GRANTED as to Florida complaints (note: those motions remain pending as to the Pharos and Parrett complaints); granting #1221 Motion for Leave to Supplement. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 4/2/08. (kch)
March 31, 2008 Filing 1268 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation re #1267 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 8/31/2008. Motion by the Credit Suisse Defendants to Modify the Revised Scheduling Order (Brody, Steven)
March 28, 2008 Filing 1267 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 8/31/2008. Motion by the Credit Suisse Defendants to Modify the Revised Scheduling Order by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
March 26, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 3/26/2008. (mra2, )
March 25, 2008 Filing 1266 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of William Gross and William Powers by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Susan F. DiCicco, #2 Exhibit A - D, #3 Exhibit E - L) (Brody, Steven)
March 24, 2008 Filing fee: $ 800, receipt number 200COL002244 (PHV for Panarella Callagy Hankin & Lynch) (jr)
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 ORDER granting #1261 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Panarella; granting #1262 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Callagy; granting #1263 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joel A. Hankin; granting #1264 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael C. Lynch. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 3/21/08. (kch)
March 19, 2008 Filing 1264 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael C. Lynch (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
March 19, 2008 Filing 1263 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joel A. Hankin (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
March 19, 2008 Filing 1262 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Callagy (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
March 19, 2008 Filing 1261 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Panarella (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 ORDER granting #1256 , #1257 , #1258 & #1259 Motion for Leave for Marcia A. Griffith, Alexandra Greif, Sarah L. Dunn Phillip Mirrer-Singer to Appeal PHV's on behalf of Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R. Wilkinson and Linda E. Johnson. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 03/17/2008. (sr)
March 17, 2008 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 200COL002175 (phv for Griffith) (jr)
March 17, 2008 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 200COL002174 (phv for Mirrer-Singer) (jr)
March 17, 2008 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 200COL002173 (phv for Dunn) (jr)
March 17, 2008 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 200COL002172 (phv for Greif) (jr)
March 14, 2008 Filing 1259 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Phillip Mirrer-Singer Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R. Wilkinson, and Linda E. Johnson, Executor of the Estate of Harold W. Pote (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
March 14, 2008 Filing 1258 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sarah L. Dunn Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R. Wilkinson, and Linda E. Johnson, Executor of the Estate of Harold Pote (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
March 14, 2008 Filing 1257 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra Greif Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R. Wilkinson, and Linda E. Johnson, Executor of the Estate of Harold W. Pote (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
March 14, 2008 Filing 1256 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marcia A. Griffith Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R. Wilkinson,Linda E. Johnson, Executor of the Estate of Harold W. Pote (Filing fee $ 200) by Defendants Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
March 11, 2008 Filing 1255 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint, Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. by Defendant Linda Johnson, Executor of the Estate of Harold W. Pote. (Lonergan, Kyle) Modified on 3/13/2008 (bw, ).
March 7, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 3/7/2008. (mra2, )
March 6, 2008 Filing 1254 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
March 5, 2008 Filing fee for PHV motion: $ 200.00, receipt number 2004. (kch)
March 5, 2008 Filing 1253 STATUS REPORT and Request for Telephone Hearing by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 ORDER granting #1251 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Miarmi. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 2/28/08. (jcw)
February 27, 2008 Filing 1251 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Miarmi (Filing fee $ 200) by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Fineman, Steven)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 ORDER denying #1173 Motion to Strike. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 2/25/08. (kch)
February 22, 2008 Filing 1249 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2008 before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter: Laura L. Samuels. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (er )
February 22, 2008 Filing 1248 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Lee, Rex)
February 20, 2008 Filing 1247 NOTICE of Settlement between JPMorgan Parties and MetLife/Lloyds Parties by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA (Garland, James)
February 19, 2008 Filing 1246 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation re #1244 Notice (Other) (Brody, Steven)
February 15, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2008. (mra2, )
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 ORDER granting #1240 Motion. Signed by James L. Graham on 02/15/08. (ws)
February 14, 2008 Filing 1244 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
February 14, 2008 Filing 1243 STATUS REPORT Correspondence to the Honorable Mark Abel by Plaintiff Chandler City of. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 14, 2008 Filing 1242 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel re: 30(b)(6) Notices (Levison, Harold)
February 13, 2008 Filing 1241 STATUS REPORT RE SETTLEMENT AMONG CERTAIN PARTIES by Defendant John F Andrews. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Miller, Brian)
February 13, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 2/13/2008. (mra2, )
February 12, 2008 Filing 1240 Joint MOTION For Bar Order by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V., Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Bar Order) (Wilkinson, William)
February 8, 2008 Filing 1239 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Second Amended Complaint of the City of Chandler by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer - Part 2, #2 Answer - Part 3, #3 Answer - Part 4, #4 Answer - Part 5, #5 Answer - Part 6, #6 Answer - Part 7, #7 Answer - Part 8, #8 Answer - Part 9, #9 Answer - Part 10) (Brody, Steven)
February 8, 2008 Filing 1238 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Second Amended Complaint of the State of Arizona by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer - Part 2, #2 Answer - Part 3, #3 Answer - Part 4, #4 Answer - Part 5, #5 Answer - Part 6, #6 Answer - Part 7, #7 Answer - Part 8) (Brody, Steven)
February 8, 2008 Filing 1237 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the First Amended Complaint of Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc. Master Retirement Trust by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer - Part 2, #2 Answer - Part 3, #3 Answer - Part 4, #4 Answer - Part 5, #5 Answer - Part 6, #6 Answer - Part 7, #7 Answer - Part 8) (Brody, Steven)
February 8, 2008 Filing 1236 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint of Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer - Part 2) (Brody, Steven)
February 8, 2008 Filing 1235 ANSWER to #690 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer - Part 2) (Brody, Steven)
February 8, 2008 Filing 1234 ANSWER to #691 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer - Part 2, #2 Answer - Part 3) (Brody, Steven)
February 8, 2008 Filing 1233 ANSWER to #689 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer - Part 2, #2 Answer - Part 3, #3 Answer - Part 4) (Brody, Steven)
February 7, 2008 Filing 1232 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings of Telephone Conference held on 2/4/08 before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter: Patricia L. Shaw. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. (jcw)
February 6, 2008 Filing 1231 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Request for Additional Time to Examine Witnesses (Levison, Harold)
February 5, 2008 Filing 1230 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Request for Additional Time to Examine Witnesses (Levison, Harold)
February 4, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2008. (mra2, )
February 1, 2008 Filing 1229 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
February 1, 2008 Filing 1228 REPLY to Response to Motion re (141 in 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA, 51 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 59 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 53 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 70 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 56 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 53 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 59 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 50 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 53 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 1217 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 51 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 58 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 50 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel [Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Bloomberg Emails by Credit Suisse] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 30, 2008 Filing 1227 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1217 MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Bloomberg Emails by Defendant Credit Suisse filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
January 30, 2008 Filing 1226 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1219 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Production of Bloomberg E-mail [Reply Brief to Credit Suisse's Motion to Compel] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 30, 2008 Filing 1225 MOTION to Compel MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE NEW YORK CITY PENSION FUND PLAINTIFFS' JOINDER IN THE ARIZONA NOTEHOLDERS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE PRODUCTION OF BLOOMBERG E-MAILS BY DEFENDANT CREDIT SUISSE by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Fineman, Steven)
January 30, 2008 Filing 1224 NOTICE by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ABEL RE DISCOVERY (Fineman, Steven)
January 29, 2008 Filing 1223 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Judge Abel re discovery (Levison, Harold)
January 28, 2008 Filing 1222 RESPONSE in Support re #1217 MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Bloomberg Emails by Defendant Credit Suisse and in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Bloomberg E-Mails filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
January 28, 2008 Filing 1221 MOTION Request for Consideration of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motions to Dismiss in Florida Actions re #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #421 Response to Motion, by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Beacon Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wilkinson, William)
January 25, 2008 Filing 1220 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Amendment to #1219 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Production of Bloomberg E-mail Corrected Exhibit 5 to Abou-Rahme Affidavit in Support of Motion to Compel. (Brody, Steven)
January 25, 2008 Filing 1219 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Production of Bloomberg E-mail by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-F, #3 Affidavit of L. Abou-Rahme in Support of Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit 1-3, #5 Exhibit 4-5, #6 Exhibit 6-7) (Brody, Steven)
January 25, 2008 Filing 1218 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Judge Abel re discovery (Levison, Harold)
January 25, 2008 Filing 1217 MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Bloomberg Emails by Defendant Credit Suisse by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 24, 2008 Filing 1216 NOTICE by Defendants Eric R Wilkerson, Linda Johnson, Thomas G. Mendell Letter on behalf of Boisi, Herbst, Bakst, Nahas, and Rosenfeld (Lonergan, Kyle)
January 24, 2008 Filing 1215 NOTICE by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc (Attachments: #1 Letter to Honorable Mark Abel with Attachment, #2 Attachment) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Coster, James)
January 24, 2008 Filing 1214 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (Brody, Steven)
January 24, 2008 Filing 1213 NOTICE by Defendant Fitch, Inc. Letter to the Honorable Mark Abel with Attachment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ehrlich, Andrew)
January 24, 2008 Filing 1212 Response re #1208 Order, by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Wilkinson, William)
January 24, 2008 Filing 1211 NOTICE by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A. re #1203 Notice (Other) Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel with Declaration of C. William Phillips (and Exhibits A & B) (Garland, James)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 ORDER - The Court will treat Mr. Geribon's notice to withdraw as a motion. Mr. Geribon's motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Mr. Geribon on the docket. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 1/24/08. (jcw)
January 23, 2008 Filing 1209 NOTICE by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A. re #1203 Notice (Other) Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Garland, James)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ORDER - Defendants are ORDERED to file a response to plaintiffs' 1/18 letter no later than 1/24/08. If a defendant is unable to comply with the Court's scheduling orders. it should provide an affidavit(s) setting out the facts that preclude compliance. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 1/23/08. (jcw)
January 23, 2008 Filing 1207 Notice of Correction - Per attorney, document 1205 deleted as it was not correctly filed and re-filed as document #1206 . (jcw)
January 22, 2008 Filing 1206 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel with Attachment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Brody, Steven)
January 22, 2008 Filing 1205 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
January 22, 2008 Filing 1204 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 11, 2008 before Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter: Laura Samuels. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. (sr)
January 18, 2008 Filing 1203 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel re Deposition Schedule (Levison, Harold)
January 18, 2008 Filing 1202 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Abu Dhabi Investment Company's Claims Against Defendants Barbara Poulsen, Lance Poulsen, Kuld Corp., and Rebecca Parrett Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 18, 2008 Filing 1201 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York (Geribon, Hector) Modified on 1/22/2008 to clarify text (kk2).
January 17, 2008 Filing 1200 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Abu Dhabi Investment Company's Claims Against Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. and Donald H. Ayers Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 16, 2008 Filing 1199 NOTICE by Defendant Mitchell Stein of Substitution of Trial Attorney (Martin, David)
January 11, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 1/11/2008. (mra2, )
January 9, 2008 Filing 1198 NOTICE by Defendant John F Andrews of Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel re request for telephone conference to address discovery issues (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
January 9, 2008 Filing 1197 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 ORDER granting #1185 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation answer due 2/8/2008. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/9/08. (kch)
January 9, 2008 Filing 1195 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York (Geribon, Hector)
January 8, 2008 Filing 1194 Response to DE 1191 - Correspondence to Honorable Mark Abel by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 8, 2008 Filing 1193 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #1122 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Motion to Dismiss and of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiffs Larry R White, Gary Davis, Laurie Davis, Donna Schrader, Glenn Schrader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Arnold, James)
January 8, 2008 Filing 1192 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Larry R White, Gary Davis, Laurie Davis, Donna Schrader, Glenn Schrader of Firm Name Change Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Arnold, James)
January 8, 2008 Filing 1191 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1#2 Exhibit A - Part 2#3 Exhibit A - Part 3#4 Exhibit B - G) (Brody, Steven)
January 4, 2008 Filing 1190 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V., Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, Linda Johnson, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Partners, L.P., Bank One, N.A. Letter Requesting The Court To Refrain From Ruling On Certain Motions To Dismiss While Settlement Is Finalized (Callagy, John)
January 4, 2008 Filing 1189 STATUS REPORT Letter to the Court Regarding PIMCO Documents by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 3, 2008 Filing 1188 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Notice of Request for Additional Time to Examine Witnesses by Other Examiners MetLife and Lloyds (Levison, Harold)
January 2, 2008 Filing 1187 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Request for Additional Time to Examine Witnesses by Other Examiners The Arizona Noteholders and the UAT Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
December 31, 2007 Filing 1186 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V., Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Eric R Wilkerson, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Linda Johnson, Thomas G. Mendell, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A. Notice of Settlement & Letter to All Counsel/Parties Regarding Depositions (Callagy, John)
December 26, 2007 Filing 1185 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 2/8/2008. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Brody, Steven)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/21/2007. (mra2, )
December 20, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2007. (mra2, )
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (177); Motion to Dismiss: granting in part and denying in part (242). Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 12-20-07. (ws)
December 19, 2007 Filing 1182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1173 MOTION to Strike (1165 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 56 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1168 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (57 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) MOTION to Strike (1165 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 56 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1168 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (57 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Linda Johnson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Wilkinson, William)
December 18, 2007 Filing 1181 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
December 17, 2007 Filing 1180 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Letter to Magistrate Abel (Brody, Steven)
December 17, 2007 Filing 1179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation re #1178 Notice (Other) (Brody, Steven)
December 7, 2007 Filing 1178 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation re #1177 Order,, Letter to Magistrate Abel regarding 12/5/07 Discovery Conference Order (Brody, Steven)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ORDER: If dispute is not resolved, simultaneous submissions to be made to the Court 1/9/08. Counsel will initiate a telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Abel on 1/11/08 at 2:30 p.m. It is ORDERED that all parties should make every effort to make supplemental productions relevent to a scheduled witness deposition no later than 5 business days before the deposition. It is ORDERED that by 12/17/07, plaitniffs' counsel provide defendant's counsel with a full report on the status of their clients' email searches and productions. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/5/07. (kch)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 ORDER granting #1175 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Alexander D. Widell). Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/5/07. (kch)
December 3, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 12/3/2007. (mra2, )
November 30, 2007 Filing fee for PHV for Widell: $ 200, receipt number COL 592. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (er )
November 30, 2007 Filing 1175 MOTION for Leave for Alexander D. Widell to Appear Pro Hac Vice obo Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:03-cv-00362-ALM-MRA (er )
November 26, 2007 Filing 1174 NOTICE by Defendant Fitch, Inc. LETTER to the HONORABLE MARK ABEL (Ehrlich, Andrew)
November 26, 2007 Filing 1173 MOTION to Strike (1165 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 56 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1168 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (57 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs Lance K Poulson, Barbara Poulsen, Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA (Haller, John)
November 26, 2007 Filing 1172 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Judge Abel (Levison, Harold)
November 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER: Ruling on the request of defendants Bank One N.A., Bank One Capital Markets, Credit Suisse, Moody's, Fitch, and Kaye Scholer for two-day depositions of Amy Vespasiano (Lloyds' Rule 30(b)(6) witness); Charles Scully (MetLife's Rule 30(b)(6) witness); and Mei-Feng Tau (a MetLife employee). Also ruling on the request of Kaye Scholer, JPMorgan, Bank One and Credit Suise for a 5/3 split of the deposition time for Fitch witnesses. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/23/2007. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Abel, Mark)
November 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER: The Noteholder Plaintiffs' November 9, 2007 motion for a protective order (doc. 1150) was GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/23/2007. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Abel, Mark)
November 20, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2007. (mra2, )
November 20, 2007 Filing 1169 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Request for Additional Time to Examine Witnesses by Other Examiners the Arizona Noteholders and the UAT Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 20, 2007 Filing 1168 NOTICE by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Linda Johnson, Thomas G. Mendell Amended Notice of Filing New Criminal Complaint Against Lance Poulsen for Obstruction of Justice and Witness Tampering (on behalf of Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Linda E. Johson, Executor of the Estate of Harold W. Pote, and Thomas G. Mendell) (Attachments: #1 Poulsen Complaint) (Lonergan, Kyle)
November 20, 2007 Filing 1167 NOTICE by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc letter in regards to the Vespasiano deposition (Coster, James)
November 19, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 11/19/2007. (mra2, )
November 19, 2007 Filing 1166 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Judge Abel (Levison, Harold)
November 19, 2007 Filing 1165 NOTICE by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Linda Johnson, Thomas G. Mendell Notice of Filing New Criminal Complaint Against Lance Poulsen for Obstruction of Justice and Witness Tampering (on behalf of Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Linda E. Johson, Executor of the Estate of Harold W. Pote, and Thomas G. Mendell) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Lonergan, Kyle)
November 19, 2007 Filing 1164 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Notice of Hearing (Levison, Harold)
November 19, 2007 Filing 1163 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, In Re Credit Suisse First Boston Corp Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel (DiCicco, Susan)
November 19, 2007 Filing 1162 NOTICE by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc letter regarding deposition issue (Coster, James)
November 19, 2007 Filing 1161 NOTICE by Defendant Fitch, Inc. Letter to Judge Abel (Ehrlich, Andrew)
November 19, 2007 Filing 1160 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1150 MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration [Joinder in Credit Suisse Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Rulre 30(b)(6) Topics] filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
November 19, 2007 Filing 1159 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Judge Abel (Levison, Harold)
November 18, 2007 Filing 1158 NOTICE by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A. re #1155 Notice (Other) Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel (Garland, James)
November 16, 2007 Filing 1157 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1150 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 36 in 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA, 41 in 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 36 in 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 34 in 2:04-cv-00325-JLG-MRA, 42 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 35 in 2:04-cv-01035-JLG-MRA, 39 in 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 42 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 36 in 2:05-cv-00971-JLG-MRA, 37 in 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA, 52 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA, 34 in 2:04-cv-00330-JLG-MRA, 34 in 2:04-cv-00332-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration Joinder to Credit Suisse Defendants' Opposition filed by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Garland, James)
November 16, 2007 Filing 1156 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (52 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Hearing Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 16, 2007 Filing 1155 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel (Levison, Harold)
November 16, 2007 Filing 1154 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1150 MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., State of Arizona, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, City of Chandler Arizona et al., In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
November 15, 2007 Filing 1153 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re (52 in 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Protective Order Notice Re: Scheduling of Teleconference Hearing Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 14, 2007 Filing 1152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation re #1151 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Brody, Steven)
November 13, 2007 Filing 1151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1150 MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of L. Abou-Rahme#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B - C#4 Exhibit D - I) (Brody, Steven)
November 9, 2007 Filing 1150 MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D (Part 1 of 2)#5 Exhibit D (Part 2 of 2)) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 ORDER granting #1147 Motion to relieve Donna Schrader from service as a lead pltf. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 11/5/2007. (bw)
