Unencumbered Assets Trust et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: Erwin I. Katz, LTD and Unencumbered Assets Trust
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Intercontinental Investment Associates, Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz, The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP, Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP, Donald H Ayers, Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse, New York Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, Lance K Poulsen, Bank One, N.A., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Rebecca S Parrett, Barbara L. Poulsen, Kachina, Inc., Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., JP Morgan Chase Bank, Kaye Scholer, LLP, Purcell & Scott, L.P.A., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Task Holdings, LTD, CSFB USA and Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.
Interested Party: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2004cv01090
Filed: November 17, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
Presiding Judge: Mark R Abel
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER Terminating Case. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 11/3/11. (ds)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER re APPROVED Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of the UAT's Claims against Credit Suisse. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 11/3/11. (ds)
November 2, 2011 Filing 387 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of the UAT's Claims Against Credit Suisse and (Proposed) Order) by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Humphries, Scott)
June 1, 2011 Filing 386 REPLY to Response to Motion re #381 MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] (The UAT's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of The Court's Opinion and Order Granting Summary Judgment on The UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims) filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Humphries, Scott)
May 19, 2011 Filing 385 RESPONSE in Opposition re #381 MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] -- Credit Suisse Defendants' Opposition to the UAT's Motion for Reconsideration -- filed by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 12, 2011 Filing 384 STIPULATION of Dismissal [The UAT'S Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendants Lance Poulsen, Barbara Poulsen, Donald Ayers, Intercontinental Investment Advisors, Healthcare Capital, LLC, FLorhaz Partners, LLC, South Atlantic Investments, LLC., Thor Capital Holdings, LLC, and Kachina, Inc.] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 11, 2011 Filing 383 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust [The UAT'S Statement of Intent Regarding its Claims Against the NCFE Founders] (Patrick, Kathy)
May 11, 2011 Filing 382 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust [The UAT'S Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Rebecca Parrett] (Patrick, Kathy)
May 11, 2011 Filing 381 MOTION for Reconsideration [The UAT'S Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order (Doc. 380) Granting Summary Judgment on the UAT's Preference and Fraudulent Transfer Claims] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting Credit Suisse's motion for summary judgment in the UAT case; granting #345 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #356 Motion to Strike; granting #358 Motion for briefing schedule; finding as moot #361 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 4/12/2011. (jlg6)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting #366 Motion for leave to suggest supplemental authority. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 12/13/2010. (jlg6)
October 28, 2010 Filing 378 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust The Arizona Noteholders and Unencumbered Assets Trust's Response to Defendant Credit Suisse's October 8, 2010 and October 25, 2010 Suggestions of Supplemental Authority (Patrick, Kathy)
October 25, 2010 Filing 377 NOTICE/Suggestion of Supplemental Authority Relating to Their Pending Motion For Summary Judgment/ by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2010 Filing 376 Suggestion of Supplemental Authority Relating to Their Pending Summary Judgment Motions by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC & Credit Suisse, New York Branch. (Brody, Steven)
June 9, 2010 Filing 375 Response re #374 Notice (Other) /The Credit Suisse Defendants' Response to the Unencumbered Assets Trust's May 26, 2010 Suggestion of Authority/ by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2010 Filing 374 NOTICE of Suggestion of Supplemental Authority Relating to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Patrick, Kathy) Modified on 5/27/2010 to clarify text (kk2).
February 9, 2010 Filing 373 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Notice of Filing Under Seal of Certified Transcript on December 17, 2008 Telephone Hearing Before Magistrate Judge Mark Abel) (Patrick, Kathy)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER approving #371 Agreed Order granting the Credit Suisse Defendants partial summary judgment on designated UAT claims. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 1/29/10. (mra1)
January 28, 2010 Filing 371 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Agreed Order Granting the Credit Suisse Defendants Partial Summary Judgment on Designated UAT Claims (Patrick, Kathy)
December 7, 2009 Filing 370 Sealed Document. Reply Memorandum of Credit Suisse in further support of its motion to strike evidence submitted by the unencumbered assets trust in opposition to Credit Suisse's motion for summary judgment. (rew)
December 7, 2009 Filing 369 NOTICE by Defendants Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch re #356 MOTION to Strike Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion to Strike Evidence Submitted by the Unencumbered Assets Trust in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment /Notice of Filing of Reply Memorandum of Law of Credit Suisse Defendants in Further Support/ (Smith, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2009 Filing 368 REPLY to Response to Motion re #361 MOTION to Strike UAT's Motion to Strike New Evidence Included for the First Time in Credit Suisse's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion to File Surreply [The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike New Evidence Included for the First Time in Credit Suisse's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion to File Surreply] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 16, 2009 Filing 367 RESPONSE in Opposition re #361 MOTION to Strike UAT's Motion to Strike New Evidence Included for the First Time in Credit Suisse's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion to File Surreply / Credit Suisse's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Surreply filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Smith, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2009 Filing 366 MOTION Suggestion of Supplemental Authority of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse, New York Branch and Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. Relating to Pending Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2009 Filing 365 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Documents Produced by JP Morgan Chase and Bank One by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-11, #3 Exhibit 12-13) (Patrick, Kathy)
November 3, 2009 Filing 364 Sealed Document. The Unencumbered Assets Trust Response in Opposition to Credit Suisse Motion to Strike Evidence submitted By the Unencumbered Assets Trust in Opposition to Credit Suisse Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 1 of 6, #2 2 of 6, #3 3 of 6, #4 4 of 6, #5 5 of 6, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E) (rew)
November 3, 2009 Filing 363 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Notice of Filing Under Seal (Patrick, Kathy)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER instructing counsel to confer with court mediator following the November 16, 2009 hearing. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 10/29/09. (mra1)
October 22, 2009 Filing 361 MOTION to Strike UAT's Motion to Strike New Evidence Included for the First Time in Credit Suisse's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion to File Surreply by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER regarding Nov. 16. 2009 Hearing on motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 10/20/09. (mra1)
September 29, 2009 Filing 359 NOTICE by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC Letter to Honorable James Graham (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2009 Filing 358 Joint Motion and Order Regarding Schedule of Credit Suisse's Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust re #356 MOTION to Strike Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion to Strike Evidence Submitted by the Unencumbered Assets Trust in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment ) (Patrick, Kathy) Modified on 9/25/2009 to refile as motion and clarify text. (pes1).