November 2, 2007 Filing 1148 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION CALENDAR FIRST NINETY DAYS OF DISCOVERY Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 2, 2007 Filing 1147 Unopposed MOTION to Relieve Donna Schrader from Service as Lead Plaintiff by Plaintiff Larry R White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Arnold, James)
November 2, 2007 Filing 1146 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. OMNIBUS CROSS-NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONS TO BE TAKEN IN NCFE MDL FOR USE IN NCFE BANKRUPTCY ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS AND CLAIM OBJECTIONS Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 1, 2007 Filing 1145 Mail Returned #1117 as Undeliverable (Return To Sender - Moved Left No Address). Mail sent to Luan K. Phan on 10/09/2007. (sr)
October 31, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2007. (mra2, )
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 Case Management Order. Adopts procedures for dividing deposition time. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/31/2007. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Abel, Mark)
October 31, 2007 Filing 1143 NOTICE by Plaintiff Rebecca S Parrett of Voluntary Dismissal of Purcell & Scott, LPA and Timothy J. Kincaid Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA (Zacks, Benjamin)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ORDER granting #1141 Motion for Extension of Time. Extended to 11/28/07. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/30/07. (kch)
October 29, 2007 Filing 1141 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/28/2007. to Serve Responses to Discovery Requests in the Florida e-MedSoft Cases by In Re Frank P Magliochetti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bilik, R)
October 29, 2007 Filing 1140 NOTICE by In Re Frank P Magliochetti of Appeararnce by Scott S. Balber and Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Bilik, R)
October 29, 2007 Filing 1139 NOTICE by In Re Frank P Magliochetti of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bilik, R)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 ORDER granting on condition #1136 Motion for Leave for Elizabeth J. Averill to Appear PHV as co-counsel for Bank One, N.A. and Banc One Capitol Markets, Inc. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/29/2007. (sr)
October 26, 2007 PHV Filing fee: For Elizabeth J. Averill, Esq. $ 200, receipt number COL000017 (sr)
October 26, 2007 Filing 1137 Mail Returned #1117 as Undeliverable (Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable To Forward). Mail sent to Acci/Allcare of Pennsylvania, nia on 10/09/2007. (sr)
October 26, 2007 Filing 1136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth J. Averill. Filing fee $ 200. by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Alexander, David)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER granting #1128 Motion for Extension of Time. Extended to 10/29/07. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/24/07. (kch)
October 22, 2007 Filing 1134 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER denying #1130 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/19/2007. (bw)
October 18, 2007 Filing 1132 Mail Returned #1113 as Undeliverable (Return To Sender - Not Deliverable As Addressed Unable To Forward). Mail sent to Luan K. Phan on 10/04/2007. (sr)
October 18, 2007 Filing 1131 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1130 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (1126) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion to Stay The Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of the Court's 10/12/07 Order MOTION for Reconsideration re (1126) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion to Stay The Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of the Court's 10/12/07 Order [RESPONSE OF ARIZONA NOTEHOLDERS, MET LIFE, LLOYDS AND UNENCUMBERED ASSETS TRUST IN OPPOSITION TO CSFB'S THIRD MOTION (1130) CONTESTING SCHEDULING ORDER] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
October 16, 2007 Filing 1130 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1126 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion to Stay The Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of the Court's 10/12/07 Order by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brody, Steven)
October 16, 2007 Filing 1129 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. re #1127 Notice (Other) Response to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s October 13, 2007 Letter to the Court (Lee, Rex)
October 15, 2007 Filing 1128 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/29/2007. to Serve Responses to Discovery Requests in the Florida e-MedSoft Cases by In Re Frank P Magliochetti. (Bilik, R)
October 13, 2007 Filing 1127 NOTICE by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC re #1118 Notice (Other) Reply to ING's Response to Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wilkinson, William)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1094 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying as moot #1110 Motion to Stay and overrules the objections in #1111 . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/12/2007. (bw)
October 12, 2007 Filing 1125 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1110 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Stay Magistrate's September 26, 2007 Case Management Conference Order Pending Ruling Upon Objections of the Credit Suisse Defendants PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON'S OBJECTIONS TO AND APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE ABEL'S SEPTEMBER 26, 2007 SCHEDULING ORDER [D. E. NOS. 1111 AND 1110] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 ORDER granting #1119 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/11/07. (kch)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 ORDER denying #1029 Motion to modify the 6/14/2007 scheduling order to lift the discovery as to the founders. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/11/2007. (bw)
October 11, 2007 Filing 1122 NOTICE by Defendant John F Andrews re (153 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaints, (154 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints - Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
October 11, 2007 Filing 1121 Objection re #1111 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court Partial Joinder in Credit Suisse's Objection to Magistrate Judge's September 26 Order by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
October 10, 2007 Filing 1120 Objection re #1095 Order Partial Joinder in CSFB's Objection to September 26, 2007, Case Management Order by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Beacon Group, LLC. (Wilkinson, William)
October 10, 2007 Filing 1119 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/15/2007. to Serve Responses to JPMorgan Chase & Co., The Beacon Group LLC and The Beacon Group III - Focus Value Fund, L.P.'s Discovery Requests in the Florida Cases by Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, John F Andrews, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti. (Bilik, R)
October 10, 2007 Filing 1118 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. re #1115 Notice (Other) Letter in Response to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Request for Reconsideration (Lee, Rex)
October 9, 2007 Filing 1117 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Howard D DuBosar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (srj)
October 9, 2007 Filing 1116 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE MEMBERS Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
October 8, 2007 Filing 1115 NOTICE by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC re #1108 Order, Letter Requesting Reconsideration of October 2, 2007, Order Concerning ING (Wilkinson, William)
October 8, 2007 Filing 1114 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. AMENDED EMAIL SERVICE LISTS Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 ORDER granting #1109 Motion for Extension of Time until 10/15/07 to serve written responses and objections to written discovery requests served by Lead Plaintiffs in the Florida cases. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/04/07. (srj)
October 3, 2007 Filing 1112 REPLY to Response to Motion Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Credit Suisse Defendants' Expedited Motion to (1) Extend the Period for Fact Discovery, (2) Establish a Period for Expert Discovery Thereafter, (3) Provide a Deadline for Filing Summary Judgment Motions, and (4) Convene a Conference with the Court at Its Earliest Convenience filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
October 3, 2007 Filing 1111 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C) (Brody, Steven)
October 3, 2007 Filing 1110 MOTION to Stay Magistrate's September 26, 2007 Case Management Conference Order Pending Ruling Upon Objections of the Credit Suisse Defendants by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
October 3, 2007 Filing 1109 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/15/2007. to Serve Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests in the Florida Cases by Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, John F Andrews, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti. (Bilik, R)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ORDER: Given the May 31, 2008 discovery deadline and the volume of depositions anticipated by the parties, it is important that two weeks of depositions be held in November. If ING Bank cannot produce all the archived emails by October 31, it must consult with requesting counsel and prioritize production so that it will not interfere with the parties ability to go forward with the November depositions. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/01/07. (srj)
October 2, 2007 Filing 1107 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence David Walker In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA (Walker, Lawrence)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER granting #1102 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hav vice on the condition that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, counsel register for electronic filing. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/02/07. (srj)
October 2, 2007 Filing 1105 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re (731 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint of Lloyds Bank, (1083 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Supplemental - Opposing, (1072 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Supplemental - Supporting, Moody's Reply to Lloyd's Response to Moody's Supplemental Memorandum [Doc. 1072] filed by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA (Walker, Lawrence)
October 1, 2007 Filing 1104 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. re #1100 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Reply to JPMorgan Chase Bank Letter dated September 29, 2007 (Lee, Rex)
October 1, 2007 Filing 1103 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. EMAIL SERVICE LISTS Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
September 28, 2007 Filing 1102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert M. Millimet by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. Filing fee $ 200. (kch)
September 28, 2007 Filing fee for PHV: $ 200.00, receipt number 258134. (kch)
September 28, 2007 Filing 1101 RESPONSE in Opposition [PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO DOCKET ENTRY 1094, DEFENDANT CSFB'S MOTION TO SET A PRETRIAL SCHEDULE CONCLUDING IN THE YEAR 2010 filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
September 28, 2007 Filing 1100 NOTICE by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC re #1096 Notice (Other) Response to ING's Letter Dated September 26, 2007, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E) (Wilkinson, William)
September 27, 2007 Filing 1099 NOTICE of Appearance by Tobias J Stern Defendant Fitch, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA (Stern, Tobias)
September 27, 2007 Filing 1098 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Ehrlich Defendant Fitch, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA (Ehrlich, Andrew)
September 27, 2007 Filing 1097 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Tarver Mason Defendant Fitch, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA (Mason, Julia)
September 26, 2007 Filing 1096 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel Seeking Clarification of Case Management Order (Lee, Rex)
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: re: Production of Documents and Deposition schedule. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/26/07. (kch)
September 25, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2007. (mra2, )
September 25, 2007 Filing 1094 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 8/31/2009. Expedited Motion to 1) Extend the Period for Fact Discovery, 2) Establish a Period for Expert Discovery, 3) Provide a Deadline for Filing Summary Judgment Motions, and 4) Convene a Conference with the Court at its Earliest Convenience by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brody, Steven)
September 25, 2007 Filing 1093 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. REQUEST FOR EMAIL SERVICE LISTS Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1092 NOTICE by Plaintiff Chandler City of NOTICE OF DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS FOR CONFERENCE CALL WITH MAGISTRATE ABEL ON SEPTEMBER 25, 2007 AT 9:30 A.M., EASTERN TIME Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1091 NOTICE by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. Correspondence with Magistrate Judge Mark Abel (David, Israel)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1090 NOTICE by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc Re Correspondence with Magistrate Judge Mark Able (Coster, James)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1089 NOTICE by Defendants John F Andrews, John F Andrews, John F Andrews of Correspondence re Depositions Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Miller, Brian)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1088 NOTICE by Defendant Fitch, Inc. Correspondence with Magistrate Judge Abel (Flumenbaum, Martin)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1087 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Correspondence with Magistrate Judge Abel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order) (Brody, Steven)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1086 NOTICE by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC re #1077 Notice (Other) (Callagy, John)
September 24, 2007 Filing 1085 NOTICE by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A. Correspondence with Magistrate Judge Abel Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Garland, James)
September 21, 2007 Filing 1084 Response by Plaintiff State of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Deposition Schedule) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
September 21, 2007 Filing 1083 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #1078 Supplemental - Supporting, #1072 Supplemental - Supporting, Response of Lloyds TSB Bank plc to The Suggestions of Additional Authority of Moody's Investors Service, Inc. and Fitch, Inc. filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
September 20, 2007 Mail Returned as Undeliverable doc 1075. Returned marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed". Mail sent to Luan K Phan. (srj)
September 20, 2007 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/31/2008. Dispositive motions due by 9/2/2008. (sr)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER extending the discoverydeadline to 5/31/2008 and the motion filing deadline to 9/2/2008. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 9/20/2007. (bw)
September 17, 2007 Filing 1081 Response Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
September 17, 2007 Filing 1080 RESPONSE in Support re (20 in 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 20 in 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA, 1065 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Reinstate Discovery Stay filed by Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, John F Andrews, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re Frank P Magliochetti. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
September 17, 2007 Filing 1079 Response Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Levison, Harold)
September 14, 2007 Filing 1078 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #160 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Lloyd's TSB Bank's Second Amended Complaint, #228 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss NYC Pension Funds' First Amended Complaint //Suggestion of Additional Authority filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Flumenbaum, Martin)
September 13, 2007 Filing 1077 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Correspondence to the Honorable Mark Abel Re: Discovery Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
September 12, 2007 Filing 1076 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1008 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Reconsideration And Modification, as to Defendant R.J. Gold & Company, P.C., Of Order Lifting Discovery Stay filed by Plaintiffs Michael Mahoney, Larry R White, John P. Houlihan, In Re Louis Janssen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Arnold, James)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER granting #1073 Motion to Substitute Party. Linda Johnson rep by Roy L Mason and John Edward Haller added. H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson terminated. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/11/07. (srj)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER: It is ORDERED that defendant-on-defendant interrogatories be served on or before 9/14/07; that defendant-on-defendant deposition requests be served on or before 9/7/07; and that defendant-on defendant document requests be served on or before 9/7/07. Poulsen and Ayres are ORDERED to serve their document requests and interrogatories on plaintiffs on or before 9/5/07. The Poulsens as plaintiffs are ORDERED to serve their nonduplicative document requests and interrogatories on or before 9/14/07. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/6/07. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (srj). Modified on 9/12/2007 to reattach Order after being inadvertantly deleled by Clerk (srj ).
September 7, 2007 Filing 1073 MOTION to Substitute Party Estate of Harold W. Pote for Defendant Harold W. Pote by Plaintiffs Lance K Poulson, Barbara Poulsen. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:06-cv-00843-JLG-MRA (Haller, John)
September 6, 2007 Filing 1072 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re (731 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint of Lloyds Bank filed by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA (Walker, Lawrence)
August 31, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 8/31/2007. (mra2, )
August 31, 2007 Filing 1071 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen re #1070 Response (non motion), Response (non motion) of Letter to Judge Graham and Magistrate Judge Abel re Discovery (Haller, John)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1070 Response to the August 30, 2007 Letter Submitted By Counsel for Lance and Barbara Poulsen by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Wilkinson, Eric R., Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group, LLC. (Lonergan, Kyle)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1069 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation of Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel (Long, Thomas)
August 30, 2007 Filing 1068 NOTICE by In Re Credit Suisse First Boston Corp of Status Conference (Long, Thomas)
August 28, 2007 Filing 1067 MOTION for Substitution of the Estate of Harold W. Pote for Defendant Harold W. Pote and Memorandum in Support Thereof by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
August 27, 2007 Filing 1066 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Motion for Substitution of the Estate of Harold W. Pote for Defendant Harold W. Pote by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
August 23, 2007 Filing 1065 MOTION To Reinstate Discovery Stay (CORRECTED) re (1064 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION To Reinstate Discovery Stay by Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, John F Andrews, Suzanne K Hosch, John F Andrews, John F Andrews, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
August 23, 2007 Filing 1064 MOTION To Reinstate Discovery Stay by Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, John F Andrews, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
August 13, 2007 Filing 1063 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1029 Joint MOTION re #991 Scheduling OrderJoint MOTION re #991 Scheduling Order filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Eric R Wilkerson, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Thomas G. Mendell, Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Wilkinson, William)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER granting #629 Motion for Leave to File; denying #1008 Motion for Reconsideration and granting #144 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 8/13/2007. (bw)
August 2, 2007 Filing 1061 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #1056 Supplemental - Supporting, filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
August 1, 2007 Filing 1060 NOTICE by Plaintiff Rebecca S Parrett of Revised Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Against Kuld Corp., E&D Investments, Inc., Lance K. Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H. Ayers, Elise C. Ayers, Susan E. Kincaid, Cary W. Purcell, Joanne D. Purcell, Randolph J. Speer, Deborah E. Speer, Craig W. Porter, Richard Heuer and Slade Hefner Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA (Zacks, Benjamin)
July 31, 2007 Filing 1059 MOTION for Joinder to Lance Poulsen's Memorandum in Opposition to Joint Motion of Certain Defendants to Modify The Court's June 14, 2007 Scheduling Order to Lift The Discovery Stay As To The Founders by In Re Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Dickerson, Brian)
July 30, 2007 Filing 1058 BRIEF re(1028 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1036 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Response (non motion), Response (non motion), Response (non motion), Response (non motion) by Cross Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
July 30, 2007 Filing 1057 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1029 Joint MOTION re #991 Scheduling OrderJoint MOTION re #991 Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Lance K. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
July 25, 2007 Filing 1056 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re (731 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint of Lloyds Bank filed by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00326-JLG-MRA (Walker, Lawrence)
July 25, 2007 Filing 1055 NOTICE by Defendant Lance K. Poulsen of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material (Haller, John)
July 24, 2007 Filing 1054 NOTICE by Defendant Purcell & Scott Co LPA of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material (Fornshell, Matthew)
July 23, 2007 Filing 1053 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to doc 1033. Mail sent to Luan K. Phan marked Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to forward. (srj )
July 20, 2007 Filing 1052 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #160 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Lloyd's TSB Bank's Second Amended Complaint /Fitch, Inc.'s Reply to Lloyds TSB Bank PLC's Response to the Suggestion of Additional Authorities of Fitch, Inc., dated July 20, 2007, with Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Davis, Evan)
July 20, 2007 Filing 1051 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1008 MOTION for Reconsideration And Modification, as to Defendant R.J. Gold & Company, P.C., Of Order Lifting Discovery Stay (Reply In Support of Motion For Reconsideration And Modification, As To Defendant R.J. Gold & Company, P.C., Of Order Lifting Discovery Stay) filed by In Re RJ Gold & Company. (Wojcik, Lawrence)
July 19, 2007 Filing 1050 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Flumenbaum Defendant Fitch, Inc. (Flumenbaum, Martin)
July 18, 2007 Filing 1049 NOTICE of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material By Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz (Long, Thomas)
July 17, 2007 Filing 1048 RESPONSE to Motion re #1029 Joint MOTION re #991 Scheduling OrderJoint MOTION re #991 Scheduling Order Joinder of Plaintiffs MetLife and Lloyds to the AZ Plaintiffs' and UAT's Response to the JPMorgan Defendants' Motion to Lift the Discovery Stay as to the Founders filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
July 17, 2007 Filing 1047 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-01097-JLG (Brody, Steven)
July 17, 2007 Filing 1046 NOTICE by In Re Donald H Ayers re (1034 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Protective Order of Designation of Confidential Discovery Materials By Donald H. Ayers Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-01097-JLG (Dickerson, Brian)
July 17, 2007 Filing 1045 NOTICE of Change of Address by George E Ridge Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Ridge, George)
July 17, 2007 Filing 1044 NOTICE by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material (Miller, Tiffany)
July 16, 2007 Filing 1043 NOTICE by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, LLP Of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Brown, Philip)
July 16, 2007 Filing 1042 RESPONSE to Motion re #1008 MOTION for Reconsideration And Modification, as to Defendant R.J. Gold & Company, P.C., Of Order Lifting Discovery Stay filed by Plaintiffs Michael Mahoney, Louis Janssen, Larry R White, John P. Houlihan. (Arnold, James)
July 13, 2007 Filing 1041 NOTICE by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-01097-JLG (Wilkinson, William)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: On or before 8/10/07, counsel should circulate proposed interrogatories to all counsel on their side of the case. On or before 8/24/07, counsel should circulate additional or re-drafted interrogatories. All interrogatories should be served on or before 8/31/07. On or before 8/10/07, counsel should circulate proposed document requests to all counsel on their side of the case. On or before 8/24/07, counsel should circulate additional or re-drafted document requests. All document requests should be served on or before 8/31/07. On or before 8/10/07, counsel for plaintiffs and defendants should meet and confer separately about establishing a deposition schedule. On or before 8/24/07, counsel should circulate the names of any additional proposed deponents and a brief description of the subject matter areas to be covered to counsel on their side of the case. On or before 8/31/07, counsel for plaintiffs and defedants should exchange their lists of proposed deponents and a brief description of the subject matter areas to be covered. On or before 9/14/07, counsel for all parties should confer and commit to the schedule for the first three months of depositions. That schedule should be provided to the Court on or before 9/21/07. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/13/07. (kch)
July 12, 2007 Filing 1039 NOTICE by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One National Association, Bank One, N.A., Bank One NA, Bank One NA, Bank One NA, Bank One NA, Bank One NA, Bank One NA Confidentiality Designation Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Garland, James)
July 12, 2007 Filing 1038 NOTICE by Plaintiff Rebecca S Parrett of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Against Kuld Corp., E&D Investments, Inc., Lance K. Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H. Ayers, Elise C. Ayers, Susan E. Kincaid, Cary W. Purcell, Joanne D. Purcell, Randolph J. Speer, Deborah E. Speer, Craig W. Porter, Richard Heuer and Slade Hefner Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00329-JLG-MRA (Zacks, Benjamin)
July 12, 2007 Notice of Correction: Former docket #1034 (Protective Order) deleted and re-filed by Clerk as current docket #1037 (Protective Order) to correct document. (kch)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/12/07. (kch)
July 12, 2007 Filing 1036 Response re (1028 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) to Notice of Defendants Thomas G. Mendell and JP Morgan Chase Co. To Grant Unopposed Motions to Dimiss Crossclaims of Defendants Donald H. Ayers and E & D Investments, Inc. or in the alternative, Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition Instanter to Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co. and Thomas Mendell's Motions to Dismiss Donald H. Ayers' and E & D Investments' Cross-Claims by Defendants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers, Cross Claimants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Errata E#7 Exhibit 1#8 Exhibit 2) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Dickerson, Brian)
July 11, 2007 Filing 1035 RESPONSE to Motion re (1029 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Joint MOTION re (991) Scheduling OrderJoint MOTION re (991) Scheduling Order The Arizona Noteholders' and The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Response to the JP Morgan Defendants' Motion to Lift the Discovery Stay as to the Founders filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 07/11/2007. (sr)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 ORDER granting #1004 Motion for Protective Order; granting #1006 Motion for Protective Order. It is ORDERED that all of the documents - the database and the hard copies - produced by the UAT are produced subject to the global protective order. Any motion objecting to the production based on relevancy must be filed on or before 08/10/2007. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 07/11/2007. (sr)
July 11, 2007 Filing 1032 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice of Disclosure Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
July 11, 2007 Filing 1031 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #1017 Supplemental - Supporting, filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
July 10, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 7/10/2007. (mra2, )
July 10, 2007 Filing 1030 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Lee, Rex)
July 10, 2007 Filing 1029 Joint MOTION re #991 Scheduling Order by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D) (Wilkinson, William)
July 10, 2007 Filing 1028 NOTICE by Cross Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell re (873 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss DONALD H. AYERS' AND E&D INVESTMENTS' CROSS CLAIMS, (874 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Defendants Donald Ayers and E&D Investments, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00328-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00333-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00334-JLG-MRA (Wilkinson, William)
July 9, 2007 Filing 1027 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Return To Sender Attempted No Known Unable To Forward). Mail #1002 sent to Luan K. Phan on 06/25/2007. (sr)
July 9, 2007 Filing 1026 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #1004 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Healthcare Capital LLC, Intercontinental Investment Associates, Kachina, Inc., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kuld Corp, Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
July 5, 2007 Filing 1025 Response re #1003 Supplemental - Supporting,, to Defendant John Andrews' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Michael Mahoney, Louis Janssen, Larry R White, John P. Houlihan. (Arnold, James)
July 3, 2007 Filing 1024 Response re #999 Response (non motion), Response (non motion) Credit Suisse Defendants' Limited Opposition to Proposed Case Management Order by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Brody, Steven)
July 2, 2007 Filing 1023 T. Mendel's and E. Wilkinson's ANSWER to Complaint Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. (DE 64) by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
July 2, 2007 Filing 1022 T. Mendel's and E. Wilkinson's ANSWER to Amended Complaint Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company (DE 690) by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
July 2, 2007 Filing 1021 T. Mende's and E. Wilkinson's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Lloyds TSB Bank PLC (DE 64) by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
July 2, 2007 Filing 1020 T. Mendel and E. Wilkinson's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff ING Bank, N.V. (D.E. 640) by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
July 2, 2007 Filing 1019 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25 (a) by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Lonergan, Kyle)
June 29, 2007 Filing 1018 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. "Notice of Disclosure" Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
June 28, 2007 Filing 1017 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #160 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Lloyd's TSB Bank's Second Amended Complaint /Suggestion of Additional Authorities, Dated June 28, 2007, with Certificate of Service, filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Davis, Evan)
June 28, 2007 Filing 1016 RESPONSE to Motion re #1006 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 ORDER re #1006 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Thomas G. Mendell, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, Eric R. Wilkinson, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group, LLC, JPMorgan Partners, LLC and #1004 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Healthcare Capital LLC, Barbara L. Poulsen, Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Intercontinental Investment Associates, Kachina, Inc., Kuld Corp, Lance K. Poulsen. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/27/07. (kch)
June 27, 2007 Filing 1014 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Frederic Brown Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Brown, Robert)
June 27, 2007 Filing 1013 MOTION for Protective Order "The Arizona Noteholders' And The UnEncumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Entry Omnibus Protective Order" by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
June 26, 2007 Filing 1012 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1006 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Joint MOTION for Protective Order, (1004 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Emergency MOTION for Protective Order Credit Suisse Defendants Limited Opposition to Motions for Protective Orders filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-01097-JLG (Brody, Steven)
June 26, 2007 Filing 1011 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY SUBPOENAS SERVED BY VARIOUS PARTIES ON THE UNENCUMBERED ASSETS TRUSTS by Defendant E & D Investments, In Re Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Dickerson, Brian)
June 26, 2007 Filing 1010 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharlene I Chance In Re Donald H Ayers Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Chance, Sharlene)
June 26, 2007 Filing 1009 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
June 26, 2007 Filing 1008 MOTION for Reconsideration And Modification, as to Defendant R.J. Gold & Company, P.C., Of Order Lifting Discovery Stay by In Re RJ Gold & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Wojcik, Lawrence)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER re #1006 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and #1004 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order: A telephone conference will be held on Wednesday, June 27, 2007 at 11am regarding these motions. Any party who wishes to be heard on these matters is DIRECTED to call (866)244-8528 at 11am on June 27, 2007. The participant passcode is 645151. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/26/07. (srj )
June 25, 2007 Filing 1006 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Wilkinson, William)
June 25, 2007 Filing 1005 NOTICE by Defendants Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Healthcare Capital LLC, Intercontinental Investment Associates, Kachina, Inc., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kuld Corp, Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen re #1004 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order (Haller, John)
June 25, 2007 Filing 1004 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Healthcare Capital LLC, Intercontinental Investment Associates, Kachina, Inc., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kuld Corp, Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
June 25, 2007 Filing 1003 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re (153 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaints, (154 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints - Memorandum in Support (Notice of Supplemental Authority) filed by Defendants John F Andrews, John F Andrews, John F Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1#2 Exhibit A Part 2#3 Exhibit A Part 3#4 Exhibit A part 4) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Miller, Brian)
June 25, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Eric R. Wilkinson answer due 7/2/2007; Thomas G. Mendell answer due 7/2/2007; Harold W Pote answer due 7/2/2007. (srj )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 ORDER granting #994 Motion for Extension of Time to answer amended complaints. Extended to 7/2/07. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/25/07. (srj )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER granting #995 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Jeffrey P. Campisi (co-counsel for lead Plaintiffs). Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/25/07. (srj )
June 25, 2007 Filing 1000 NOTICE by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP of Filing of Proof of Service of Subpoena (Murray, Joseph)
June 25, 2007 Filing 999 Response re #991 Scheduling Order by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed CMO#2 Exhibit Letter From Mr. Poulsen's Counsel) (Wilkinson, William)
June 25, 2007 Filing 998 NOTICE of Change of Address by James M Garland (Garland, James)
June 22, 2007 Filing 997 Response re #996 Response (non motion) The Arizona Noteholders' and The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Response to Credit Suisse's June 22, 2007 Letter to the Court Regarding Discovery by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 22, 2007 Filing 996 Response re (991 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) Scheduling Order by In Re Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Long, Thomas)
June 22, 2007 Filing 995 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey P. Campisi. Filing fee $ 200. by Plaintiffs Michael Mahoney, John P. Houlihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00327-JLG-MRA, 2:04-cv-00331-JLG-MRA (Arnold, James)
June 22, 2007 Filing 994 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/2/2007. Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer the Second Amended Complaint of Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. (Pharos) (MDL DE 64), the Amended Complaint of ING Bank N.V. (ING) (MDL DE 640), the Fourth Amended Complaint of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company (MetLife) (MDL DE 690), and the Fourth Amended Complaint of Lloyds TSB Bank PLC (Lloyds) (MDL DE 691) (collectively, Amended Complaints) by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1) (Lonergan, Kyle)
June 21, 2007 Filing 993 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Notice Concerning Production of Rule 2004 Database (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E) (Patrick, Kathy)
June 18, 2007 Filing 992 RESPONSE in Support re #972 MOTION for Discovery against Defendants Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Lee, Rex)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 991 SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 12/31/2007.,Motions due by 3/3/2008.. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 6/14/2007. (bw)
June 7, 2007 Filing 990 RESPONSE in Opposition re (978 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION to Dismiss Suggestion of Supplemental Authority of the Credit Suisse Defendants "Response of the Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs and The Unencumbered Asset Trust to Submission of Supplemental Authority By the Credit Suisse Defendants" filed by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee, State of Arizona, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Humphries, Scott)
June 4, 2007 Filing 989 RESPONSE to Motion re #976 MOTION Modify the Discovery Stay as to Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson, #972 MOTION for Discovery against Defendants Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson, #974 MOTION for Discovery of Outside Directors filed by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Lonergan, Kyle)
May 31, 2007 Filing 988 RESPONSE in Opposition re #978 MOTION to Dismiss Suggestion of Supplemental Authority of the Credit Suisse Defendants filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
May 31, 2007 Filing 987 RESPONSE to Motion re #978 MOTION to Dismiss Suggestion of Supplemental Authority of the Credit Suisse Defendants filed by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
May 31, 2007 Filing 986 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C Roberson Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Roberson, Eric)
May 31, 2007 Filing 985 Amended MOTION to Modify the Discovery Stay as to Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
May 30, 2007 Filing 984 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. re #972 MOTION for Discovery against Defendants Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson Partial Withdrawal of May 11, 2007 Motion With Respect to Beacon Entities (Lee, Rex)
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 983 ORDER denying #945 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 5/30/2007. (bw)
May 30, 2007 Filing 982 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc re #974 MOTION for Discovery of Outside Directors PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, OF THAT PORTION OF THE MOTION WHICH SEEKS DISCOVERY FROM THE FORMER AND PRESENT DEFENDANT EMPLOYERS OF THE OUTSIDE DIRECTORS: PLAINTIFFS SEEK TO OBTAIN BY THE MOTION DISCOVERY ONLY FROM THE OUTSIDE DIRECTORS THEMSELVES (Levison, Harold)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER denying #925 Motion to Lift the Discovery Stay. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/25/07. (kch)
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 980 ORDER granting #977 Motion for Extension of Time to answer the Amended Complaint. Extended to 6/25/07. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/24/07. (kch)
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 979 ORDER re #961 : The Magistrate Judge denies the motion to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/24/07. (kch)
May 24, 2007 Filing 978 MOTION to Dismiss Suggestion of Supplemental Authority of the Credit Suisse Defendants by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation.Responses due by 6/18/2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1#2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2) (Lazear, Sherri)
May 23, 2007 Filing 977 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/25/2007. Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer the Second Amended Complaint of Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. (Pharos) (MDL DE 64), the Amended Complaint of ING Bank N.V. (ING) (MDL DE 640), the Fourth Amended Complaint of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company (MetLife) (MDL DE 690), and the Fourth Amended Complaint of Lloyds TSB Bank PLC (Lloyds) (MDL DE 691) (collectively, Amended Complaints) by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lonergan, Kyle)
May 23, 2007 Filing 976 MOTION Modify the Discovery Stay as to Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
May 17, 2007 Filing 975 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Lloyds TSB Bank plc, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc re (974 in 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA) MOTION for Discovery of Outside Directors Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Levison, Harold)
May 16, 2007 Filing 974 MOTION for Discovery of Outside Directors by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (Levison, Harold)
May 16, 2007 Filing 973 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing Submission of Supplemental Materials Regarding Defendant Frank Magliochetti's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Michael Mahoney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Arnold, James)
May 11, 2007 Filing 972 MOTION for Discovery against Defendants Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Lee, Rex)
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson and Thomas Mendell's motion to dismiss the complaints of MetLife, Lloyds, ING and Pharos #'s #675 #733 and #166 . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 5/7/2007. (bw)
April 23, 2007 Filing 970 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. "Moved no forward," re doc #967 . Mail sent to Luan K Phan. (kch)
April 16, 2007 Filing 969 RESPONSE in Opposition re #956 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E - Part 1#6 Exhibit E - Part 2#7 Exhibit E - Part 3#8 Exhibit E - Part 4#9 Exhibit F)(Wilkinson, William)
April 13, 2007 Filing 968 NOTICE by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. re #965 Objection (non motion) of Certificate of Service (Rosenberg, Thomas)
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 967 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 04/11/2007. (sr)
April 10, 2007 Filing 966 STIPULATION of Proposed Agreed Protective Order by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank One, N.A., In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Wilkinson, William)
April 6, 2007 Filing 965 Objection re #961 Notice (Other) Letter request by ING Bank, N.V. for permission to serve discovery requests upon parties by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Rosenberg, Thomas)
April 3, 2007 Filing 964 RESPONSE in Opposition re #955 MOTION to Strike #954 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Cross Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Wilkinson, William)
April 2, 2007 Filing 963 Response re #961 Notice (Other) by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
April 2, 2007 Filing 962 Response re #961 Notice (Other) by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC. (Wilkinson, William)
March 28, 2007 Filing 961 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. Letter to Judge Graham and Magistrate Judge Abel (Lee, Rex)
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 960 ORDER granting #959 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kenneth J Vianale) for John P. Houlihan. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/28/07. (kch)
March 26, 2007 Filing 959 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kenneth J. Vianale by Plaintiff Michael Mahoney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Arnold, James)
March 23, 2007 Filing 958 REPLY to Response to Motion re #916 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsen, et al. v. Pote, et al. (SDNY 05-CIV-1575) filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Wilkinson, William)
March 23, 2007 Filing 957 RESPONSE in Support re #919 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsen, et al. v. Pote, et al. (SDNY 05-CIV-1575) (in Support re D.E. 921 Amended document by Defendants Thomas G. Mendell and Harold W. Pote) Memorandum of Law in further support of Defendants Harold W. Pote's and Thomas G. Mendell's Motion to Dismiss Lance and Barbara Poulsens' Complaint filed by Defendants Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Lonergan, Kyle)
March 23, 2007 Filing 956 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen. (Haller, John)
March 22, 2007 Filing 955 MOTION to Strike #954 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers, Cross Claimants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers, E & D Investments, E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers, Donald nmi Ayers, In Re Donald H Ayers. Responses due by 4/12/2007 (Dickerson, Brian)
March 9, 2007 Filing 954 RESPONSE in Opposition re #945 MOTION for Reconsideration re #935 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Cross Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilkinson, William)
March 9, 2007 Filing 953 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. (Lee, Rex)
March 1, 2007 Filing 952 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Leslie Long (Long, Thomas)
February 23, 2007 Filing 951 NOTICE by In Re Donald H Ayers, Defendant Donald nmi Ayers of Filing Reponses to The Arizona Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents (Dickerson, Brian)
February 23, 2007 Filing 950 NOTICE by In Re Donald H Ayers, Defendant Donald nmi Ayers of Filing Responses and Objections to New York City Pension Funds' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Dickerson, Brian)
February 23, 2007 Filing 949 RESPONSE in Opposition re #916 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsen, et al. v. Pote, et al. (SDNY 05-CIV-1575), #919 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsen, et al. v. Pote, et al. (SDNY 05-CIV-1575) Plaintiffs' Memo in Opp to Defs Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen. (Fellig, Thomas)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER granting #947 Motion for Limited Admission for Roy L. Mason and Robert H B Cawood for Plaintiffs Lance and Barbara Poulsen. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/23/07. (kch)
February 22, 2007 Filing fee for PHVs: $ 400, receipt number 255174. (kch)
February 22, 2007 Filing 947 MOTION for Limited Admission of Roy L. Mason and Robert H.B. Cawood Pro Hac Vice to Represent Plaintiffs, Lance Poulsen and Barbara Poulsen by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen. (Haller, John)
February 20, 2007 Filing 946 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Moved-No Forwarding) re doc #943 . Mail sent to Luan K. Phan (kch)
February 13, 2007 Filing 945 MOTION for Reconsideration re #935 Order on Motion for Leave to File by Defendants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers, Cross Claimants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers, In Re Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
February 7, 2007 Filing 944 Response to Lead Plaintiffs Mahoney and Houlihan's First Request for Production of Documents by Defendants Cheyenne-Blaze LLC, Rebecca S Parrett. (Zacks, Benjamin)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER granting #942 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Susan Felice DiCicco. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/2/07. (kch)
February 1, 2007 Filing fee for PHV motion: $ 200.00, receipt number 254907. (kch)
February 1, 2007 Filing 942 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 DiCicco Certificate)(Lazear, Sherri)
January 31, 2007 Filing 941 NOTICE by Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti re #927 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Joinder in JPMorgan Entities' Opposition to Motion to Lift Discovery Stay (Willis, C)
January 30, 2007 Filing 940 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Wells Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti (Wells, David)
January 30, 2007 Filing 939 NOTICE of Appearance by C Todd Willis Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti (Willis, C)
January 30, 2007 Filing 938 NOTICE of Appearance by R Eric Bilik Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti (Bilik, R)
January 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER stating that Donald H. Ayers is ORDERED that he treat the requests for production of documents served on him by Lloyds and MetLife as a Rule 45 subpoena for the production of documents. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/29/07. (srj, )
January 26, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/26/2007. (mra2, )
January 26, 2007 Filing 936 RESPONSE in Support re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by Plaintiff Larry R White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Arnold, James)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER denying #893 Motion for Leave to File a third amended complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/26/07. (kch)
January 18, 2007 Filing 934 RESPONSE in Opposition re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by Defendants Mitchell Stein, Swabb Financial LLC. (Brown, Robert)
January 16, 2007 Filing 933 RESPONSE in Opposition re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by In Re RJ Gold & Company. (Wojcik, Lawrence)
January 16, 2007 Filing 932 RESPONSE in Opposition re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by Defendants Ayers LLC, Donald nmi Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
January 15, 2007 Filing 931 RESPONSE in Opposition re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by Defendant John F Andrews. (Miller, Brian)
January 15, 2007 Filing 930 RESPONSE in Opposition re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by In Re Lance K Poulson, Defendant Barbara Poulsen. (Haller, John)
January 15, 2007 Filing 929 RESPONSE in Opposition re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
January 12, 2007 Filing 928 RESPONSE in Opposition re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Rosenberg, Thomas)
January 12, 2007 Filing 927 RESPONSE in Opposition re #925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B (Part 1)#3 Exhibit B (Part 2)#4 Exhibit B (Part 3)#5 Exhibit C#6 Exhibit D#7 Exhibit E#8 Exhibit F)(Wilkinson, William)
December 29, 2006 Filing 926 Mail Returned as Undeliverable doc #923 . Returned marked "Moved No Forwarding." Mail sent to Luan K Phan. (kch)
December 19, 2006 Filing 925 MOTION for Discovery Stay to Be Lifted by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee, Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen, State of Arizona, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, Michael Mahoney, Louis Janssen, Larry R White, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, John P. Houlihan, HSBC Bank USA, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York, City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard J. Vianale#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E)(Arnold, James)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 924 DISCOVERY ORDER . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 12/19/2006. (bw)
December 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER granting #922 Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose the Motion to Dismiss and the Amended Motion to Dismiss - extended to 2/23/07. The Defendants shall have until and including 3/23/07 to file any reply briefs in support of their motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/18/06. (kch)
December 15, 2006 Filing 922 First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/23/2007. by In Re Lance K Poulson. (Fellig, Thomas)
December 7, 2006 Filing 921 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendants Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. Amended Memorandum of Law (DE 919) of Defendants Harold Pote and Thomas Mendell's Motion To Dismiss Poulsen, et al. v. Pote, et al. (SDNY 05-CIV-1575). (Lonergan, Kyle)
December 6, 2006 Filing 920 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Edward Dickerson (Dickerson, Brian)
December 4, 2006 Filing 919 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsen, et al. v. Pote, et al. (SDNY 05-CIV-1575) by Defendants Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. Responses due by 12/28/2006 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Lonergan, Kyle)
November 27, 2006 Filing 918 Response re #902 Order by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order No. 2#2 Exhibit B - Transfer Order#3 Exhibit C - Hearing Transcript Excerpt)(Callagy, John)
November 22, 2006 Filing 917 Response re #902 Order by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re discovery schedule)(Levison, Harold)