September 21, 2009 Filing 357 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey Q Smith (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2009 Filing 356 MOTION to Strike Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion to Strike Evidence Submitted by the Unencumbered Assets Trust in Opposition to Credit Suisse's Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2009 Filing 355 NOTICE by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC Notice of Filing of the Affidavit of Jeffrey Q. Smith and Accompanying Exhibits in Further Support of the Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Third Amended Complaint (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2009 Filing 354 NOTICE by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC Notice of Filing of Reply Statement of Facts in Further Support of the Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Third Amended Complaint (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2009 Filing 353 NOTICE by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC Notice of Filing of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Third Amended Complaint (Smith, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2009 Filing 352 NOTICE by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC Notice of Change of Firm Name (Smith, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2009 Filing 351 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Plaintiff the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Notice of Filing Under Seal] (Humphries, Scott)
June 26, 2009 Filing 350 ANSWER to #159 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
June 26, 2009 Filing 349 ANSWER to #159 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
June 3, 2009 Filing 348 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition from Poulsen and for Extension of Time by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Smith, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting the Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' #346 Motion to Take Deposition from Lance Poulsen in case 2:03-md-1565-JLG-MRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/1/2009. (er1 )
May 29, 2009 Filing 346 MOTION to Take Deposition from Lance Poulsen The Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take the Deposition of Lance Poulsen by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 26, 2009 Filing 345 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice of Filing Under Seal by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. Responses due by 7/27/2009 (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER denying the Founders' motions to dismiss in the Unencumbered Assets Trust case. Denying (577) Motion to Dismiss; denying (580) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA. Denying (44) Motion to Dismiss; denying (45) Motion to Dismiss; denying (46) Motion to Dismiss; denying (183) Motion to Dismiss; denying (184) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:04-cv-01090-JLG-MRA. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 5/11/2009. (mra1)
April 30, 2009 Filing 343 ANSWER to #159 Amended Complaint by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc. & Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Answer part 2, #2 Answer part 3, #3 Answer part 4, #4 Answer part 5, #5 Answer part 6, #6 Answer part 7, #7 Answer part 8, #8 Answer part 9, #9 Answer part 10, #10 Answer part 11) (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2009 Filing 342 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust [Notice of Withdrawal of Affidavit of Service] (Patrick, Kathy)
April 17, 2009 Filing 341 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #318 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel And To Obtain Ancillary Relief filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, CSFB USA. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2009 Motions terminated: #337 MOTION for Leave to File [The UAT and Arizona Noteholders Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Submit Surreply on Credit Suisse's Motion to Disqualify Counsel] filed by Unencumbered Assets Trust. (rew )
April 2, 2009 Filing 340 RESPONSE in Opposition re #337 MOTION for Leave to File [The UAT and Arizona Noteholders Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Submit Surreply on Credit Suisse's Motion to Disqualify Counsel] filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2009 Filing 339 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint served on Credit Suisse First Boston, New York Branch on April 1, 2009, filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 1, 2009 Filing 338 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint served on Credit Suisse Group fka Credit Suisse First Boston on April 1, 2009, filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 1, 2009 Filing 337 MOTION for Leave to File [The UAT and Arizona Noteholders Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Submit Surreply on Credit Suisse's Motion to Disqualify Counsel] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Cotner, Jeffry)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER approving 1544 Stipulation filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 3/31/2009. (mra1)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting #333 Motion to remove items from the Court's dockets. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove docket entry 1465 from case no. 2:03-md-1565 and docket entry 320 in case no. 2:04-cv-1090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/27/09. (kch1)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 334 STIPULATION and Order Concerning the UAT Litigation by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, CSFB USA. (Smith, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2009 Filing 333 Unopposed MOTION to Remove Items from the Court's Dockets by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brody, Steven)
March 23, 2009 Filing 331 REPLY to Response to Motion re #318 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel And To Obtain Ancillary Relief filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Smith, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2009 Filing 332 SEALED MOTION : Amended Motion for Sanctions against plaintiff lloyds TSB filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. Manually filed in clerks office (rew )
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (578) Credit Suisse's Motion to Dismiss filed in UAT case, 2:04-cv-1090. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 3/18/2009. (mra1)
February 27, 2009 Filing 329 RESPONSE in Opposition re #318 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [The UAT and Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' Response to the Motion by Credit Suisse to Disqualify Gibbs & Bruns, LLP as Counsel for Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Request for Related Ancillary Relief] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-6, #3 Exhibit 7-9, #4 Exhibit 10 Part 1 of 6, #5 Exhibit 10 Part 2 of 6, #6 Exhibit 10 Part 2a of 6, #7 Exhibit 10 Part 3 of 6, #8 Exhibit 10 Part 4 of 6, #9 Exhibit 10 Part 5 of 6, #10 Exhibit 10 Part 6 of 6, #11 Exhibit 11-13, #12 Exhibit 14-15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20-21) (Patrick, Kathy)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #327 MOTION to Withdraw Defendant Credit Suisse's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company and for Ancillary Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/24/09. (rew )
February 20, 2009 Filing 327 MOTION to Withdraw Defendant Credit Suisse's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company and for Ancillary Relief (Doc. 1465), and for Leave to File Amended Motion by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Brody, Steven)
February 17, 2009 Filing 326 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule For: Credit Suisse's Motion to Disqualify and Credit Suisse's Reply to the Arizona Noteholders and the UAT's Response to Credit Suisse's Sanctions Motion Against Lloyds and MetLife by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 12, 2009 Filing 325 RESPONSE in Opposition re 320 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Metropolitan Insurance and Annuity Company and for Ancillary Relief [The Arizona Noteholders' and the UAT's Response to Credit Suisse's Motion for Sanctions Against Metlife and Lloyds] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting in part #322 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Benjamin Scot Zacks is terminated. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 2/11/09. (rew )
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER extending deadline for motions for summary judgment on claims against defendant Lance Poulsen. Signed by James L Graham on 2/11/2009. (mra1)
February 10, 2009 Filing 322 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Rebecca S Parrett. (Zacks, Benjamin)