November 20, 2006 Filing 916 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsen, et al. v. Pote, et al. (SDNY 05-CIV-1575) by Defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co. Responses due by 12/14/2006 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Wilkinson, William)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER granting #908 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/4/06 to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/20/06. (jr)
November 18, 2006 Filing 914 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Lloyds TSB Bank PLC by Defendant Bank One, N.A..(Garland, James)
November 18, 2006 Filing 913 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Defendant Bank One, N.A..(Garland, James)
November 18, 2006 Filing 912 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of ING Bank NV by Defendant Bank One, N.A..(Garland, James)
November 17, 2006 Filing 911 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ING BANK, N.V. by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank.(Wilkinson, William)
November 17, 2006 Filing 910 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO THE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF LLOYDS TSB BANK PLC by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank.(Wilkinson, William)
November 17, 2006 Filing 909 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO THE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND METROPOLITAN INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank.(Wilkinson, William)
November 16, 2006 Filing 908 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/4/2006. Harold W. Pote's and Thomas G. Mendell's Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time by Defendants Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lonergan, Kyle)
November 10, 2006 Filing 907 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Correspondence to Honorable James Graham and Honorable Mark Abel Requesting a Status Conference in all the Coordinated Cases (Patrick, Kathy)
November 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER granting #905 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Claire L Huene and Joel M Miller terminated. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/9/06. (kch1)
November 8, 2006 Filing 905 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Huene, Claire)
November 6, 2006 Filing 904 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP (Murray, Joseph)
November 3, 2006 Filing 903 NOTICE by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. Notice of Appearance (Lee, Rex)
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER requiring proposed discovery schedule with respect to indenture trustees.Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/27/06. (ws)
October 26, 2006 Filing 901 RESPONSE in Opposition re #893 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Crossclaim Instanter by Cross Claimant Donald H. Ayers and E&D Investments filed by Cross Claimant Donald nmi Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
October 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER granting #897 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JP Morgan Chase & Co answer due 11/18/2006; JPMorgan Partners, LLC answer due 11/18/2006; JP Morgan Chase Bank answer due 11/18/2006; Bank One, N.A. answer due 11/18/2006. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/20/06. (kch)
October 16, 2006 Filing 899 RESPONSE in Opposition re #893 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Crossclaim Instanter by Cross Claimant Donald H. Ayers and E&D Investments filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilkinson, William)
October 16, 2006 Filing 898 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation of Change of Law Firm Name (Koral, Jason)
October 16, 2006 Filing 897 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 11/18/2006. by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wilkinson, William)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER granting #895 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Extended to 11/20/06. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/13/06. (kch)
October 6, 2006 Filing 895 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/20/2006. by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen, Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wilkinson, William)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #673 motion to dismiss, denying #674 Motion to Dismiss. Certain parties have settled their claims and motions #742 to Dismiss, #226 to Dismiss, #243 to Dismiss, #248 to Dismiss, #250 to Dismiss and #252 Motion to Dismiss are all moot . Portions of documents 155, 165 and 747 are granted in part and denied in part but remaing pending. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/2/2006. (bw)
September 21, 2006 Filing 893 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Crossclaim Instanter by Cross Claimant Donald H. Ayers and by Cross Claimant E & D Investments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case law#2 Exhibit Case law#3 Exhibit Third Amended Crossclaim)(Dickerson, Brian)
August 31, 2006 Filing 892 RESPONSE in Opposition re #882 MOTION to Strike Deloitte's Supplemental Filing filed by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Brown, Philip)
August 28, 2006 Filing 891 MOTION to Dismiss Donald H. Ayers' and E&D Investments' Second Amended Cross Claims (D.E. 884 and D.E. 889) by Defendants Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. Responses due by 9/21/2006 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Donald H. Ayers' and E&D Investments Second Amended Cross Claims)(Lonergan, Kyle)
August 28, 2006 Filing 890 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. TO DISMISS THE AMENDED CROSS-CLAIMS OF DEFENDANTS DONALD AYERS AND E&D INVESTMENTS, INC. by Defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co. Responses due by 9/21/2006 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wilkinson, William)
August 16, 2006 Filing 889 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cross Claimant Donald nmi Ayers. Second Amended Crossclaim of Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments Against JP Morgan Chase & Co. Harold Pote & Thomas Mendell. (Dickerson, Brian)
August 16, 2006 Filing 888 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DOCUMENT by Cross Claimant Donald nmi Ayers re #887 Amended Document (Dickerson, Brian)
August 14, 2006 Filing 887 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cross Claimant Donald nmi Ayers. Second Amended Crossclaim of Donald H. Ayers and E&D Investments Against J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Harold Pote & Thomas Mendell. (Dickerson, Brian)
August 14, 2006 Filing 886 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DOCUMENT by Cross Claimant Donald nmi Ayers re #885 Amended Document (Dickerson, Brian)
August 11, 2006 Filing 885 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cross Claimant Donald nmi Ayers. Second Amended Crossclaim of Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments Against The Beacon Group, Focus Value Fund, JP Morgan Chase, Harold Pote & Thomas Mendell. (Dickerson, Brian)
August 10, 2006 Filing 884 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cross Claimants Donald nmi Ayers, E & D Investments. First Amended Crossclaim of Donald Ayers and E & D Investments Against the Beacon Group III Focus Value Fund, L.P., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Harold Pote and Thomas Mendell. (Dickerson, Brian)
August 9, 2006 Filing 883 RESPONSE in Opposition re #575 MOTION to Dismiss (Deloitte's Supplmental Filing) filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen. (Haller, John)
August 9, 2006 Filing 882 MOTION to Strike Deloitte's Supplemental Filing by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen. Responses due by 9/5/2006 (Haller, John)
August 8, 2006 Filing 881 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel (Long, Thomas)
August 1, 2006 Filing 880 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York (Geribon, Hector)
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 879 AGREED ORDER and JUDGMENT re: NYCERS Bar Order. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 7/27/2006. (bw)
July 21, 2006 Filing 878 Joint MOTION Entry of Bar Order by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A., Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order)(Wilkinson, William)
July 20, 2006 Filing 877 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen of Withdrawal of Appearance of Stephen L. Snyder, Andrew G. Slutkin, Philip R. Stein and SNYDER, SLUTKIN & SNYDER (Haller, John)
June 30, 2006 Filing 876 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER stipulating dismissal with prejudice.Signed by Judge James L Graham on 06/29/06. (ws)
June 8, 2006 Filing 874 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Defendants Donald Ayers and E&D Investments, Inc. by Cross Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase & Co. Responses due by 7/3/2006 (Wilkinson, William)
June 8, 2006 Filing 873 MOTION to Dismiss DONALD H. AYERS' AND E&D INVESTMENTS' CROSS CLAIMS by Defendants Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. Responses due by 7/3/2006 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Donald Ayers' and E&D Investments? Cross Claims#2 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Lonergan, Kyle)
June 8, 2006 Filing 872 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing Fitch's Suggestion Of Recent Public Information by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
June 5, 2006 Filing 871 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #160 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Lloyd's TSB Bank's Second Amended Complaint, #228 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss NYC Pension Funds' First Amended Complaint / Suggestion Of Recent Public Record Information Relevant To The Court's PSLRA Gatekeeping Function, Dated June 5, 2006 filed by Defendants Fitch, Inc., Fitch, Inc.. (Davis, Evan)
June 2, 2006 Filing 870 NOTICE of Settlement status with defendants Bank One, N.A., Banc One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, National Association, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, The Beacon Group, LLC, The Beacon Group III - Focus Value Fund, L.P., Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York (Fineman, Steven)
May 31, 2006 Filing 869 NOTICE of Settlement Between Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs and Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP (Miller, Tiffany)
May 25, 2006 Filing 868 REPLY to Response to Motion re #744 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint filed by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
May 19, 2006 Filing 867 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. (kch)
May 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER granting #864 Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Motion for Extension of Time to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss the amended complaint of Plaintiff ING Bank NV - ext. to 5/25/06. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/16/06. (jk)
May 15, 2006 Filing 865 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. (Lee, Rex)
May 15, 2006 Filing 864 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/25/2006. by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
May 11, 2006 Filing 863 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Janus (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Janus, Kevin)
May 8, 2006 Filing 862 REPLY to Response to Motion re #675 MOTION to Dismiss ING's Amended Complaint, #733 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Most Recent Amended Complaints (D.E. 689, 690, 691) filed by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. (Lonergan, Kyle)
May 8, 2006 Filing 861 RESPONSE in Support re #673 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NCFE Consolidated Financial Statement)(Wilkinson, William)
May 8, 2006 Filing 860 RESPONSE in Support re #672 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, #740 MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLEMENT TO CONSOLIDATED MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN PARTNERS, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AND THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS THE THIRD AND FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINTS OF LLOYDS TSB BANK PLC AND METR MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE CONSOLIDATED MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN PARTNERS, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AND THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINTS OF LLOYDS TSB BANK PLC, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. AND ING BANK, N.V. filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC. (Wilkinson, William)
May 8, 2006 Filing 859 REPLY to Response to Motion re #747 MOTION to Dismiss MetLife's 4th Amended Complaint, Lloyds' 4th Amended Complaint, and Parrett's Complaint filed by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
May 8, 2006 Filing 858 REPLY to Response to Motion re #674 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
May 2, 2006 Notice of Correction of filing date for documents #856 and #857. Counsel had problems filing on 5/1 documents were deleted and refiled on 5/2/2006 and the date was corrected to show a 5/1/2006 filing date. (bw)
May 1, 2006 Filing 857 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #242 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part (2))(Long, Thomas) Modified on 5/2/2006 (bw, ).
May 1, 2006 Filing 856 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #743 Supplemental - Supporting,, filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 2#2 Part 3#3 Part 4)(Long, Thomas) Modified on 5/2/2006 (bw, ).
May 1, 2006 Filing 855 REPLY to Response to Motion re #746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders filed by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-part 1#2 Exhibit A-part 1B#3 Exhibit A-part 2#4 Exhibit A-part 3#5 Exhibit A-part 4A#6 Exhibit A-part 4B#7 Exhibit A-part 5#8 Exhibit A-part 6A#9 Exhibit A-part 6B#10 Exhibit A-part 7A#11 Exhibit A-part 7B)(Miller, Tiffany)
May 1, 2006 Filing 854 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc (Coster, James)
May 1, 2006 Filing 853 REPLY to Response to Motion re #731 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint of Lloyds Bank Reply Memorandum of Law of Moody's Investor's Service in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. (Coster, James)
May 1, 2006 Filing 852 RESPONSE in Support re #732 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints, #671 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Davis, Jessica)
May 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER granting #846 Motion for Extension of Time to and including 5/8/06 to File Reply briefs. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/1/06. (jr)
May 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER granting #845 Motion for Extension of Time to and including 5/8/06 to file any reply briefs in further support of their motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/1/06. (jr)
May 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER granting #844 Motion for Extension of Time to and including 5/8/06 to respond to the Opposition Briefs. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/1/06. (jr)
May 1, 2006 Filing 848 REPLY to Response to Motion re #160 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Lloyd's TSB Bank's Second Amended Complaint, #228 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss NYC Pension Funds' First Amended Complaint / Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Support Of Fitch Inc.'s Motions To Dismiss And Request For Oral Argument, Dated May 1, 2006. filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Davis, Evan)
April 28, 2006 Filing 847 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #845 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/8/2006. Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Order filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC. (Wilkinson, William)
April 28, 2006 Filing 846 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #813 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #829 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #815 Response in Opposition to Motion, New date requested 5/8/2006. by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
April 28, 2006 Filing 845 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/8/2006. by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, Beacon Group, LLC. (Wilkinson, William)
April 28, 2006 Filing 844 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/8/2006. of Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell, And Eric R. Wilkinson To Plaintiffs' Opposition Briefs Re:D.E. 814 and 828 by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lonergan, Kyle)
April 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 843 ORDER granting #842 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #745 , #742 MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLEMENT TO CONSOLIDATED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN PARTNERS, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK AND THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NEW YORK CITY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYS, #733 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Most Recent Amended Complaints (D.E. 689, 690, 691), #732 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/26/06. (jr)
April 25, 2006 Filing 842 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #745 Supplemental - Supporting (non motion), #733 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Most Recent Amended Complaints (D.E. 689, 690, 691), #742 MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLEMENT TO CONSOLIDATED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN PARTNERS, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK AND THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NEW YORK CITY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYS, #732 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints New date requested 6/2/2006. by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Eric R Wilkerson, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Wilkinson, Eric R., Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One National Association, Bank One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilkinson, William)
April 25, 2006 Filing 841 NOTICE of Settlement with defendants Bank One, N.A., Banc One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, National Association, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, The Beacon Group, LLC, The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York (Fineman, Steven)
April 18, 2006 Filing 840 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #744 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Huene, Claire)
April 18, 2006 Filing 839 RESPONSE in Opposition re #744 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Huene, Claire)
April 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 838 AGREED ORDER granting #836 Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co, The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund LP, Thomas G. Mendell and Harold W. Pote's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/18/06. (jk)
April 17, 2006 Filing 837 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #836 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/8/2006. UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Exhibit A -- Proposed Order by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Wilkinson, William)
April 17, 2006 Filing 836 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/8/2006. UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Wilkinson, William)
April 11, 2006 Filing 835 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ORDER granting #809 Deloitte & Touche LLP's Motion for extensions in which to respond and schedule briefing on Plaintiff's first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/11/06. (jk)
April 11, 2006 Filing 833 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #672 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, #671 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #830 Response in Opposition to Motion, -Compendium of Unpublished Authority filed by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Cases Part 2#2 Appendix Unpublished Cases Part 3#3 Appendix Unpublished Cases Part 4#4 Appendix Unpublished Cases Part 5#5 Appendix Unpublished Cases 6#6 Appendix Unpublished Cases 7)(Lee, Rex)
April 11, 2006 Filing 832 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #831 Response in Opposition to Motion, #673 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT - Compendium of Unpublished Authority filed by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished cases (part 2)#2 Appendix Unpublished cases (part 3)#3 Appendix Unpublished cases (part 4)#4 Appendix Unpublished cases (part 5)#5 Appendix Unpublished cases (part 6)#6 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Janus, Kevin)
April 10, 2006 Filing 831 RESPONSE in Opposition re #673 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Janus, Kevin)
April 10, 2006 Filing 830 RESPONSE in Opposition re #672 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, #671 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service#2 Index of Unreported Cases)(Lee, Rex)
April 10, 2006 Filing 829 RESPONSE in Opposition re #674 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Unreported Cases and Part 1 of Compendium of Unreported Cases#2 Part 2 of Compendium of Unreported Cases#3 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Rex)
April 10, 2006 Filing 828 RESPONSE in Opposition re #675 MOTION to Dismiss ING's Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Unreported Cases#2 Cases 1-A#3 Cases 1-B#4 Cases 2#5 Cases 3#6 Cases 4#7 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Rex)
April 10, 2006 Filing 827 RESPONSE in Opposition re #746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders [ARIZONA NOTEHOLDER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS' FEBRUARY 22, 2006 REVISED MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Response (Part 2 of 2))(Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2006 Filing 826 Response re #743 Supplemental - Supporting,, [ARIZONA NOTEHOLDERS' RESPONSE TO CSFB'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Response (Part 2 of 3)#2 Response (Part 3 of 3)#3 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3)#4 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3)#5 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3))(Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2006 Filing 825 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #735 Supplemental - Supporting, by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
April 10, 2006 Filing 824 RESPONSE in Opposition re #742 MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLEMENT TO CONSOLIDATED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN PARTNERS, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK AND THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NEW YORK CITY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYS, #732 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints filed by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
April 10, 2006 Filing 823 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #724 Response in Support of Motion,, by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
April 10, 2006 Filing 822 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing Defendants Harold W. Pote's, Thomas G. Mendell's, and Eric Wilkinson's Consolidated Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Most Recently Amended Complaints by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
April 10, 2006 Filing 821 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing #745 Supplemental memorandum- Supporting (non motion) by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 820 AGREED ORDER AND JUDGMENT re: #738 #753 #754 #754 #757 #760 and #773 . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 4/10/2006. (bw)
April 10, 2006 Filing 819 RESPONSE in Opposition re #731 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint of Lloyds Bank (Moody's Investors Service, Inc.) filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
April 10, 2006 Filing 818 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #724 Response in Support of Motion,, (Fitch, Inc.) filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
April 10, 2006 Filing 817 RESPONSE in Opposition re #739 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaints of Lloyds and MetLife filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
April 10, 2006 Filing 816 RESPONSE in Opposition re #732 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints, #740 MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLEMENT TO CONSOLIDATED MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN PARTNERS, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AND THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS THE THIRD AND FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINTS OF LLOYDS TSB BANK PLC AND METR filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
April 10, 2006 Filing 815 RESPONSE in Opposition re #747 MOTION to Dismiss MetLife's 4th Amended Complaint, Lloyds' 4th Amended Complaint, and Parrett's Complaint (Motions of Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch, and Bank One Capital Markets) filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
April 10, 2006 Filing 814 RESPONSE in Opposition re #733 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Most Recent Amended Complaints (D.E. 689, 690, 691) filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
April 10, 2006 Filing 813 RESPONSE in Opposition re #747 MOTION to Dismiss MetLife's 4th Amended Complaint, Lloyds' 4th Amended Complaint, and Parrett's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
April 10, 2006 Filing 812 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 [NOTICE OF AGREEMENT BY ALL PARTIES TO ENTRY OF PROPOSED BAR ORDERS AND OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR APRIL 11, 2006] (Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER - Defendant Parrett must file any objections to the newly proposed version of the bar order by 10:00 a.m. Monday, April 10, 2006. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/10/06. (jk)
April 7, 2006 Filing 810 REPLY to Response to Motion re #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 [REPLY OF THE SETTLING PARTIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF BAR ORDER] filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Patrick, Kathy)
April 7, 2006 Filing 809 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/8/2006. To Respond To Plaintiff ING Bank, N.V.s First Amended Complaint And Revising Briefing Schedule To Accommodate Settlement by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Philip)
April 6, 2006 Filing 808 Consolidated ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Holihan, et al., and ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Mahoney, et al. by Defendants Cheyenne-Blaze LLC, Rebecca S Parrett.(Zacks, Benjamin)
April 5, 2006 Filing 807 ANSWER to Complaint 1st Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Crown Cork by Defendants Barbara Poulsen, Kuld Corp, Lance K. Poulsen.(Haller, John)
April 5, 2006 Filing 806 ANSWER to Complaint 2nd Amended Complaint of Plaintiff State of Arizona by Defendants Barbara Poulsen, Kuld Corp, Lance K. Poulsen.(Haller, John)
April 5, 2006 Filing 805 ANSWER to Complaint 2nd Amended Complaint of Plaintiff City of Chandler by Defendants Barbara Poulsen, Kuld Corp, Lance K. Poulsen.(Haller, John)
April 5, 2006 Filing 804 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant Lance K. Poulsen.(Haller, John)
April 5, 2006 Filing 803 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant Lance K. Poulsen.(Haller, John)
April 5, 2006 Filing 802 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendants Barbara Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen.(Haller, John)
April 5, 2006 Filing 801 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendants Barbara Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen.(Haller, John)
April 5, 2006 Filing 800 Answer of Defendant Donald H. Ayers to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM of Donald H. Ayers against JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. (Dickerson, Brian) Modified on 4/6/2006 to remove extra party names (jr).
April 5, 2006 Filing 799 Answer of Defendants Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM of Donald H. Ayers and E&D Investments against JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. (Dickerson, Brian) Modified on 4/6/2006 to remove extra party names (jr).
April 5, 2006 Filing 798 Answer of Defendants Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM of Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments against JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. (Dickerson, Brian) Modified on 4/6/2006 to remove extra party names (jr).
April 5, 2006 Filing 797 Answer of Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM of Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments against JP Morgan Chase & Co, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. (Dickerson, Brian) Modified on 4/5/2006 to remove incorrect party names(jr).
April 5, 2006 Filing 796 Defendant Donald Ayers and Ayers LLC ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendants Ayers LLC, Donald nmi Ayers.(Dickerson, Brian)
April 5, 2006 Filing 795 Defendant Donald H. Ayers and E & D Investments ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant E & D Investments, In Re Donald H Ayers.(Dickerson, Brian) Modified on 4/5/2006 to remove incorrect party defendant (lvw, ).
April 3, 2006 Filing 794 NOTICE by Defendants Eric R Wilkerson, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Partners, L.P., Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A. re #778 Order DISCLOSURE BY THE SETTLING DEFENDANTS OF EVIDENCE TO BE OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF THE JOINT MOTIONS FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. ? 1292 (Callagy, John)
April 3, 2006 Filing 793 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re #778 Order [Notice by Settling Plaintiffs of Intent to Offer Evidence at Hearing on Motions for Bar Order] (Patrick, Kathy)
March 31, 2006 Filing 792 RESPONSE in Opposition re #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 filed by Defendants Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Healthcare Capital LLC, Intercontinental Investment Associates, Kachina, Inc., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Donald nmi Ayers, Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen. (Tournoux, Katie)
March 31, 2006 Filing 791 RESPONSE in Opposition re #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 filed by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
March 31, 2006 Filing 790 RESPONSE in Opposition re #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Affidavit#2 Exhibit B to Affidavit)(Long, Thomas)
March 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER denying #763 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 03/31/06.(ws)
March 31, 2006 Filing 788 Objection re #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292by Defendants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
March 27, 2006 Filing 787 REPLY to Response to Motion re #763 MOTION to Strike #746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders, #743 Supplemental - Supporting,, [The Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Briefs Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Bo filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Patrick, Kathy)
March 27, 2006 Filing 786 REPLY to Response to Motion re #777 MOTION /Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion to File Supplemental Briefing to Respond to Lloyds TSB Bank's Fourth Amended Complaint and the New York City Pension Fund Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, dated March 17, 2006 /Fitch, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to File Supplemental Briefing, dated March 27, 2006 filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Davis, Evan)
March 23, 2006 Filing 785 RESPONSE in Opposition re #763 MOTION to Strike #746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders, #743 Supplemental - Supporting,, [The Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Briefs Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Bo filed by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
March 23, 2006 Filing 784 Response re #772 Response to Motion,, The Outside Directors', The JPMorgan Parties', and The Beacon Parties' Response To New York City Pension Fund's March 15, 2006 Submission by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. (Lonergan, Kyle)
March 23, 2006 Filing 783 RESPONSE in Opposition re #777 MOTION /Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion to File Supplemental Briefing to Respond to Lloyds TSB Bank's Fourth Amended Complaint and the New York City Pension Fund Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, dated March 17, 2006 filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
March 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER granting #781 Deloitte & Touche LLP's unopposed motion for extensions of time to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Setting Revised Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/23/06. (jk)
March 22, 2006 Filing 781 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/7/2006. To Respond To Plaintiff ING Bank, N.V.?s First Amended Complaint And Revising Briefing Schedule by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Philip)
March 20, 2006 Filing 780 RESPONSE to Motion re #777 MOTION /Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion to File Supplemental Briefing to Respond to Lloyds TSB Bank's Fourth Amended Complaint and the New York City Pension Fund Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, dated March 17, 2006 filed by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
March 20, 2006 Filing 779 RESPONSE in Opposition re #763 MOTION to Strike #746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders, #743 Supplemental - Supporting,, [The Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Briefs Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Bo filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 778 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Regarding Motion for Entry of Bar Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/20/06. (jk)
March 17, 2006 Filing 777 MOTION /Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion to File Supplemental Briefing to Respond to Lloyds TSB Bank's Fourth Amended Complaint and the New York City Pension Fund Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, dated March 17, 2006 by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Evan)
March 17, 2006 Filing 776 Response re #772 Response to Motion,, /Fitch Inc's Response to New York City Pension Fund Plaintiffs' March 15, 2006 Submission, Dated March 17, 2006 by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Davis, Evan)
March 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER granting #764 Motion to Expedite. Defendants Credit Suisse and Pricewaterhouse Coopers are ordered to respond to the motion to strike within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Arizona Noteholders may file any reply within three (3) days after defendants' responses are filed.Signed by Judge James L Graham on 03/16/06. (ws)
March 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER granting #771 Plaintiff ING Bank NV and Defendant Deloitte and Touche LLP's joint motion for an Extension of Time. ING Bank's response in opposition to Deloitte and Touche's motion to dismiss due on or before 5/8/06. Deloitte and Touche's reply due on or before 6/8/06. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/16/06. (jk)
March 15, 2006 Filing 773 MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order by Defendant Purcell & Scott Co LPA. (Andelman, Matthew)
March 15, 2006 Filing 772 RESPONSE to Motion re #763 MOTION to Strike #746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders, #743 Supplemental - Supporting,, [The Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Briefs Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Bo filed by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
March 14, 2006 Filing 771 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 5/8/2006. by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Rex)
March 14, 2006 Filing 770 RESPONSE to Motion re #760 Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct #753 MOTION to Amend/Correct #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SE, #754 MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement, #753 MOTION to Amend/Correct #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 and To Permit Limited Disco Response to Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Hearing Date Regarding Motion for Entry of Bar Order filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Partners, L.P., Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. (Callagy, John)
March 14, 2006 Filing 769 RESPONSE to Motion re #754 MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Wilkinson, Eric R., Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One National Association, Bank One, N.A.. (Wilkinson, William)
March 14, 2006 Filing 768 REPLY to Response to Motion re #757 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order and Hearing Date Regarding the Settling Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Bar Order, and to Require the Production of the Settlement Agreement filed by Defendants E & D Investments, Kuld Corp, Donald nmi Ayers, Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
March 14, 2006 Filing fee for PHV of William J Schwartz, William O'Brien, Jason Mark Koral and Mina Audrey Kim: $ 200.00, receipt number 250560 (jk)
March 14, 2006 Filing 767 REPLY to Response to Motion re #754 MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement filed by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
March 13, 2006 Filing 766 NOTICE by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP re #754 MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement -- Partial Resolution of Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: Portion of Motion Seeking Production of Settlement Agreement Resolved (Miller, Tiffany)
March 13, 2006 Filing 765 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re #764 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of the Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Briefs Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston and PriceWaterhouseCoopers in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss, #763 MOTION to Strike #746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders, #743 Supplemental - Supporting,, [The Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Briefs Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Bo [REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONFERENCE] (Patrick, Kathy)
March 13, 2006 Filing 764 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of the Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Briefs Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston and PriceWaterhouseCoopers in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Patrick, Kathy)
March 13, 2006 Filing 763 MOTION to Strike #746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders, #743 Supplemental - Supporting,, [The Arizona Noteholders' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Briefs Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston and PriceWaterhouseCoopers in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Patrick, Kathy)
March 13, 2006 Filing 762 RESPONSE in Opposition re #760 Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct #753 MOTION to Amend/Correct #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SE, #754 MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement, #753 MOTION to Amend/Correct #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 and To Permit Limited Disco filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Patrick, Kathy)
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER granting #759 motions of William J. Schwartz, William O'Brien, Jason Mark Koral and Mina Audrey Kim for Leave to Appear PHV on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/13/06. (jk)
March 10, 2006 Filing 760 Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct #753 MOTION to Amend/Correct #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 and To Permit Limited Disco very into the JP Morgan Chase Settlement by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
March 10, 2006 Filing 759 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificates)(Long, Thomas)
March 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER granting #756 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or file amended answer. Lance K Poulson answer due 4/5/2006; E & D Investments answer due 4/5/2006; Barbara Poulsen answer due 4/5/2006; Kuld Corp answer due 4/5/2006; Donald nmi Ayers answer due 4/5/2006. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/10/06. (jr)
March 9, 2006 Filing 757 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order and Hearing Date Regarding the Settling Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Bar Order, and to Require the Production of the Settlement Agreement by Defendants E & D Investments, Kuld Corp, Donald nmi Ayers, Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
March 9, 2006 Filing 756 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 4/5/2006. by Defendants E & D Investments, Ayers LLC, Donald nmi Ayers, Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
March 9, 2006 Filing 755 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/5/2006. to File Answers to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by In Re Lance K Poulson, Donald H Ayers, Kuld Corp, Defendants E & D Investments, Ayers LLC, Barbara Poulsen. (Haller, John)
March 9, 2006 Filing 754 MOTION to Amend/Correct #748 Order, #752 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties' for Entry of Bar Order, MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Burkhart, Matthew)
March 8, 2006 Filing 753 MOTION to Amend/Correct #738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 and To Permit Limited Discovery Into The JP Morgan Chase Settlement by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Long, Thomas)
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER Setting Hearing, on Motion #738 JOINT MOTION FOR A BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION for hearing before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/27/2006 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 3/7/2006. (bw)
March 7, 2006 Filing 751 NOTICE by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP re #744 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint - Correction to Exhibit F to Supporting Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. F to Aff.)(Miller, Tiffany)
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #148 Poulsens Motion to Dismiss, denying #150 Ayers Motion to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part #151 Ayers Motion to Dismiss, denying #158 Poulsens Motion to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part #159 Parretts Motion to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part #164 Poulsens Motion to Dismiss and denying #249 Ayers Motion to Dismiss. In case 2:04-cv-697 this order grants in part and denies in part motions to dismiss #'s 26, 27 and 28. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 2/27/2006. (bw, )
February 23, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Status Conference held on 2/23/2006. (mra4, )
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 749 SCHEDULING ORDER Regarding Motion for Entry of Bar Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/23/06. (jk)
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 748 SCHEDULING ORDER Regarding Motion for Entry of Bar Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/23/06. (jk)
February 22, 2006 Filing 747 MOTION to Dismiss MetLife's 4th Amended Complaint, Lloyds' 4th Amended Complaint, and Parrett's Complaint by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A.. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Attachments: #1 Part 2#2 Part 3)(Garland, James)
February 22, 2006 Filing 746 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints of the Arizona Noteholders by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit#2 Exhibit Ex. A#3 Exhibit Ex. B#4 Exhibit Ex. C#5 Exhibit Ex. D#6 Exhibit Ex. E-1#7 Exhibit Ex. E-2#8 Exhibit Ex. E-3#9 Exhibit Ex. E-4a#10 Exhibit Ex. E-4b#11 Exhibit Ex. E-5#12 Exhibit Ex. E-6#13 Exhibit Ex. E-7#14 Exhibit Ex. E-8#15 Exhibit Ex. E-9#16 Exhibit Ex. E-10#17 Exhibit Ex. E-11)(Miller, Tiffany)
February 22, 2006 Filing 745 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting Bank One Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Recently Amended Complaints by Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One National Association, Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
February 22, 2006 Filing 744 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit#2 Exhibit Ex. A to Aff.#3 Exhibit Ex. B to Aff.#4 Exhibit Ex. C to Aff.#5 Exhibit Ex. D to Aff.#6 Exhibit Ex. E to Aff.#7 Exhibit Ex. F(part 1) to Aff.#8 Exhibit Ex. F(part 2) to Aff.#9 Exhibit Ex. F(part 3) to Aff.#10 Exhibit Ex. F(part 4) to Aff.#11 Exhibit Ex. F(part 5) to Aff.)(Miller, Tiffany)
February 22, 2006 Filing 743 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #177 MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC (FORMERLY KNOWN AS CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON LLC) AND CREDIT SUISSE, NEW YORK BRANCH (FORMERLY KNOWN AS CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON, NEW YORK BRANCH) IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINTS OF THE ARIZONA NOTEHOLDERS AND THE NJ NOTEHOLDERS filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 (PART 2)#2 (PART 3)#3 (PART 4)#4 Exhibit A#5 Exhibit B#6 Exhibit C)(Long, Thomas)
February 22, 2006 Filing 742 MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLEMENT TO CONSOLIDATED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS J.P. MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN PARTNERS, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK AND THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NEW YORK CITY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Callagy, John)
February 22, 2006 Filing 741 MOTION to Dismiss Arizona Noteholder Amended Complaints by In Re Lance K Poulson, Kuld Corp, Defendant Barbara Poulsen. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Haller, John)
February 22, 2006 Filing 740 MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLEMENT TO CONSOLIDATED MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN PARTNERS, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AND THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS THE THIRD AND FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINTS OF LLOYDS TSB BANK PLC AND METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Callagy, John)
February 22, 2006 Filing 739 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaints of Lloyds and MetLife by Defendant Lance K. Poulsen. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Haller, John)
February 22, 2006 Filing 738 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Callagy, John)
February 22, 2006 Filing 737 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by In Re Lance K Poulson, Defendant Barbara Poulsen.(Haller, John)
February 22, 2006 Filing 736 CONSOLIDATED ANSWER to the Amended Complaint (Second) by the City of Chandler, Arizona and State of Arizona, and (First) Amended Complaint by Crown Cork< by defendant REBECCA S PARRETT.(Zacks, Benjamin) Modified on 2/23/2006 (bw)
February 22, 2006 Filing 735 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #242 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC (FORMERLY KNOWN AS CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON LLC) IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1)(Long, Thomas)
February 22, 2006 Filing 734 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant Rebecca S Parrett.(Zacks, Benjamin)
February 22, 2006 Filing 733 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Most Recent Amended Complaints (D.E. 689, 690, 691) by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants Pote's, Mendell's, and Wilkinson's Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Most Recently Amended Complaints)(Lonergan, Kyle)
February 22, 2006 Filing 732 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Davis, Jessica)
February 22, 2006 Filing 731 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint of Lloyds Bank by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D: pages 1-15#5 Exhibit D: pages 16-30#6 Exhibit D: pages 31-41#7 Exhibit A to Exhibit D: pages i-20#8 Exhibit A to Exhibit D: pages 21-35#9 Exhibit A to Ehibit D: pages 36-50#10 Exhibit A to Exhibit D: pages 51-60#11 Exhibit A to Exhibit D: end pages)(Coster, James)
February 22, 2006 Filing 730 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments Motion to Dismiss the City of Chandler's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
February 22, 2006 Filing 729 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments Motion to Dismiss the Pltf's State of AZ Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by Defendants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
February 22, 2006 Filing 728 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Donald H. Ayers & E&D Investments Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Crown Cork & Seal Company Master Retirement Trust's First Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendants E & D Investments, Donald nmi Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
February 22, 2006 Filing 727 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant Donald H. Ayers to Dismiss Plaintiffs New York City Employees' Retirement System, et al. Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Donald nmi Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickerson, Brian)
February 22, 2006 Filing 726 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation of Change of Name (Long, Thomas)
February 22, 2006 Filing 725 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Requesting Entry of Scheduling Order Pertaining to Settlement (Patrick, Kathy)
February 22, 2006 Filing 724 RESPONSE in Support re #160 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Lloyd's TSB Bank's Second Amended Complaint, #228 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss NYC Pension Funds' First Amended Complaint /Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Fitch Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument, dated February 22, 2006 (also related to item # 689 and 691) filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Davis, Evan)
February 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER granting #722 Defendant Deloitte and Touche LLP's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to ING Bank NV's first amended complaint - ext. to 3/24/06. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/22/06. (jk)
February 21, 2006 Filing 722 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/24/2006. to Respond to ING Bank, N.V.'s First Amended Complaint by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Brown, Philip)
February 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER granting #720 Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Motion for Extension of time to plead or move in response to Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.'s amended complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/1/06. (jk)
January 31, 2006 Filing 720 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 2/22/2006. (to file motion to dismiss) by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
January 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER granting #718 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/30/06. (jk)
January 27, 2006 Filing 718 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 4/10/2006. by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Jessica)
January 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/27/06. (jk)
January 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER granting #715 Defendant Moody's Investors Service Inc's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Lloyds TSB Bank's Fourth Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/27/06. (jk)
January 26, 2006 Filing 715 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #691 Amended Complaint,, New date requested 2/22/2006. and For Briefing Schedule by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Lawrence)
January 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/26/06. (jk)
January 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 713 AGREED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiffs' First and Second Amended Complaints. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/26/06. (jk)
January 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER granting #698 Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to to respond to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/25/06. (jk)
January 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER granting #701 Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/25/06. (jk)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER granting #700 Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Lloyds TSB Bank's Fourth Amended Complaint and the New York City Pension Fund Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/23/06. (jk)