February 10, 2009 Filing 321 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Request to Stay the Action by Defendant Rebecca S Parrett. (Zacks, Benjamin)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER extending deadline in UAT action for UAT and Credit Suisse to file motions for summary judgment. Signed by James L Graham on 1/30/2009. (mra1)
January 27, 2009 Filing 318 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H-K, #4 Exhibit L-N) (Brody, Steven)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 317 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by James L Graham on 9/30/2008. (bw)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER : Lloyds and Metlife responsive experts rule 26(a)(2)disclosures due 11/28/08 and Kleidon's Rule26(a)(2) disclosures due 10/17/08. Signed by James L Graham on 8/22/08. (rew )
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER approving the stipulation # 1407. The Court determines that the stipulation is binding on all parties who signed it. Signed by James L Graham on 8/21/08. (rew )
July 18, 2008 Filing 314 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc. Designation of Experts (DiCicco, Susan)
July 18, 2008 Filing 313 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Arizona Noteholder Plaintiffs' and the UAT's Identification of Experts in Compliance with the Court's July 1, 2008 Order (Patrick, Kathy)
July 1, 2008 Filing 312 REPLY to Response to Motion re #308 MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2) (Dickerson, Brian)
July 1, 2008 Filing 311 REPLY to Response to Motion re #308 MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
July 1, 2008 Filing 310 AMENDED NOTICE. Docket Entry 1363 Case No.: 2:03-md-1565 is hereby modified. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 07/01/2008. (sr)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting 1266 (2:03-md-1565) Motion to Compel the half day depositions of William Gross and Williams Powers. William Gross is ORDERED to submit to deposition for a period not to exceed 2 hours. Credit Suisse's counsel is DIRECTED to provide PIMCO's counsel with an itemization of its reasonable expense incurred in pursuing the motion to compel. If PIMCO contests this Order awarding expenses or the reasonableness of the itemization, its counsel should promptly notify opposing counsel and request a hearing date from Magistrate. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 06/02/2008. (sr)
May 30, 2008 Filing 308 MOTION to Quash Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and Request of Temporary Stay of Discovery by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dickerson, Brian)
May 27, 2008 Filing 307 REPLY to Response to Motion re #301 MOTION for Reconsideration and Correct May 7, 2008 Order Quashing Credit Suisse's Rule 30(b)(6) Subpoena To GMAC [The Noteholder Plaintiffs' Surreply in Opposition to the Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Correct may 7, 2008 Order] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 22, 2008 Filing 306 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum For Randolph H. Speer issued. (jcw)
May 22, 2008 Filing 305 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum For Roger S. Faulkenberry issued. (jcw).
May 22, 2008 Filing 304 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum For Donald H. Ayers issued. (jcw).
May 20, 2008 Filing 303 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. of Deposition of Rebecca S. Parrett (Long, Thomas)
May 15, 2008 Filing 302 RESPONSE in Opposition re #301 MOTION for Reconsideration and Correct May 7, 2008 Order Quashing Credit Suisse's Rule 30(b)(6) Subpoena To GMAC filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 13, 2008 Filing 301 MOTION for Reconsideration and Correct May 7, 2008 Order Quashing Credit Suisse's Rule 30(b)(6) Subpoena To GMAC by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. (Long, Thomas)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting (1294) Motion to Take Deposition from Brian J. Stucke in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 05/08/2008. (sr)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting (1287) Motion to Take Deposition from John A. Snoble in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 05/08/2008. (sr)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting (1282) Motion for Discovery in case 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA; granting (295) Motion for Discovery in case 2:04-cv-01090-JLG-MRA. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 05/08/2008. (sr)
April 22, 2008 Filing 297 STATUS REPORT [Correspondence to Hon. Mark Abel Re: Discovery Dispute Arising from Defendant Credit Suisse's Subpoena to Third Party GMAC] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER: Counsel to call Magistrate Judge Abel by 4/28/08 to schedule a telephone hearing on Credit Suisse's motion to extend the scheduling deadlines 90 days. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 4/22/08. (kch)
April 21, 2008 Filing 295 MOTION for Discovery For Leave to Take the Depositions of Donald H. Ayers, Roger S. Faulkenberry and Randolph H. Speer by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. (Long, Thomas)
April 15, 2008 Filing 294 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Amended Notice of Hearing (Patrick, Kathy)
April 11, 2008 Filing 293 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Notice of Hearing (Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2008 Filing 292 STATUS REPORT [Correspondence to Hon. Mark Abel] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
March 5, 2008 Filing 291 STATUS REPORT and Request for Telephone Hearing by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
February 25, 2008 Filing 290 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Cotner, Jeffry)
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #288 Motion for Settlement. Signed by James L Graham on 2/19/2008. (bw)
February 15, 2008 Filing 288 Joint MOTION for Settlement [Joint Motion for Bar Order and Certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(B)] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cotner, Jeffry)
February 14, 2008 Filing 287 STATUS REPORT Correspondence to the Honorable Mark Abel by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER - Defendants are ORDERED to file a response to plaintiffs' 1/18 letter no later than 1/24/08. If a defendant is unable to comply with the Court's scheduling orders. it should provide an affidavit(s) setting out the facts that preclude compliance. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 1/23/08. (jcw)
January 4, 2008 Filing 285 STATUS REPORT Letter to Court Regarding PIMCO Documents by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D) (Patrick, Kathy)
January 2, 2008 Filing 284 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Notice of Request for Additional Time to Examine Witnesses by Other Examiners The Arizona Noteholders and the UAT (Patrick, Kathy)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 283 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ORDER: If dispute is not resolved, simultaneous submissions to be made to the Court 1/9/08. Counsel will initiate a telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Abel on 1/11/08 at 2:30 p.m. It is ORDERED that all parties should make every effort to make supplemental productions relevent to a scheduled witness deposition no later than 5 business days before the deposition. It is ORDERED that by 12/17/07, plaitniffs' counsel provide defendant's counsel with a full report on the status of their clients' email searches and productions. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/5/07. (kch)
November 26, 2007 Filing 282 Reply re #279 Response (non motion) to the 11/26/07 letter of counsel for the Unencumbered Assets Trust by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Yohai, David)
November 26, 2007 Filing 279 Response re #278 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER: Ruling on the request of defendants Bank One N.A., Bank One Capital Markets, Credit Suisse, Moody's, Fitch, and Kaye Scholer for two-day depositions of Amy Vespasiano (Lloyds' Rule 30(b)(6) witness); Charles Scully (MetLife's Rule 30(b)(6) witness); and Mei-Feng Tau (a MetLife employee). Also ruling on the request of Kaye Scholer, JPMorgan, Bank One and Credit Suise for a 5/3 split of the deposition time for Fitch witnesses. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/23/2007. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (kch)
November 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER: The Noteholder Plaintiffs' November 9, 2007 motion for a protective order (doc. 1150) was GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/23/2007. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (kch)
November 21, 2007 Filing 278 NOTICE by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP / Letter dated 11/21/07 to the Honorable Mark R. Abel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Yohai, David)
November 20, 2007 Filing 277 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Notice of Request for Additional Time to Examine Witnesses by Other Examiners The Arizona Noteholders and The UAT (Patrick, Kathy)
November 16, 2007 Filing 276 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust re #274 MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration Notice of Hearing (Patrick, Kathy)
November 15, 2007 Filing 275 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust re #274 MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration Notice Re: Scheduling of Teleconference Hearing (Patrick, Kathy)
November 9, 2007 Filing 274 MOTION for Protective Order Noteholder Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Topics and Request for Expedited Consideration by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D (Part 1 of 2)#5 Exhibit D (Part 2 of 2)) (Patrick, Kathy)
November 2, 2007 Filing 273 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust NOTICE OF DEPOSITION CALENDAR FIRST NINETY DAYS OF DISCOVERY (Patrick, Kathy)
November 2, 2007 Filing 272 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust OMNIBUS CROSS-NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONS TO BE TAKEN IN NCFE MDL FOR USE IN NCFE BANKRUPTCY ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS AND CLAIM OBJECTIONS (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 1, 2007 PHV Filing fee: For Salvatore A. Romanello, Esq. $ 200, receipt number COL000107 (sr)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting on condition #270 Motion for Leave for Salvatore A. Romanello to Appear PHV on behalf of Kaye Scholer, LLP. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/26/2007. Counsel is DIRECTED to tender the $200 application fee to the Clerk of Court with 30 days of this Order. (sr)
October 25, 2007 Filing 270 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Salvatore A. Romanello. Filing fee $ 200. by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Makley, Roger)
October 22, 2007 Filing 269 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Humphries, Scott)
October 18, 2007 Filing 268 RESPONSE in Opposition re #267 MOTION for Reconsideration The Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of the Court's 10/12/07 Order [RESPONSE OF ARIZONA NOTEHOLDERS, MET LIFE, LLOYDS AND UNENCUMBERED ASSETS TRUST IN OPPOSITION TO CSFB'S THIRD MOTION (DE 1130) CONTESTING SCHEDULING ORDER] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
October 16, 2007 Filing 267 MOTION for Reconsideration The Credit Suisse Defendants' Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of the Court's 10/12/07 Order by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brody, Steven)
October 13, 2007 Filing 266 NOTICE by Interested Party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Reply to ING's Response to Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wilkinson, William)
October 12, 2007 Filing 265 RESPONSE in Opposition re #258 MOTION to Stay Magistrate's September 26, 2007 Case Management Conference Order Pending Ruling Upon Objections of the Credit Suisse Defendants PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON'S OBJECTIONS TO AND APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE ABEL'S SEPTEMBER 26, 2007 SCHEDULING ORDER (D.E. NOS. 259 AND 258] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
October 10, 2007 Filing 264 Objection re #253 Order Partial Joinder to CSFB's Objection to September 26, 2007, Case Management Order by Interested Party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Wilkinson, William)
October 9, 2007 Filing 263 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE MEMBERS (Patrick, Kathy)
October 8, 2007 Filing 262 NOTICE by Interested Party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #257 Order, Letter Requesting Reconsideration of October 2, 2007, Order Regarding ING (Wilkinson, William)
October 8, 2007 Filing 261 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust AMENDED EMAIL SERVICE LISTS (Patrick, Kathy)
October 3, 2007 Filing 260 REPLY to Response to Motion Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Credit Suisse Defendants' Expedited Motion to (1) Extend the Period for Fact Discovery, (2) Establish a Period for Expert Discovery Thereafter, (3) Provide a Deadline for Filing Summary Judgment Motions, and (4) Convene a Conference with the Court at Its Earliest Convenience filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. (Brody, Steven)
October 3, 2007 Filing 259 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C) (Brody, Steven)
October 3, 2007 Filing 258 MOTION to Stay Magistrate's September 26, 2007 Case Management Conference Order Pending Ruling Upon Objections of the Credit Suisse Defendants by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. (Brody, Steven)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER: Given the May 31, 2008 discovery deadline and the volume of depositions anticipated by the parties, it is important that two weeks of depositions be held in November. If ING Bank cannot produce all the archived emails by October 31, it must consult with requesting counsel and prioritize production so that it will not interfere with the parties ability to go forward with the November depositions. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/01/07. (srj)
October 1, 2007 Filing 256 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust EMAIL SERVICE LISTS (Patrick, Kathy)
September 28, 2007 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO DOCKET ENTRY 1094, DEFENDANT CSFB'S MOTION TO SET A PRETRIAL SCHEDULE CONCLUDING IN THE YEAR 2010 filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
September 28, 2007 Filing 254 NOTICE by Interested Party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Letter in Response to ING's Letter Regarding Discovery Filed in 2:03-md-1565 (D.E. 1096) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E) (Wilkinson, William)
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 253 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: re: Production of Documents and Deposition schedules. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/26/07. (kch)
September 25, 2007 Filing 252 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 8/31/2009. Expedited Motion to 1) Extend the Period for Fact Discovery, 2) Establish a Period for Expert Discovery, 3) Provide a Deadline for Filing Summary Judgment Motions, and 4) Convene a Conference with the Court at its Earliest Convenience by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brody, Steven)
September 25, 2007 Filing 251 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust REQUEST FOR EMAIL SERVICE LISTS (Patrick, Kathy)
September 24, 2007 Filing 250 NOTICE by Interested Party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #248 Notice (Other) (Callagy, John)
September 24, 2007 Filing 249 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. Correspondence with Magistrate Judge Abel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order) (Brody, Steven)
September 13, 2007 Filing 248 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Correspondence to the Honorable Mark Abel Re: Discovery (Patrick, Kathy)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER: It is ORDERED that defendant-on-defendant interrogatories be served on or before 9/14/07; that defendant-on-defendant deposition requests be served on or before 9/7/07; and that defendant-on defendant document requests be served on or before 9 /7/07. Poulsen and Ayres are ORDERED to serve their document requests and interrogatories on plaintiffs on or before 9/5/07. The Poulsens as plaintiffs are ORDERED to serve their nonduplicative document requests and interrogatories on or before 9/14 /07. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/6/07. Associated Cases: 2:03-md-01565-JLG-MRA et al. (srj)
August 31, 2007 Filing 246 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. of Status Conference (Long, Thomas)
August 31, 2007 Filing 245 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. of Letter to Magistrate Judge Abel (Long, Thomas)
August 23, 2007 Filing 244 Mail Returned #242 as Undeliverable (Returned To Sender - Insufficient Address). Mail sent to David R. Singh on 07/25/2007. (sr)
August 8, 2007 Filing fee for 2 phv's (Singh & Meade): $ 400, receipt number 200 257507. (er )
August 6, 2007 Filing 243 Mail Returned #242 as Undeliverable ( Return To Sender - Insufficient Address Unable To Forward). Mail sent to Kevin F. Meade on 07/25/2007. (sr)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #239 Motion for Leave for David R. Singh to Appear PHV; granting #240 Motion for Leave for Kevin F. Meade to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendants. Order granting on condition that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, counsel register for ECF filing. Defendants are DIRECTED to tender the $200.00 fee each for Mr. Singh and Mr. Meade. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 07/25/2007. (sr)
July 25, 2007 Filing 241 NOTICE by Defendant Lance K Poulsen of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material (Haller, John)
July 24, 2007 Filing 240 MOTION for Leave to Appear Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin F. Meade. Filing fee $ 200. by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Makley, Roger)
July 24, 2007 Filing 239 MOTION for Leave to Appear Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Singh. Filing fee $ 200. by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1) (Makley, Roger)