January 23, 2006 Filing 709 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York (Geribon, Hector)
January 23, 2006 Filing 708 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System (Geribon, Hector)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER granting #695 Defendants Lance Poulsen, Barbara Poulsen, Kuld Corp, Donald Ayers and E&D Investments Inc's Motion for Extension of Time in which to move or plead with respect to Plaintiffs' amended complaints. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/23/06. (jk)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/23/06. (jk)
January 23, 2006 Filing 705 CLAIM Statement of Purcell & Scott to Amended Complaints by Defendant Purcell & Scott Co LPA. (Fornshell, Matthew)
January 23, 2006 Filing 704 ANSWER to Complaint (687) & (688) of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. et. al. and Notice of Settlement by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P..(Brown, Philip)
January 23, 2006 Filing 703 ANSWER to Complaint (686) City Of Chandler et.al. and Notice of Settlement by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P..(Brown, Philip)
January 23, 2006 Filing 702 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Notice of Settlement by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P..(Brown, Philip)
January 20, 2006 Filing 701 First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/22/2006. by Defendant Rebecca S Parrett. (Attachments: #1)(Zacks, Benjamin)
January 20, 2006 Filing 700 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 2/22/2006. Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Lloyds TSB Bank's Fourth Amended Complaint and the New York City Pension Fund Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, Dated January 20, 2006, by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Evan)
January 20, 2006 Filing 699 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 2/22/2006. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Long, Thomas)
January 20, 2006 Filing 698 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 2/22/2006. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Long, Thomas)
January 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER granting #692 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Replies due by 2/22/2006. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/20/06. (jr)
January 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER granting #693 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 2/22/2006; JP Morgan Chase & Co answer due 2/22/2006; JPMorgan Partners, LLC answer due 2/22/2006; JP Morgan Chase Bank answer due 2/22/2006; Wilkinson, Eric R. answer due 2/22/2006; Thomas G. Mendell answer due 2/22/2006; Harold W Pote answer due 2/22/2006; Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. answer due 2/22/2006; Beacon Group, LLC answer due 2/22/2006; J.P. Morgan Chase Partners, L.P. answer due 2/22/2006; Bank One Capital Markets, Inc. answer due 2/22/2006; Bank One National Association answer due 2/22/2006; Bank One, N.A. answer due 2/22/2006. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/20/06. (jr)
January 20, 2006 Filing 695 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 2/22/2006. by In Re Lance K Poulson, Donald H Ayers, Kuld Corp, Defendants E & D Investments, Barbara Poulsen. (Haller, John)
January 19, 2006 Filing 694 NOTICE by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. re #693 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 2/22/2006. Filing Exhibit A (Davis, Jessica)
January 19, 2006 Filing 693 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 2/22/2006. by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Davis, Jessica)
January 19, 2006 Filing 692 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 2/22/2006. by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Brown, Philip)
January 17, 2006 Filing 691 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fourth) against Moody's Investors Service Inc, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Lance K. Poulsen, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Fitch, Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A., filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Moody's Investors Service Inc, Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Lance K. Poulsen, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Fitch, Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A..(Levison, Harold)
January 17, 2006 Filing 690 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fourth) against JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Lance K. Poulsen, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A., filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Lance K. Poulsen, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One, N.A..(Levison, Harold)
January 13, 2006 Filing 689 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against all defendants, filed by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York, Defendants E & D Investments, Elyse Ayers, Ayers LLC, Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Healthcare Capital LLC, Intercontinental Investment Associates, Kachina, Inc., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Barbara Poulsen, Mitchell Stein, Eric R Wilkerson, Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, John F Andrews, Shattan Group LLC, Cheyenne-Blaze LLC, TSI Technologies and Holdings LLC, Swabb Financial LLC, Purcell, Joanne D, Cary W Purcell, Purcell & Scott Co LPA, Scott & Purcell, Co., L.P.A., Suzanne K Hosch, Wilkinson, Eric R., Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Rebecca nmi Parrett, Donald nmi Ayers, Barbara L. Poulsen, Lance K. Poulsen, Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P., Beacon Group, LLC, Fitch, Inc., Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P., Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, J.P. Morgan Chase Partners, L.P., Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One National Association, Bank One, N.A., Rebecca S Parrett.(Fineman, Steven)
January 13, 2006 Filing 688 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, et al., filed by Plaintiff Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc. (Attachments: #(1), #(2), #(3), #(4) 1st amended complaint continued)(bw)
January 13, 2006 Filing 687 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, filed by Plaintiff Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #(1), #(2), #(3), #(4) 1st amended complaint continued)(bw)
January 13, 2006 Filing 686 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank One, N.A., et al.filed by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. (Attachments: #(1) 2nd am cmp cont, #(2) 2nd am cmp cont, #(3) 2nd am cmp cont, #(4) 2nd am cmp cont, #(5) 2 am cmp cont)(bw)
January 13, 2006 Filing 685 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Credit Suisse First Boston Corporationfiled by State of Arizona (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5)(bw)
December 28, 2005 Filing 684 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle with JP Morgan Entities by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. (Cotner, Jeffry)
December 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER granting #391 Motion to Amend/Correct, granting #510 Motion to Amend/Correct, granting #256 Motion to Amend/Correct, granting #279 Motion for Leave to File. Overruling objection #651 to Magistrate Judge's order granting motion for leave to amend #619 .Signed by Judge James L Graham on 12/23/05. (ws)
December 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER granting #681 Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Motion for Extension of Time to plead or move in response to Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.'s amended complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/22/05. (jk)
December 21, 2005 Filing 681 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/17/2006. to Move or Plead and To Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
December 19, 2005 Filing 680 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP, filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V., In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huene, Claire)
December 16, 2005 Filing 679 NOTICE by In Re Lance K Poulson re #640 Amended Complaint, Answer of Defendant Lance Poulsen to First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff ING Bank, N.V. (Haller, John)
December 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER granting #677 Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.'s and defendants Bank One NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Beacon Group LLC, The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund LP and Harold W Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R Wilkinson's joint motion for Extensions of Time within which to serve opposition and reply papers in connection with the moving defendants' motions to dismiss ING Bank's first amended complaint. Responses due by 2/3/2006; Replies due by 3/3/2006.Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/9/05. (jk)
December 8, 2005 Filing 677 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #671 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #672 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT THE BEACON GROUP, LLC TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, #673 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO DISMISS ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, #674 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint, #675 MOTION to Dismiss ING's Amended Complaint New date requested 2/3/2006. New Date requested for reply 3/3/06 by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Rex)
December 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER granting #669 Defendant Lance Poulsen's unopposed motion for extension of time to file an answer to Plaintiff's first amended complaint - answer due 12/16/2005. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/5/05. (jk)
December 2, 2005 Filing 675 MOTION to Dismiss ING's Amended Complaint by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. Responses due by 12/27/2005 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants Harold W. Pote's, Thomas G. Mendell's, And Eric R. Wilkinson's Motion To Dismiss ING's Amended Complaint#2 Appendix Of Unreported Cases)(Lonergan, Kyle)
December 2, 2005 Filing 674 MOTION to Dismiss ING Bank N.V.'s Amended Complaint by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. Responses due by 12/27/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Garland, James)
December 2, 2005 Filing 673 MOTION to Dismiss ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. Responses due by 12/27/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K)(Wilkinson, William) Modified on 12/5/2005 (bw).
December 2, 2005 Filing 672 MOTION to Dismiss ING'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Beacon Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2005 (Wilkinson, William) Modified on 12/5/2005 (bw).
December 2, 2005 Filing 671 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. Responses due by 12/27/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M)(Davis, Jessica)
December 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER granting #668 Deloitte & Touche LLP's unopposed motion for extension in which to respond to Plaintiff's first amended complaint - ext. to 1/23/06. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/2/05. (jk)
December 1, 2005 Filing 669 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/16/2005. by In Re Lance K Poulson. (Haller, John)
December 1, 2005 Filing 668 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/23/2006. by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time To Respond)(Brown, Philip)
November 30, 2005 Filing 667 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by In Re Lance K Poulson (Haller, John)
November 16, 2005 Filing 666 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Fornshell Defendant Purcell & Scott Co LPA (Fornshell, Matthew)
October 27, 2005 Filing 665 NOTICE of Order lifting stay of MDL panel on 10/21/2005 and transferring 1:05-cv-7217 ING Bank NV v PricewaterhouseCoopers from SD of New York to Judge Graham. (bw) Modified on 10/27/2005 (bw, ).
October 25, 2005 Filing 664 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #639 Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. (Lonergan, Kyle)
October 14, 2005 Filing 663 RESPONSE in Opposition re #629 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee, Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen, Michael Mahoney, Louis Janssen, Larry R White, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, John P. Houlihan, HSBC Bank USA, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York, City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Arnold, James)
October 14, 2005 Filing 662 RESPONSE in Support re #575 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Brown, Philip)
October 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER GRANTING #659 Defendant Deloitte & Touche LLP's October 11, 2005 unopposed motion for extension of time to and including 10/14/2005 to reply to Plaintiffs' consolidated memorandum in opposition to motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/13/2005. (jr)
October 11, 2005 Filing 660 RESPONSE in Opposition re #652 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #640 Amended Complaint, New date requested 12/2/2005. Opposition to Pote's, Mendell's, Wilkinson's Objection to Magistrate's Order Granting ING Bank's Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Lee, Rex)
October 11, 2005 Filing 659 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 10/14/2005. to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memorandum in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Philip)
October 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER granting #613 Douglas H. Flaum, Israel David, Shazeb Lari and Laura Turcik's Motion for Leave to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendant The Beacon Group III Focus Value LP. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/6/05. (jk)
September 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER granting #653 Defendant Lance Poulsen's Motion for Extension of Time to answer ING Bank N.V.'s amended complaint - ext. to 12/2/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/28/05. (jk)
September 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER granting #643 defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA's and granting #648 Defendant Deloitte & Touche LLP's Motions for Ext of Time to respond to ING Bank, N.V.'s first amended complaint by 12/2/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/27/05. (jk) Modified on 9/28/2005 (bw).
September 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER granting #652 Defendants Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson's Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise plead to ING Bank, N.V.'s amended complaint - ext to 12/2/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/27/05. (jk)
September 27, 2005 Filing 653 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/2/2005. by Defendant Lance K. Poulsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Haller, John)
September 26, 2005 Filing 652 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #640 Amended Complaint, New date requested 12/2/2005. by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. (Lonergan, Kyle)
September 23, 2005 Filing 651 Objection re #639 Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Compliant by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. (Lonergan, Kyle)
September 23, 2005 Filing 650 RESPONSE in Support re #576 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsens' Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
September 23, 2005 Filing 649 NOTICE of Settlement Status by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York (Fineman, Steven)
September 22, 2005 Filing 648 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #640 Amended Complaint, New date requested 12/2/2005. by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond)(Brown, Philip)
September 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting #646 Deloitte & Touche LLP's Motion for an eighteen day extension of time in which to reply to Plaintiffs' consolidated memorandum in opposition to motions to dismisss submitted by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Harold W. Pote and Thomas G. Mendell - Deloitte is granted an eighteen day extension of time, to and including 10/11/05 in which to reply to Plaintiffs' consolidated memorandum in opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/20/05. (jk)
September 19, 2005 Filing 646 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/11/2005. to Reply to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Brown, Philip)
September 16, 2005 Filing 645 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Bank One, N.A. waiver sent on 9/13/2005, answer due 12/2/2005. (Lee, Rex)
September 16, 2005 Filing 644 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. waiver sent on 9/15/2005, answer due 12/2/2005. (Lee, Rex)
September 16, 2005 Filing 643 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #640 Amended Complaint, New date requested 12/2/2005.. (Wilkinson, William)
September 16, 2005 Filing 642 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Wilkinson, William)
September 13, 2005 Filing 641 RESPONSE in Support re #629 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority Relating to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti. (Deem, William)
September 9, 2005 Filing 640 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V. against JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A., Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P., Lance K. Poulsen, Harold W Pote, Thomas G. Mendell, Eric R Wilkerson, Beacon Group, LLC and The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. (jk)
September 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER granting #619 ING Bank N.V.'s Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/9/05. (jk)
September 7, 2005 Filing 638 NOTICE by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc re Voluntary Dismissal, With Prejudice, Of Lloyds TSB Bank plc's Claims Against Deloitte & Touche LLP (Levison, Harold)
September 7, 2005 Filing 637 NOTICE of Settlement with Deloitte & Touche LLP Re Case No. 03-cv-9973 (S.D.N.Y.) by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York (Fineman, Steven)
September 6, 2005 Filing 636 REPLY to Response to Motion re #619 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Reply Memorandum of Law to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and The Beacon Group LLC filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Lee, Rex)
September 6, 2005 Filing 635 RESPONSE in Opposition re #630 MOTION for Leave to File Advisory Concerning Possible SEC Enforcement Action Against Defendant JP Morgan Chase and Two of Its Unidentified Employees who Served as Directors of National Century Financial Enterprises Memorandum of J.P.Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and The Beacon Group, LLC in Opposition to Motions of Noteholder Plaintiffs for Leave to File Surreplies filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Partners, L.P.. (Wilkinson, William)
September 2, 2005 Filing 634 NOTICE of Settlement Update Between Deloitte & Touche LLP and Plaintiff Lloyds TSB Bank plc Re Case Nos. 2:03-MD-1565, 03-CV-2784 (D.N.J.) by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc (Levison, Harold)
September 1, 2005 Filing 633 REPLY to Response to Motion re #619 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Reply to Opposition of Messrs. Pote, Mendell and Wilkinson] filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Janus, Kevin)
September 1, 2005 Filing 632 NOTICE by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee, Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen, Michael Mahoney, Louis Janssen, Larry R White, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, John P. Houlihan, HSBC Bank USA, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York, City of Chandler Arizona et al., Defendant John F Andrews Notice to Court Concerning Possible Civil Injunctive Actions Against J.P. Morgan and Against Two Individuals for Violations of Certain Securities Laws in Connection with the Individuals' Roles as Former Members of NCFE's Board of Directors (Arnold, James)
August 31, 2005 Filing 631 RESPONSE in Opposition re #628 MOTION to Strike #622 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #620 Status Report, or alternatively, Motion of MetLife and Lloyds for Leave to File a Sur-Reply filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
August 31, 2005 Filing 630 MOTION for Leave to File Advisory Concerning Possible SEC Enforcement Action Against Defendant JP Morgan Chase and Two of Its Unidentified Employees who Served as Directors of National Century Financial Enterprises by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Patrick, Kathy)
August 29, 2005 Filing 629 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by In Re RJ Gold & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice of Supplemental Authority)#2 Exhibit B (Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals Decision))(Wojcik, Lawrence)
August 25, 2005 Filing 628 MOTION to Strike #622 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #620 Status Report, by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. (Wilkinson, William)
August 22, 2005 Filing 627 RESPONSE in Opposition re #619 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. (Wilkinson, William)
August 18, 2005 Filing 626 RESPONSE in Opposition re #619 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Of Unreported Cases)(Lonergan, Kyle)
August 18, 2005 Filing 625 RESPONSE to Motion re #619 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Brown, Philip)
August 17, 2005 Filing 624 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. (Patrick, Kathy)
August 15, 2005 Filing 623 NOTICE by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P. re #618 Amended Complaint (Brown, Philip)
August 12, 2005 Filing 622 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc re Possible Action By SEC Against J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and Two of Its Employees Who Served As Directors of National Century Financial Enterprises (Levison, Harold)
August 11, 2005 Filing 621 NOTICE of Settlement Between Deloitte & Touche LLP and Plaintiff Lloyds TSB Bank plc Re Case Nos. 2:03-MD-1565, 03-CV-2784 (D.N.J.) by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc (Levison, Harold)
August 9, 2005 Filing 620 STATUS REPORT (Advisory Concerning Possible SEC Enforcement Action Against Defendant JP Morgan Chase And Two Of Its Unindentified Employees Who Served As Directors Of National Century Financial Enterprises) by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Patrick, Kathy)
July 28, 2005 Filing 619 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 ING Bank N.V.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its First Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint#2 Declaration of Alexander C.B. Barnard#3 Exhibit A to Barnard Declaration: Amended Complaint)(Janus, Kevin)
July 22, 2005 Filing 618 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P., Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen, Defendants Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P., Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation.(Haller, John)
July 22, 2005 Filing 617 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen (Haller, John)
July 22, 2005 Filing 616 RESPONSE in Opposition re #575 MOTION to Dismiss, #576 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsens' Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen. (Haller, John)
July 15, 2005 Filing 615 REPLY to Response to Motion re #578 MOTION to Dismiss the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Amended Complaint REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE UNENCUMBERED ASSETS TRUST'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, In Re Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (Attachments: #1 PART 2#2 PART 3#3 PART 4#4 PART 5#5 Affidavit REVISED AFFIDAVIT OF THOMAS L. LONG#6 Exhibit EX. U#7 Exhibit EX. V#8 Exhibit EX. W#9 Exhibit EX. X#10 Exhibit EX. Y#11 Exhibit EX. Z#12 Exhibit EX. AA#13 Exhibit EX. BB#14 Exhibit EX. CC#15 Exhibit EX. DD#16 Exhibit EX. EE#17 Exhibit EX. FF#18 Exhibit EX. GG#19 Exhibit EX. HH#20 Exhibit EX. II#21 Exhibit EX. JJ#22 Exhibit EX. KK)(Long, Thomas)
July 14, 2005 Filing 614 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT [Notice to Court re: Settlement Between Deloitte & Touche LLP and Plaintiffs Re: Case Nos. CV03-1220; CIV03-1618; CV03-2084; and CV-04-1090] by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Cotner, Jeffry)
June 17, 2005 Filing 613 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV of Douglas H. Flaum, Israel David, Shazeb Lari and Lara Turcik on behalf of Defendant Beacon Group, LLC. (jk)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER granting #611 Lance and Barbara Poulsen's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss - Responses due by 7/22/2005 Replies due by 9/23/2005. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/17/05. (jk)
June 17, 2005 Filing 611 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/22/2005 by Plaintiffs Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion)(Tournoux, Katie) Modified on 6/20/2005 (bw)