July 24, 2007 Filing 238 NOTICE by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A. of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material (Fornshell, Matthew)
July 18, 2007 Filing 237 NOTICE of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material By Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz (Long, Thomas)
July 17, 2007 Filing 236 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material (Brody, Steven)
July 17, 2007 Filing 235 NOTICE by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY MATERIAL BY KAYE SCHOLER, LLP (Makley, Roger)
July 17, 2007 Filing 234 NOTICE by Defendant Donald H Ayers re 229 Protective Order of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material by Donald H. Ayers (Dickerson, Brian)
July 17, 2007 Filing 233 NOTICE of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material by Terminated Defendant/Non-Party PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Miller, Tiffany)
July 13, 2007 Filing 232 NOTICE of Designation of Confidential Discovery Material by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Partners, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., and Beacon Group, LLC (Wilkinson, William)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER denying Kaye Scholer's Motion to Stay Discovery, Doc. #216. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 07/12/07. (ws)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 230 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/12/07. (kch)
July 12, 2007 Notice of Correction: Former docket #229 (Protective Order) deleted and re-filed by Clerk as current docket #230 (Protective Order) to correct document. (kch)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 229 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 07/11/2007. (sr)
July 11, 2007 Filing 228 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Notice of Disclosure (Humphries, Scott)
July 6, 2007 Filing 227 MOTION re #218 Reply (non motion) With Respect to Application to Continue to Stay All Discovery by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3) (Makley, Roger)
July 3, 2007 Filing 226 Response Credit Suisse Defendants' Limited Opposition to Proposed Case Management Order by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. (Brody, Steven)
June 29, 2007 Filing 225 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust "Notice of Disclosure" (Humphries, Scott)
June 27, 2007 Filing 224 MOTION for Protective Order "The Arizona Noteholders' And The UnEncumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Entry Omnibus Protective Order" by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Humphries, Scott)
June 26, 2007 Filing 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re #222 Joint MOTION for Protective Order By Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell, and Eric Wilkinson, and by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank - Credit Suisse Defendants' Limited Opposition to Motions for Protective Orders filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. (Brody, Steven)
June 26, 2007 Filing 222 Joint MOTION for Protective Order By Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell, and Eric Wilkinson, and by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Wilkinson, William)
June 22, 2007 Filing 221 Response re #220 Response (non motion) The Arizona Noteholders' and The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Response to Credit Suisse's June 22, 2007 Letter to the Court Regarding Discovery by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 22, 2007 Filing 220 Response re #215 Scheduling Order by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc.. (Long, Thomas)
June 21, 2007 Filing 219 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Notice Concerning Production of Rule 2004 Database (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E) (Patrick, Kathy)
June 20, 2007 Filing 218 Reply re #217 Response (non motion) Regarding Request for Continuing Stay of Discovery by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Makley, Roger)
June 19, 2007 Filing 217 Response re #216 Response (non motion) The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Response to Kaye Scholer's Letter (DE 216) by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
June 18, 2007 Filing 216 Response re #215 Scheduling Order by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence from David L. Yohai, Esq. to Hon. James L. Graham) (Makley, Roger)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 12/31/2007.,Motions due by 3/3/2008.. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 6/14/2007. (bw)
April 19, 2007 Filing 214 NOTICE of Settlement [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, with Prejudice, of UAT's Claims Against PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Patrick, Kathy)
March 2, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2007. (mra2, )
March 1, 2007 Filing 213 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Patrick, Kathy)
March 1, 2007 Filing 212 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Leslie Long (Long, Thomas)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #210 Motion for Leave for Susan DiCiccio, Steven Brody, and Jeffrey Smith to Appear pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/2/07. (jr)
February 1, 2007 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 254911 (phv for Dicicco) (jr)
February 1, 2007 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 254912 (phv for Smith) (jr)
February 1, 2007 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 254914 (phv for Brody) (jr)
February 1, 2007 Filing 210 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200. by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DeCicco Certificate#2 Brody Certificate#3 Smith Certificate)(Lazear, Sherri)
December 1, 2006 Filing 209 Response re #207 Notice (Other) "The UAT's Response To The Suggestion Of Supplemental Authority Of The Credit Suisse Defendants by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
November 16, 2006 Filing 208 MOTION for Joinder In The Credit Suisse Defendants' Suggestion of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Makley, Roger)
November 13, 2006 Filing 207 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC re #50 Notice (Other) of Suggestion of Supplemental Authority of the Credit Suisse Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Long, Thomas)
November 10, 2006 Filing 206 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Correspondence to Honorable James Graham and Honorable Mark Abel Requesting a Status Conference in all the Coordinated Cases (Patrick, Kathy)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER finding as moot #38 Motion to Dismiss, #39 Motion to Dismiss, #42 Motion to Dismiss and #43 Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/2/2006. (bw)
August 8, 2006 Filing 204 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Long, Thomas)
August 1, 2006 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re #145 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Reply by Credit Suisse to UAT's Response and Notice of Additional Authority filed by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc.. (Long, Thomas)
July 21, 2006 Filing 202 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust re #201 Notice (Other) [The UAT's Response to the Notice of Additional Authority in Further Support of Purcell & Scott's Motion to Dismiss AND The UAT's Notice of Additional Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2)#2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2))(Patrick, Kathy)
July 14, 2006 Filing 201 NOTICE by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A. of Additional Authority in Further Support of Purcell & Scott's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fornshell, Matthew)
June 7, 2006 Filing 200 NOTICE by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A. re #145 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Notice of Additional Authority in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fornshell, Matthew)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER finding as moot #133 Motion for Leave to File an advisory. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/2/06. (jr)
May 10, 2006 Filing 198 REPLY to Response to Motion re #183 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint of the Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I Katz, LTD. Trustee filed by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)(Dickerson, Brian)
April 27, 2006 Filing 197 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, LTD Notice of Withdrawal of Stephanie M. Rawlings as Counsel on Behalf of Plaintiffs The Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee (Friedberg, Leon)
April 25, 2006 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re #183 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint of the Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I Katz, LTD. Trustee [The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Brief in Response and Opposition to Defendant Ayers' Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 25, 2006 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition re #184 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint [The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Response to Defendants Lance Poulsen, Barbara Poulsen, South Atlantic Investments, LLC, Thor Capital Holdings LLC, Kachina, Inc., Flohaz Partners LLC, Healthcare Capital LLC and Intercontinental Investment Associates Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss its Third Amended Complaint] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
April 11, 2006 Filing 194 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 193 AGREED ORDER and JUDGMENT re: #162 #168 #170 #170 #171 #174 and #180 . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 4/10/2006. (bw)
April 10, 2006 Filing 192 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust re #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 [NOTICE OF AGREEMENT BY ALL PARTIES TO ENTRY OF PROPOSED BAR ORDERS AND OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR APRIL 11, 2006] (Patrick, Kathy)
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER - Defendant Parrett must file any objections to the newly proposed version of the bar order by 10:00 a.m. Monday, April 10, 2006. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/10/06. (jk)
April 7, 2006 Filing 190 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 [REPLY OF THE SETTLING PARTIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF BAR ORDER] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Patrick, Kathy)
April 3, 2006 Filing 189 NOTICE by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A. re #182 Order DISCLOSURE BY THE SETTLING DEFENDANTS OF EVIDENCE TO BE OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF THE JOINT MOTIONS FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC 1292 (Callagy, John)
April 3, 2006 Filing 188 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust re #182 Order [Notice by Settling Plaintiffs of Intent to Offer Evidence at Hearing on Motions for Bar Order] (Patrick, Kathy)
March 31, 2006 Filing 187 RESPONSE in Opposition re #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 filed by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H Ayers. (Tournoux, Katie)
March 31, 2006 Filing 186 RESPONSE in Opposition re #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 filed by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
March 31, 2006 Filing 185 NOTICE by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC re #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 of Filing of Memorandum in Opposition (Long, Thomas)
March 21, 2006 Filing 184 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen. Responses due by 4/14/2006 (Haller, John)
March 21, 2006 Filing 183 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint of the Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I Katz, LTD. Trustee by Defendant Donald H Ayers. Responses due by 4/14/2006 (Dickerson, Brian)
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 182 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF BAR ORDER Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/20/06. (jr)
March 17, 2006 Filing 181 RESPONSE to Motion re #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 filed by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Makley, Roger)
March 15, 2006 Filing 180 MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A.. (Andelman, Matthew)
March 14, 2006 Filing 179 RESPONSE to Motion re #170 MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A., The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP. (Wilkinson, William)
March 14, 2006 Filing 178 REPLY to Response to Motion re #171 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order and Hearing Date Regarding the Settling Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Bar Order, and to Require the Production of the Settlement Agreement filed by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H Ayers. (Haller, John)
March 14, 2006 Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re #170 MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement filed by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
March 13, 2006 Filing 176 NOTICE by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP re #170 MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement -- Partial Resolution of Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: Portion of Motion Seeking Production of Settlement Agreement Resolved (Miller, Tiffany)
March 13, 2006 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re #174 Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct #168 MOTION to Amend/Correct #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SE, #170 MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement, #168 MOTION to Amend/Correct #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 and to Permit Limited Disc filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Cotner, Jeffry)
March 10, 2006 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 200 250529 (phv for Schwartz, O'Brien, Koral, and Kim) (jr)
March 10, 2006 Filing 174 Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct #168 MOTION to Amend/Correct #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 and to Permit Limited Disc overy into the JP Morgan Chase Settlement by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc.. (Long, Thomas)
March 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #169 Motion for Leave for William J. Schwartz, William O'Brien, Jason Mark Koral, and Mina Audrey Kim to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and Credit Suisse (USA) Inc., on the condition that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, counsel register for electronic filing. William J. Schwartz, William O'Brien, Jason Mark Koral, and Mina Audrey are DIRECTED to tender the $50 fee to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/10/06. (jr)
March 10, 2006 Filing 172 RESPONSE to Motion re #168 MOTION to Amend/Correct #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 and to Permit Limited Disc filed by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Makley, Roger)
March 9, 2006 Filing 171 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order and Hearing Date Regarding the Settling Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Bar Order, and to Require the Production of the Settlement Agreement by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H Ayers. (Haller, John)
March 9, 2006 Filing 170 MOTION to Amend/Correct #163 Order, #167 Order Setting Hearing on Motion of the Settling Parties for Entry of Bar Order, MOTION for Discovery and Production of the Settlement Agreement by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Burkhart, Matthew)
March 9, 2006 Filing 169 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc.. (Long, Thomas)
March 8, 2006 Filing 168 MOTION to Amend/Correct #162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 and to Permit Limited Discovery into the JP Morgan Chase Settlement by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Long, Thomas)
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #162 MOTION FOR A BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2006 10:00 AM before Mark R. Abel.. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 3/7/2006. (bw)
March 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #164 Motion for Extension of Time to and including 3/21/06 to move or plead with respect to plaintiffs' amended complaint. Plaintiffs are to file their memoranda in opposition to any motions to dismiss on or before 4/25/06. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/6/06. (jr)
March 3, 2006 Filing 165 NOTICE by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A. of Statement of Defendant Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A., with Respect to the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Third Amended Complaint (Manghillis, Katherine)
March 2, 2006 Filing 164 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/21/2006. to Move or Plead to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H Ayers. (Haller, John)
March 1, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Scheduling Conference held on 3/1/2006. (mra4, )
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SCHEDULING ORDER Regarding Motion for Entry of Bar Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/23/06. (jk)
February 22, 2006 Filing 162 MOTION BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) JOINT MOTION FOR BAR ORDER AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B) OR ALTERNATIVELY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292 by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Callagy, John)
February 22, 2006 Filing 161 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust Requesting Entry of Scheduling Order Pertaining to Settlement (Patrick, Kathy)
February 16, 2006 Filing 160 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust re #159 Amended Complaint,,,,, [The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Notice of Correction to its Third Amended Complaint] (Patrick, Kathy)