May 26, 2005 Filing 610 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson re #609 Notice (Other) (Amended) (Lonergan, Kyle)
May 26, 2005 Filing 609 NOTICE by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson Notice Of Substitution Of Trial Attorney (Lonergan, Kyle)
May 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER granting #607 Plaintiffs Lance and Barbara Poulsen's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss - Plaintiffs response due by 6/30/2005; Defendants' reply to Plaintiffs' response due by 8/4/2005. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/26/05. (jk)
May 25, 2005 Filing 607 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 6/30/2005. Plaintiffs Lance and Barbara Poulsen's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Order Granting Plaintiffs Lance and Barbara Poulsen's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss)(Tournoux, Katie)
May 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting #601 Defendants Donald H. Ayers, E&D Investments, Inc. and Elise Ayers' Motion for Leave to File supplemental authority to their motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/25/05. (jk)
May 23, 2005 Filing 605 NOTICE by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P. of Substitution of Counsel (Davis, Jessica)
May 18, 2005 Filing 604 Response re #603 Supplemental - Opposing Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs ING Bank N.V., Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee, Michael Mahoney, Louis Janssen, Larry R White, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, John P. Houlihan, HSBC Bank USA, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York, City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Arnold, James)
May 17, 2005 Filing 603 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #595 Supplemental - Opposing, #590 Supplemental - Opposing, #592 Response (non motion) filed by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc, Moody's Investors Service Inc. (Walker, Lawrence)
May 17, 2005 Filing 602 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph F Murray (Murray, Joseph)
May 13, 2005 Filing 601 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority to Their Motion to Dismiss by Defendants E & D Investments, Elyse Ayers, In Re Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
May 13, 2005 Filing 600 NOTICE by Defendants E & D Investments, Elyse Ayers, In Re Donald H Ayers re #151 MOTION to Dismiss (Dickerson, Brian)
May 11, 2005 Filing 599 NOTICE by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc Notice To Court re SEC Action (Levison, Harold)
May 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting #597 Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss - Plaintiffs response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss due by 6/10/05; Defendants reply to Plaintiffs' response due by 7/13/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/11/05. (jk)
May 10, 2005 Filing 597 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #579 MOTION to Dismiss the Poulsen's Complaint, #575 MOTION to Dismiss, #576 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsens' Complaint New date requested 6/10/2005. by In Re Lance K Poulson, Defendant Barbara Poulsen. (Attachments: #1)(Snyder, Michael)
May 6, 2005 Filing 596 NOTICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. Advisory to United States District Court Concerning Possible Enforcement Action Against Bank One (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Patrick, Kathy)
May 4, 2005 Filing 595 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #592 Response (non motion) Reply of Lloyds TSB Bank plc to Fitch, Inc. filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
May 4, 2005 Filing 594 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #165 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopf, John)
May 3, 2005 Filing 593 NOTICE by Defendants Mitchell Stein, TSI Technologies and Holdings LLC, Swabb Financial LLC re #476 MOTION to Dismiss of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Longtin, Lynne)
April 29, 2005 Filing 592 Response re #590 Supplemental - Opposing / Response To LLoyds TSB Bank's Submission Filed April 26, 2005 Dated, April 29, 2005 by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Davis, Evan)
April 27, 2005 Filing 591 AFFIDAVIT re #588 Supplemental - Supporting Motion to Dismiss (Affidavit of Service) by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc. (Rubins, Joshua)
April 26, 2005 Filing 590 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #588 Supplemental - Supporting Response of Lloyds TSB Bank plc to Moody's Submission of Supplemental Authority filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
April 21, 2005 Filing 589 NOTICE by Defendants Cedric Johnson, Sam Romeo, Albert Marston, Suzanne K Hosch, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti re #163 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint of Supplemental Authority Relating to Motion to Dismiss (Deem, William)
April 21, 2005 Filing 588 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #152 MOTION to Dismiss In re Moody's Investors Service Inc. filed by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc, Moody's Investors Service Inc. (Rubins, Joshua)
April 19, 2005 Filing 587 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Edward Arnold (Arnold, James)
April 18, 2005 Filing 586 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
April 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER granting #574 Motion of William A Miller to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Rebecca S Parrett and Cheyenne-Blaze LLC. Attorney William A Miller terminated. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/13/05. (jk)
April 12, 2005 Filing 584 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Brown, Philip)
April 6, 2005 Filing 583 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Notice of Filing of Corrected Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Part 5#2 Exhibit C - Part 1#3 Exhibit C - Part 2#4 Exhibit C - Part 3#5 Exhibit C - Part 4#6 Exhibit C - Part 5)(Long, Thomas)
April 5, 2005 Filing 582 NOTICE by Plaintiff Michael Mahoney of Withdrawal of Counsel (Arnold, James)
April 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting #573 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV of R. Colby Allsbrook on behalf of Defendants Credit First Boston LLC and Credit Suisse First Boston, New York Branch and Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/1/05. (jk)
March 31, 2005 Filing 580 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of the Unencumbered Assets Trust by In Re Lance K Poulson, Defendant Barbara Poulsen. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Haller, John)
March 31, 2005 Filing 579 MOTION to Dismiss the Poulsen's Complaint by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss#2 Appendix 1#3 Appendix 2#4 Appendix 3#5 Appendix 4#6 Appendix 5#7 Appendix 6#8 Appendix 7#9 Appendix 8)(Lonergan, Kyle)
March 31, 2005 Filing 578 MOTION to Dismiss the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Amended Complaint by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas L. Long in Support of Motion to Dismiss#6 Exhibit A#7 Exhibit B#8 Exhibit C#9 Exhibit D#10 Exhibit E#11 Exhibit F - PART 1#12 Exhibit F - Part 2 UAT#13 Exhibit F - Part 3 UAT#14 Exhibit G#15 Exhibit H#16 Exhibit I#17 Exhibit J#18 Exhibit K#19 Exhibit L#20 Exhibit M#21 Exhibit N#22 Errata O#23 Exhibit P#24 Exhibit Q#25 Exhibit R#26 Exhibit S#27 Exhibit T#28 Supplement Cases Part 1#29 Supplement Cases Part 2#30 Exhibit Cases Part 3#31 Supplement Cases Part 4#32 Supplement Case Part 5#33 Supplement Cases Part 6#34 Supplement Cases Part 7#35 Exhibit Cases Part 8#36 Supplement Cases Part 9#37 Supplement Cases Part 10#38 Supplement Cases Part 11#39 Supplement Cases Part 12#40 Supplement Cases Part 13#41 Supplement Cases Part 14#42 Supplement Cases Part 15#43 Supplement Cases Part 16#44 Supplement Cases Part 17#45 Exhibit Cases Part 18#46 Exhibit Cases Part 19#47 Supplement Cases Part 20)(Long, Thomas)
March 31, 2005 Filing 577 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THE UNENCUMBERED TRUST AND ERWIN I. KATZ, LTD., TRUSTEE by In Re Donald H Ayers. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Dickerson, Brian)
March 31, 2005 Filing 576 MOTION to Dismiss Poulsens' Complaint by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1#2 Exhibit A Part 2#3 Exhibit B - Part 1#4 Exhibit B - Part 2#5 Exhibit B - Part 3#6 Exhibit B - Part 4#7 Exhibit C - Part 1#8 Exhibit C - Part 2#9 Exhibit C - Part 3#10 Exhibit C - Part 4#11 Exhibit C - Part 5#12 Exhibit D#13 Exhibit E#14 Exhibit F#15 Exhibit G#16 Exhibit H#17 Exhibit I#18 Supplement Cases - Part 1#19 Supplement Cases Part 2#20 Supplement Cases Part 3)(Long, Thomas)
March 31, 2005 Filing 575 MOTION to Dismiss by In Re Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Deloitte & Touche LLP's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint#2 Exhibit A Amended Complaint in Civil Action No. C2-04-1090 (pages 1-100)#3 Exhibit A (continued) Amended Complaint in Civil Action No. C2-04-1090 (pages 101-200)#4 Exhibit A (continued) Amended Complaint in Civil Action No. C2-04-1090 (pages 201-300)#5 Exhibit A (continued) Amended Complaint in Civil Action No. C2-04-1090 (pages 301-390)#6 Exhibit B Statement of Facts in Civil Action No. C2-03-207#7 Exhibit C Statement of Facts in Civil Action No. C2-03-119#8 Exhibit D Statement of Facts in Civil Action No. C2-04-193)(Brown, Philip)
March 22, 2005 Filing 574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney William A. Miller's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Rebecca S. Parrett and Cheyenne-Blaze, LLC by Defendants Cheyenne-Blaze LLC, Rebecca nmi Parrett, Rebecca S Parrett, In Re Rebecca S Parrett. (Zacks, Benjamin)
March 18, 2005 Filing 573 MOTION filed by Robert Colby Allsbrook for Leave to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (dms)
March 17, 2005 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 200 245802 for PHV app of R. Colby Allsbrook (dms, )
March 7, 2005 Filing 572 Response to Fitch, Inc.'s Suggestion of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Geribon, Hector)
March 3, 2005 Filing 571 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #570 Supplemental - Supporting, Response of Lloyds TSB Bank plc to Fitch, Inc.'s Suggestion of Supplemental Authority filed by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
February 25, 2005 Filing 570 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #160 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Lloyd's TSB Bank's Second Amended Complaint, #228 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss NYC Pension Funds' First Amended Complaint /Suggestion of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants Fitch, Inc., Fitch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Part 1#2 Part 2#3 Part 3#4 Part 4#5 Part 5)(Davis, Evan)
February 17, 2005 Filing 569 Reply re #566 Brief,,, by In Re Lance K Poulson, Kuld Corp, Defendant Barbara Poulsen. (Haller, John)
February 14, 2005 Filing 568 Reply re #566 Brief,,, to Plaintiff's Consolidated Memorandum in Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss of all Defendants by Defendants E & D Investments, Ayers LLC, In Re Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
February 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #545 the Motion for Protective Order . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 2/4/2005. (bw)
February 3, 2005 Filing 566 BRIEF/Consolidated Memorandum in opposition to the motions to dismiss filed in 04-697 by In Re Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund L P. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service#2 Appendix Index of Unreported Cases#3 Appendix Unreported Case 1#4 Appendix Unreported Case 2#5 Appendix Unreported Case 3#6 Appendix Unreported Case 4#7 Appendix Unreported Case 5#8 Appendix Unreported Case 6#9 Appendix Unreported Case 7#10 Appendix Unreported Case 8 (part 1)#11 Appendix Unreported Case 8 (part 2)#12 Appendix Unreported Case 9#13 Appendix Unreported Case 10#14 Appendix Unreported Case 11#15 Appendix Unreported Case 12 (part 1)#16 Appendix Unreported Case 12 (part 2)#17 Appendix Unreported Case 13#18 Appendix Unreported Case 14#19 Appendix Unreported Case 15#20 Appendix Unreported Case 16#21 Appendix Unreported Case 17#22 Appendix Unreported Case 18)(Jacobs, Rebecca) Modified on 2/4/2005 (bw, ).
January 24, 2005 Filing 565 RESPONSE in Support re #545 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Asset's Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information "Unencumbered Assets Trust's Onmibus Reply Memorandum In Support of Its Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information and Motion for Entry of Protective Order". (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting #563 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/31/05 to answer in 04-1097, memo in op to motion by 3/31/05 and reply to motion by 6/30/2005. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 1/20/2005. (bw)
January 19, 2005 Filing 563 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/31/2005. to Respond and for Extended Briefing Schedule by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Philip)
January 17, 2005 Filing 562 NOTICE by Defendants Mitchell Stein, TSI Technologies and Holdings LLC, Swabb Financial LLC of Withdrawal and Disassociation as Counsel (Phan, Luan)
January 13, 2005 Filing 561 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints Reply Affidavit of Cindy C. Kelly in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
January 13, 2005 Filing 560 RESPONSE in Support re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Motion of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company and Lloyds TSB Bank PLC for Leave to Amend their Complaints filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
January 12, 2005 Filing 559 NOTICE by Defendant Fitch, Inc. /Notice of Change of Firm Name and Legal Status (Davis, Evan)
January 11, 2005 Filing 558 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit A to Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit Cases)(Lazear, Sherri)
January 10, 2005 Filing 557 RESPONSE in Opposition re #545 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Asset's Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information filed by In Re Lance K Poulson, Kuld Corp, Defendant Barbara Poulsen. (Haller, John)
January 10, 2005 Filing 556 RESPONSE to Motion re #545 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Asset's Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information filed by Defendants Purcell, Joanne D, Cary W Purcell, Purcell & Scott Co LPA, Scott & Purcell, Co., L.P.A.. (Andelman, Matthew)
January 10, 2005 Filing 555 RESPONSE in Opposition re #545 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Asset's Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information Consolidated Memorandum of Certain Defendants in Response to the Motion of the Unencumbered Assets Trust for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information and Motion for Entry of Protective Order filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Eric R. Wilkinson, Thomas G. Mendell, Harold W Pote, Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P., Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Bank One, N.A., In Re Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Callagy, John)
January 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER ext time to 3/31/2005 for moving defts to ans the complaint in 04-1090, ext time to 5/31/2005 for pltf to respond to motion by moving defts and moving defts have to 6/30/2005 to file any reply briefs. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 1/10/2005. (bw)
January 6, 2005 Filing 553 RESPONSE to Motion re #545 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Asset's Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information, #552 MOTION to Produce Memorandum of Law in Support of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information and Motion for Entry of Protective Order filed by Defendants E & D Investments, Elyse Ayers, Ayers LLC, In Re Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
January 6, 2005 Filing 552 Memorandum of Law in Support of #545 the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information and Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Plaintiffs New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, New York City Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Geribon, Hector) Modified on 1/10/2005 (bw)
January 4, 2005 Filing 551 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #550 Supplemental - Supporting (non motion) filed by Plaintiffs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
December 27, 2004 Filing 550 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #177 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Citation)(Long, Thomas)
December 27, 2004 Filing 549 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #535 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Citation)(Long, Thomas)
December 23, 2004 Filing 548 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information and Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Janus, Kevin)
December 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER denying without prejudice to renewing it #544 William A. Miller's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Parrett and Cheyenne-Blaze. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/20/04. (jk)
December 16, 2004 Filing 546 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. Amendment to #545 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Asset's Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information [AMENDED EXH. O to Mt. for Protective Order and Unemcumbered Assets Trust Mt. for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information]. (Cotner, Jeffry)
December 16, 2004 Filing 545 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Asset's Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B#2 Exhibit C#3 Exhibit D#4 Exhibit E-I#5 Exhibit J-M#6 Exhibit N-R)(Cotner, Jeffry)
December 16, 2004 Filing 544 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by In Re Rebecca S Parrett. (Miller, William)
December 16, 2004 Filing 543 AFFIDAVIT of Service and Summons returned executed on Eric Wilkinson on 19 October 2004 filed by Atty Joseph Murray for pltf Pharos Caiptal Partners. (bw)
December 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE pltf Pharos has 15 days to show cause why action against Eric Wilkinson should not be dismissed for failure to effect service. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 12/16/2004. (bw)
December 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Lance Poulsen, Barbara Poulsen & Kuld Corp. unopposed Motion for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ext. to 1/3/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/16/04. (jk)
December 14, 2004 Filing 540 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints Memorandum of Law of The Beacon Group III Focus Value Fund, L.P. in Opposition to the New Jersey Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Their Complaints filed by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Flaum, Douglas)
December 14, 2004 Filing 539 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints /Fitch, Inc.'s Opposition to Lloyds TSB Bank's Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint a Fourth Time, dated December 14, 2004 filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Davis, Evan)
December 14, 2004 Filing 538 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints /Declaration of Stephen M. Rich, dated December 14, 2004 filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Davis, Evan)
December 14, 2004 Filing 537 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints Memorandum of Law of Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and The Beacon Group, LLC in Opposition to the Motion of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company, and LLoyds TSB Bank PLC for Leave to Amend filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Beacon Group, LLC. (Callagy, John)
December 14, 2004 Filing 536 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints filed by In Re Lance K Poulson. (Haller, John)
December 14, 2004 Filing 535 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Law 1#2 Exhibit Case Law 2)(Long, Thomas)
December 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER granting #532 Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to file reply ext to 1/13/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/1/04. (jk)
December 1, 2004 Filing 533 NOTICE by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P. of Substitution of Trial Attorney (Brown, Philip)
November 30, 2004 Filing 532 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/13/2005. by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Levison, Harold)
November 29, 2004 Filing 531 RESPONSE to Motion re #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints Harold W. Pote's, Thomas G. Mendell's, and Eric R. Wilkinson's Consolidated Opposition to New Jersey Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend filed by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Lonergan, Kyle)
November 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER granting #480 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave of Court to issue document preservation subpeona to non-party Med Diversified, Inc. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/26/04. (jk)
November 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting #528 Defendant Deloitte & Touche, LLP's Motion for Extension of Time to respond ext. to 12/14/04. MetLife and Lloyd's must file their reply w/respect to the Motion for Leave to Amend on or before 1/13/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/24/04. (jk)
November 24, 2004 Notice of Correction - Re-numbering of documents: #527 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #528 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/14/2004. To Respond to Motion of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company and LloydsTSB Bank PLC For Leave To Amend Their Complaints, #526 Mail Returned (jk)
November 24, 2004 Filing 528 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/14/2004. To Respond to Motion of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company and LloydsTSB Bank PLC For Leave To Amend Their Complaints by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Szolosi, Michael)
November 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER granting #523 Focus Value Fund's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to motion ext to 12/14/04 - Plaintiffs have until 1/13/05 to file their reply w/respect to the motion. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/24/04. (jk)
November 23, 2004 Filing 526 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Document #517 sent to Home Medical Care of America Inc - no forwarding address available. (jk)
November 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #524 Defendant's J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank and the Beacon Group, LLC Motion for Extension of Time to respond ext to 12/14/04. MetLife and Lloyd's must file their reply w/respect to the Motion for Leave to Amend by 1/13/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/22/04. (jk)
November 19, 2004 Filing 524 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/14/2004. Motion for Extension of Time of Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank and The Beacon Group, LLC to Respond to the Motion of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Co., and LLoyds TSB Bank PLC for Leave to Amend Their Complaints by Defendants Beacon Group, LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank, JPMorgan Partners, LLC. (Callagy, John)
November 19, 2004 Filing 523 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints New date requested 12/14/2004. by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (David, Israel)
November 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER granting #521 Motion for Extension of Time - Credit Suisse First Boston LLC will have until 12/14/04 to file a response to the motion and NJ Noteholders will have until 1/13/05 to file their reply to the motion. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/19/04. (jk)
November 18, 2004 Filing 521 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/14/2004. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
November 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting #518 Unopposed Motion of Defendant Lance Poulsen for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion of Plaintiffs for Leave to Amend Their Complaints - ext to 12/14/04. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/16/04. (jk)
November 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #517 Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time ext. to 12/14/04 - Lloyd's TSB Bank's reply brief due 1/13/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/16/04. (jk)
November 16, 2004 Filing 518 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/14/2004. by In Re Lance K Poulson. (Haller, John)
November 15, 2004 Filing 517 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defts motion to amend New date requested 12/14/2004 by Defendant Fitch, Inc. (Davis, Evan) Modified on 11/22/2004 (bw).