February 14, 2006 Filing 159 AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust, Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, CSFB USA, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP, The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP, Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H Ayers, Rebecca S Parrett, Task Holdings, LTD, Purcell & Scott, L.P.A., Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2 of 11#2 Complaint (Part 3 of 11)#3 Complaint (Part 4 of 11)#4 Complaint (Part 5 of 11)#5 Complaint (Part 6 of 11)#6 Complaint (Part 7 of 11)#7 Complaint (Part 8 of 11)#8 Complaint (Part 9 of 11)#9 Complaint (Part 10 of 11)#10 Complaint (Part 11 of 11)#11 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3)#12 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3)#13 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3)#14 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 3)#15 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 3)#16 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 3)#17 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 3)#18 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 3)#19 Exhibit C (Part 3 of 3))(Patrick, Kathy)
February 7, 2006 Filing 158 STIPULATION re #151 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Unencumbered Assets Trust's Complaint by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust, Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Makley, Roger)
January 24, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Abel : Scheduling Conference held on 1/9/2006. (mra4, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 157 CLAIM Statement of Purcell & Scott to Amended Complaints by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A.. (Fornshell, Matthew)
January 23, 2006 Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 200 249870 (phv for Temchine) (jr)
January 23, 2006 Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 200 249868 (phv for Fellig) (jr)
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying #131 Motion to Strike as moot. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/17/06. (jr)
January 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Motion for Leave for Thomas J. Fellig and Jennifer Temchine to Appear pro hac vice on the condition that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, counsel register for electronic filing. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/11/06. (jr)
January 4, 2006 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Fellig and Jennifer Temchine by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
January 3, 2006 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Support re #145 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H)(Fornshell, Matthew)
December 28, 2005 Filing 152 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle with JP Morgan Entities by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Cotner, Jeffry)
December 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #82 Motion to Amend/Correct and adopting Magistrate Judge's Order granting motion for leave to amend #137 .Signed by Judge James L Graham on 12/23/05. (ws)
December 22, 2005 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit part 1 of a#2 Exhibit part 2 of a#3 Exhibit part 3 of a#4 Exhibit b#5 Exhibit c)(Allen, Brandon)
December 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Leave for Robert M. Cary and Katherine G. Manghillis to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for Defendant Purcell & Scott, on the condition that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, counsel register for electronic filing. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/16/05. (jr)
December 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #146 Motion for Leave for John K. Villa, Craig D. Singer, and Matthew B. Andelman to Appear pro hac vice for Defendant Purcell & Scott, on the condition that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, counsel register for electronic filing. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/15/05. (jr)
December 14, 2005 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave for Robert M. Cary and Katherine G. Manghillis to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(jr)
December 14, 2005 Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 200 249373 (PHV for Robert M Cary and Katherine G Manghillis) (jr)
December 8, 2005 Filing 146 MOTION for Leave to admit John K. Villa, Craig D. Singer, and Matthew B. Andelman pro hac vice by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(jr)
December 8, 2005 Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 200 249306 (PHV for John K. Villa, Craig D. Singer, and Matthew B. Andelman) (jr)
December 6, 2005 Filing 145 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Purcell & Scott, L.P.A.. Responses due by 12/30/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G)(Fornshell, Matthew)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Excess of 20 Pages. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/16/05. (jr)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #72 , #73 , #74 , #75 ,and #76 Motions for Leave for Stephen P. Anthony, Mark P. Gimbel, C. William Phillips, Edward R. Rippey, and Gary M. Rubman to Appear pro hac vice, on the condition that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, counsel register for electronic filing. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/16/05. (jr)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Leave for Douglas H. Flaum, Israel David, Shazeb Lari, and Lara Turcik to Appear pro hac vice, on the condition that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, counsel register for electronic filing. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/16/05. (jr)
November 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER - Plaintiff's unopposed 9/12/05 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #137 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/14/05. (jr)
November 2, 2005 Filing 140 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Humphries, Scott)
October 5, 2005 Filing 139 STIPULATION by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust, Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Boucher, Richard)
September 27, 2005 Filing 138 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Patrick, Kathy)
September 12, 2005 Filing 137 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for the Sole Purpose of Adding Claims Against A New Defendant, Purcell & Scott, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint Part 1#2 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 2#3 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 3#4 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 4#5 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 5#6 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 6#7 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 7#8 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 8#9 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 9#10 Exhibit A-Complaint Part 10 of 10#11 Exhibit A to the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 1 of 4)#12 Exhibit A to the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 2 of 4)#13 Exhibit A to the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 3 of 4)#14 Exhibit A to the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 4 of 4)#15 Exhibit B to the 2nd Amd Complaint Part 1#16 Exhibit B to the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 2)#17 Exhibit B to the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 3)#18 Exhibit B to the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 4)#19 Exhibit C of the 2nd Amd Complaint (part 1)#20 Exhibit C of the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 2)#21 Exhibit C of the 2nd Amd Complaint (Part 3))(Humphries, Scott)
September 8, 2005 Filing 136 NOTICE by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust [The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Statement of Clarification Regarding ING Bank's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend] (Patrick, Kathy)
September 1, 2005 Filing 135 Response re #125 Status Report,, #133 MOTION for Leave to File Advisory Concerning Possible SEC Enforcement Action Against Defendant JP Morgan Chase and Two of its Unidentified Employees who Served as Directors of National Century Financial Enterprises, #129 Supplemental - Opposing, Response of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., to the UAT's Unauthorized Submission of Supplemental Authority by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Wilkinson, William)
August 31, 2005 Filing 134 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #129 Supplemental - Opposing, filed by Defendants Bank One, N.A., Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
August 31, 2005 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to File Submission of Supplemental Authority and Advisory Concerning Possible SEC Enforcement Against deft JP Morgan by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy) Modified on 8/31/2005 (bw).