November 15, 2004 Filing 516 NOTICE of substitution of counsel for Defendants Mitchell Stein, Swabb Financial LLC, TSI Technologies and Holdings LLC (Longtin, Lynne) Modified on 11/22/2004 (bw, ).
November 10, 2004 Filing 515 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Mail sent to National Rehab of Florida - New address PO Box 5050 Cherry Hill NJ 08034-5050; resent. (jk)
November 8, 2004 Filing 514 REPLY to Response to Motion re #476 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Mitchell Stein, Swabb Financial LLC, TSI Technologies and Holdings LLC. (Longtin, Lynne)
November 5, 2004 Filing 513 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #500 mailed to National Rehab of Florida - no forwarding address. (jk)
November 5, 2004 Filing 512 STIPULATED JOINDER by Thomas Mendell TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE PHAROS COMPLAINT #166 MOTION to Dismiss, #168 MOTION to Dismiss, #270 Response in Opposition to Motion, #373 Reply to Response to Motion,, #374 Reply to Response to Motion, (Lonergan, Kyle) Modified on 11/8/2004 (bw).
November 3, 2004 Filing 511 AFFIDAVIT of Cindy C. Kelly by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One#2 Exhibit Two#3 Exhibit Three)(Levison, Harold)
November 3, 2004 Filing 510 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Levison, Harold)
November 1, 2004 Filing 509 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint and Transfer Order Pursuant to Article 5 of the Hague Convention served on Eric R. Wilkinson on October 19, 2004, filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Janus, Kevin)
November 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting #505 Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Ptf's Memo of Law in Opposition - Replies due by 11/8/2004. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/1/04. (jk)
October 29, 2004 Filing 507 AFFIDAVIT re #506 Response (non motion), Response (non motion) Certificate Of Service by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
October 29, 2004 Filing 506 Response re #502 Supplemental - Supporting (non motion) Response Of Lloyds TSB Bank PLC To The Suggestion Of Supplemental Authority Of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC And Credit Suisse First Boston, New York Branch by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
October 28, 2004 Filing 505 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #499 Response in Opposition to Motion, New date requested 11/8/2004. Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by Defendants Mitchell Stein, Swabb Financial LLC. (Phelps, Arthur) Modified on 10/29/2004 (bw, ).
October 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER overruling the appeal and objections by Credit Suisse and Affirming the Bankruptcy Court's order of 9/3/2004 and the order of the US Magistrate Judge on 10-12-2004 and dismissing cases 2:04-cv-0963 and 2:04-mc-088. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/27/2004. (bw)
October 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER denying the appeal and Affirming the May 4, 2004 order of the US Bankruptcy and dismissing case 2:04-cv-625. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/26/2004. (bw)
October 26, 2004 Filing 502 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #501 Supplemental - Supporting (non motion) Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
October 26, 2004 Filing 501 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #170 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
October 25, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER LIFTING STAY of Conditional Transfer Order. (jk)
October 15, 2004 Filing 499 RESPONSE in Opposition re #476 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motions of Defendants Mitchell J. Stein and Swab Financial, LLC to Dismiss the Florida Class Actions filed by Plaintiffs John P. Houlihan, Michael Mahoney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Arnold, James)
October 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER denying as moot #491 Motion for Leave to File a surreply. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/6/2004. (bw)
October 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER denying #452 Motion by Mendell to Dismiss and #478 Motion by Pharos for Leave to File a surreply . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/6/2004. (bw)
October 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER: #85 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #86 Motion to Dismiss, #87 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #88 Motion to Dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT and #217 Motion for Extension of Time is Granted . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/6/2004. (bw)
October 4, 2004 Filing 495 Summons Issued as to Eric R. Wilkinson by Joseph F Murray on behalf of Pharos Capital Partners LP. (jk)
October 1, 2004 Filing 494 Summons Issued as to Eric R. Wilkinson. (jk)
September 29, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER denying Defendant Wilkinson's August 10, 2004 motion to dismiss the complaints in Pharos and ING for insufficiency of service of process (472). Plaintiffs Pharos and ING are ordered to serve Wilkinson in compliance with the Hague Convention within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order and to file proof of service of process with this court. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 09/29/04. (ws) Modified on 10/7/2004 (bw, ).
September 27, 2004 Filing 492 REPLY to Response to Motion re #480 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave of Court to Issue Document Preservation Subpoena to Non-Party Med Diversified, Inc. Reply to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave of Court to Issue Document Preservation Subpoena to Non-Party Med Diversified, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs John P. Houlihan, Michael Mahoney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Arnold, James)
September 27, 2004 Filing 491 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Eric R. Wilkinson's Motion to Dismiss Certain Complaints Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 41(b) by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Service#2 Appendix Letter to Court re website malfunction)(Janus, Kevin)
September 20, 2004 Filing 490 RESPONSE to Motion re #478 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of His Rule 12(B)(6) Motion To Dismiss filed by Defendant Thomas G. Mendell. (Lonergan, Kyle)
September 17, 2004 Filing 489 NOTICE by Defendant John F Andrews of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Issue Document Preservation Subpoena to Med Diversified, Inc. (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
September 16, 2004 Filing 488 RESPONSE in Opposition re #480 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave of Court to Issue Document Preservation Subpoena to Non-Party Med Diversified, Inc. filed by Defendants Suzanne K Hosch, Cedric Johnson, Albert Marston, Sam Romeo, In Re George A Kuselias, Frank P Magliochetti. (Deem, William)
September 14, 2004 Filing 487 REPLY to Response to Motion re #472 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Complaints Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 41(b) filed by Defendant Eric R. Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Appendix 1#9 Appendix 2#10 Appendix 3#11 Appendix 4#12 Appendix 5#13 Appendix 6)(Lonergan, Kyle)
September 9, 2004 Filing 486 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Eric R. Wilkinson re #472 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Complaints Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 41(b) ONLY as to City of Chandler and State of Arizona (Lonergan, Kyle)
September 1, 2004 Filing 485 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff City of Chandler Arizona et al. re #484 Summons Returned Executed FOR THE ARIZONA NOTEHOLDERS PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE AND PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ERIC WILKINSON (Humphries, Scott)
September 1, 2004 Filing 484 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Eric R. Wilkinson served on 8/13/2004, answer due 9/2/2004. (Humphries, Scott)
August 31, 2004 Filing 483 RESPONSE in Opposition re #472 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Complaints Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 41(b) filed by Plaintiff ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin A. Janus#2 Certificate of Service)(Janus, Kevin)
August 31, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting #463 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth Hickox, Jr. . Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/27/2004. (bw)
August 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER granting #479 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to 9/17/04 for dft Wilkinson to reply to ptf Pharos Capital's Amended Response in Oppposition. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 08/26/04. (jk)
August 26, 2004 Filing 480 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave of Court to Issue Document Preservation Subpoena to Non-Party Med Diversified, Inc. by Plaintiffs John P. Houlihan, Michael Mahoney. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Donald R. Hall)(Arnold, James)
August 25, 2004 Filing 479 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/17/2004. To Reply To Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P?s Amended Response In Opposition To Mr. Wilkinson?s Motion To Dismiss Certain Complaints Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure 12(B)(5) And 41(B) by Defendant Eric R. Wilkinson. (Lonergan, Kyle)
August 25, 2004 Filing 478 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of His Rule 12(B)(6) Motion To Dismiss by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Surreply of Plaintiff Pharos Capital Partners, L.P. to Defendant Thomas G. Mendell's Reply Memorandum of Law In Further Support of His Motion to Dismiss)(Murray, Joseph)
August 24, 2004 Filing 477 RESPONSE in Opposition re #472 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Complaints Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 41(b) Amended filed by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
August 23, 2004 Filing 476 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Mitchell Stein, Swabb Financial LLC, TSI Technologies and Holdings LLC. Responses due by 9/16/2004 (Phelps, Arthur)
August 20, 2004 Filing 475 RESPONSE in Opposition re #472 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Complaints Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 41(b) filed by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
August 19, 2004 Filing 474 REPLY to Response to Motion re #452 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) and 12(b)(5) filed by Defendant Thomas G. Mendell. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unreported Cases)(Lonergan, Kyle)
August 19, 2004 Filing 473 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #177 MOTION to Dismiss Suggestion of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Long, Thomas)
August 10, 2004 Filing 472 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Complaints Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 41(b) by Defendant Eric R. Wilkinson. Responses due by 9/3/2004 (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E)(Lonergan, Kyle)
August 6, 2004 Filing 471 Response re #466 Supplemental - Supporting, Suggestion of Supplemental Authority by In Re Lloyds TSB Bank plc. (Levison, Harold)
August 5, 2004 Filing 470 Response To Fitch, Inc.'s Suggestion of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Geribon, Hector)
August 5, 2004 Filing 469 RESPONSE in Opposition re #452 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) and 12(b)(5) filed by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Shostack Affidavit#2 Exhibit B Collins Ltr#3 Exhibit C Frankel Ltr)(Murray, Joseph)
August 5, 2004 Filing 468 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Thomas G. Mendell served on 7/26/2004, answer due 8/16/2004. (Murray, Joseph)
August 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 8/5/2004. (bw)
August 3, 2004 Filing 466 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #228 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss NYC Pension Funds' First Amended Complaint, #160 MOTION to Dismiss /Defendant Fitch, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Lloyd's TSB Bank's Second Amended Complaint /Suggestion Of Supplemental Authority filed by In Re Moody's Investors Service Inc, Fitch Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Authority)(Davis, Evan)
July 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER denying #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (1) All Actions Filed Against Them in Arizona Due to Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and (2) One Such Action Filed in Arizona by Rebecca S. Parrett against Lance K. Poulsen and Barbara L. Poulsen Due to Fai filed by Lance K Poulson, Barbara Poulsen, Kuld Corp. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 7/27/2004. (bw)
July 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER denying the motion to stay the 5/4/04 order of the Bankruptcy Court and dismissing case #04-577. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 7/27/2004. (bw)
July 22, 2004 Filing 463 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kenneth N Hickox Jr for In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: (1) filing fee rcpt #242474 $50.00)(sh, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 462 RESPONSE in Support re #159 MOTION to Dismiss Florida Complaints filed by Defendants Cheyenne-Blaze LLC, Rebecca S Parrett, Rebecca nmi Parrett. (Zacks, Benjamin)
July 19, 2004 NOTICE of Appeals from the Bankruptcy Court re: NCF LitigationParrett et. al. vs NCF 2:04-cv-0489 (US Bankruptcy NO. 02-65235) filed on 6-8-2004, Amedisys Inc. v NCF 2:04-cv-493 (US Bankruptcy No. 02-65235) filed on 6/9/2004, JP Morgan Chase, et al. v NCF et al. originally assigned case number 2:04-mc-35 reassigned 2:04-cv-577 (US Bankruptcy No. 2-bk-65235), In Re: National Century Finance 2:04-cv-625 (US Bankruptcy No. 02-bk-65235) filed on 7/16/2004, and Amedisys Inc, et al. v JP Morgan Chase Manhattan Bank, et al. 2:04-cv-626 (US Bankruptcy No. 02-bk-65235 Adversary Number 02-02576) filed on 7/16/2004. This entry for informational purposes only, there is no document attached to this entry. (bw)
July 15, 2004 Filing 461 Summons Issued as to Thomas Mendell. (sh, )
July 15, 2004 Filing 460 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Barbara Poulsen, Lance K Poulson by Benjamin Zacks(bw)
July 15, 2004 Filing 459 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Barbara and Lance K Poulson. (bw)
July 15, 2004 Filing 458 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #391 MOTION to Amend/Correct #205 Amended Complaint,, proposed Second Amended Complaint CORRECTED filed by Plaintiffs New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit)(Geribon, Hector)
July 15, 2004 Filing 457 NOTICE by Plaintiffs New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York re #456 Affidavit in Support of Motion, Notice of Errata (Geribon, Hector)
July 13, 2004 Filing 456 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #391 MOTION to Amend/Correct #205 Amended Complaint,, proposed Second Amended Complaint Affidavit in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit)(Geribon, Hector)
July 13, 2004 Filing 455 REPLY to Response to Motion re #391 MOTION to Amend/Correct #205 Amended Complaint,, proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Police Pension Fund, Teachers' Retirement System for the City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished case - Aetna#2 Exhibit Unpublished case - McNeal#3 Exhibit Unpublished case - SPX)(Geribon, Hector)
July 13, 2004 Filing 454 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Thomas G. Mendell re #452 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) and 12(b)(5), #453 Brief, (Lonergan, Kyle)
July 12, 2004 Filing 453 BRIEF re #452 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) and 12(b)(5)by Defendant Thomas G. Mendell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Appendix A#4 Appendix B)(Lonergan, Kyle)
July 12, 2004 Filing 452 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) and 12(b)(5) by Defendant Thomas G. Mendell. Responses due by 8/5/2004 (Lonergan, Kyle)
July 9, 2004 Filing 451 REPLY to Response to Motion re #228 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Fitch Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss NYC Pension Funds' First Amended Complaint / Fitch, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss, Dated July 9, 2004 filed by Defendant Fitch, Inc.. (Davis, Evan)
July 9, 2004 Filing 450 RESPONSE in Support re #391 MOTION to Amend/Correct #205 Amended Complaint,, proposed Second Amended Complaint, #242 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unreported Cases#2 Appendix Unreported Cases#3 Appendix Unreported Cases#4 Appendix Unreported Cases#5 Appendix Unreported Cases#6 Appendix Unreported Cases#7 Appendix Unreported Cases)(Long, Thomas)
July 7, 2004 Filing 449 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Beacon Group III - Focus Value Fund, L.P., c/o CT Corporation System on June 29, 2004, filed by In Re Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
July 7, 2004 Filing 448 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Lance Poulson and Barbara Poulson on June 21, 2004, filed by In Re Rebecca S Parrett. (Zacks, Benjamin)
July 7, 2004 Filing 447 Summons Issued by Joseph Murray for Pharos Capital Partners to Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (bw)
July 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 446 STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re: claims between pltfs and defts Stein, TSI Tech and Swab Financial. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 7/6/2004. (bw)
July 2, 2004 Filing 445 RESPONSE to Motion re #252 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint DEFENDANTS HAROLD W. POTE?S, THOMAS G. MENDELL?S AND ERIC R. WILKINSON?S CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed by In Re H. Pote, T. Mendell & E. Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A#2 Appendix B#3 Appendix C#4 Appendix D#5 Appendix E#6 Appendix F#7 Appendix G#8 Appendix H#9 Appendix I#10 Appendix J#11 Appendix K#12 Appendix L#13 Appendix M#14 Appendix N#15 Appendix O#16 Appendix P#17 Appendix Q)(Lonergan, Kyle)
July 2, 2004 Filing 444 RESPONSE in Support re #250 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Motions of Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank and the Beacon Group, LLC to Dismiss New York City Employees' Retirement System v. Bank One, N.A., et al., No. 03-CV-09973 filed by Defendants Beacon Group, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Partners, L.P., JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nicholas J. Panarella)(Callagy, John)
July 2, 2004 Filing 443 REPLY to Response to Motion re #243 MOTION to Dismiss New York City Employees' Retirement System Complaint filed by In Re Banc One Capital Markets Inc, Defendants Bank One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank One National Association, Bank One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unreported Cases)(Garland, James)
July 2, 2004 Filing 442 REPLY to Response to Motion re #248 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in NYCERS filed by Defendant Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unreported Decisions)(Sher, Barry)
July 2, 2004 Filing 441 REPLY to Response to Motion re #226 MOTION to Dismiss NYCERS Amended complaint filed by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, L.L.P.. (Szolosi, Michael) Modified on 7/2/2004 (tto, ).
July 2, 2004 Filing 440 REPLY to Response to Motion re #249 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Donald H. Ayers filed by Defendant Donald nmi Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
July 2, 2004 Filing 439 REPLY to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #143 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints filed by Defendant Purcell & Scott Co LPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Andelman, Matthew)
July 2, 2004 Filing 438 RESPONSE in Opposition re #391 MOTION to Amend/Correct #205 Amended Complaint,, proposed Second Amended Complaint Def