August 26, 2005 Filing 132 Response re #129 Supplemental - Opposing, by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Boucher, Richard)
August 25, 2005 Filing 131 MOTION to Strike #125 Status Report, by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Wilkinson, William)
August 22, 2005 Filing 130 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Deloitte & Touche by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust (Humphries, Scott) Modified on 8/29/2005 (bw).
August 19, 2005 Filing 129 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing [UAT's Submission of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss Based on In Pari Delicto] filed by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Patrick, Kathy)
August 16, 2005 Filing 128 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #46 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THE UNENCUMBERED TRUST AND ERWIN I. KATZ, LTD., TRUSTEE by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1)(Dickerson, Brian)
August 15, 2005 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (unreported cases))(Miller, Tiffany)
August 15, 2005 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #82 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint,,, [The UAT's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint] [The Unencumbered Assets Trust's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Patrick, Kathy)
August 10, 2005 Filing 125 STATUS REPORT [Amended Advisory Concerning Possible SEC Enforcement Action Against Defendant JP Morgan Chase and Two of its Unidentified Employees who Served as Directors of National Century Financial Enterprises] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
August 9, 2005 Filing 124 STATUS REPORT (Advisory Concerning Possible SEC Enforcement Action Against Defendant JP Morgan Chase And Two Of Its Unidentified Employees Who Served As Directors Of National Century Financial Enterprise) by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
July 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #110 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to and including 8/15/05 to file a reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss and in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/18/05. (jk)
July 15, 2005 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss of JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A. filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6)(Wilkinson, William)
July 15, 2005 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint,,, [The UAT's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint] filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Wilkinson, William)
July 15, 2005 Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
July 15, 2005 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
July 15, 2005 Filing 118 RESPONSE to Motion re #82 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint,,, [The UAT's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint] filed by Defendant Rebecca S Parrett. (Zacks, Benjamin)
July 15, 2005 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Support re #44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Rebecca S Parrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Empire Services Unreported case#2 Exhibit Oasis Entertainment unreported case#3 Exhibit Wuliger unreported case)(Zacks, Benjamin)
July 15, 2005 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/15/2005. REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE UNENCUMBERED ASSETS TRUST'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 PART 2#2 PART 3#3 PART 4#4 PART 5#5 Affidavit REPLY AFFIDAVIT OF THOMAS L. LONG#6 Exhibit EX. U#7 Exhibit EX. V#8 Exhibit EX. W#9 Exhibit EX. X#10 Exhibit EX. Y#11 Exhibit EX. Z#12 Exhibit EX. AA#13 Exhibit EX. BB#14 Exhibit EX. CC#15 Exhibit EX. DD#16 Exhibit EX. EE#17 Exhibit EX. FF#18 Exhibit EX. GG#19 Exhibit EX. HH#20 Exhibit EX. II#21 Exhibit EX. JJ#22 Exhibit EX. KK)(Long, Thomas)
July 15, 2005 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint,,, [The UAT's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint] filed by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen. (Haller, John)
July 15, 2005 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint,,, [The UAT's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint] filed by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
July 15, 2005 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Defendant The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP. (Davis, Jessica)
July 15, 2005 Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THE UNENCUMBERED TRUST AND ERWIN I. KATZ, LTD., TRUSTEE filed by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Dickerson, Brian)
July 15, 2005 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Gastwirth, Seth)
July 14, 2005 Filing 110 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/15/2005. to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
July 14, 2005 Filing 109 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Notice to Court of Settlement between Deloitte & Touche and Plaintiffs in Case Nos. 04-1090, CV03-1220, CIV03-1618, and CV-03-2084] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Cotner, Jeffry)
June 30, 2005 Filing 108 Response [Plaintiffs' Statement of Opposition to Relief Requested in the "Statement of Appellants' Pursuant to April 26 Order" filed in the NCFE Plan Confirmation Appeal (Case No. 2:04-cv-489) by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Cotner, Jeffry)
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Extension of Time to File . Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/29/05. (sh, )
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #103 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/15/2005 . Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/29/05. (sh, )
June 28, 2005 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 7/15/2005. by Defendant Rebecca S Parrett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zacks, Benjamin)
June 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 104 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ORDER: either party may w/in 10 days from the date of this order serve on the opping party a motion for reconsideration by the District Judge . Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/27/05. (sh, )
June 27, 2005 Filing 103 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/15/2005. by Defendant The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP. (Davis, Jessica)
June 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to and including 7/15/05 to file a reply brief in support of their motions to dismiss and a memoranda opposing Plaintiffs' motion for leave. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/24/05. (jk)
June 23, 2005 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #84 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #85 Response in Opposition to Motion,, New date requested 7/15/2005. by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haller, John)
June 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #97 Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to and including 7/15/05 to File Reply Briefs in support of their motions to dismiss & #99 MOTION for Extension of Time to file memoranda opposing Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/22/05. (jk)
June 21, 2005 Filing 99 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/15/2005. by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Errata A (Proposed Order))(Gastwirth, Seth)
June 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #96 parties' agreed motion for extension of time to and including 7/15/2005 for all Defendants to file reply briefs in support of their motions to dismiss and memoranda opposing Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/21/05. (jk)
June 21, 2005 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/15/2005. by Defendant Donald H Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickerson, Brian)
June 20, 2005 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/15/2005. by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Alexander, David)
June 20, 2005 Filing 95 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DOCUMENT by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP Docket 93 - corrected Motion/Proposed Order will be refiled (Alexander, David)
June 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs in support of their respective motions to dismiss and memoranda opposing Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint ext. to 7/15/05. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/20/05. (jk)
June 20, 2005 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/15/2005. by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Alexander, David)
June 17, 2005 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV of Douglas H. Flaum, Israel David, Shazeb Lari and Lara Turcik on behalf of Defendant The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP. (jk)
June 17, 2005 Filing fee for PHV of Flaum, David, Lari & Turcik: $ 200.00, receipt number 247084 (jk)
June 9, 2005 Filing 91 Correspondence/Letter to the Honorable James L. Graham by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy) Modified on 6/10/2005 (bw).
June 9, 2005 Filing 90 Exhibit List [Appendix of Unpublished Opinions Cited in the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Responses and Oppositions (DE 80, 81, 83-86, 88, 89) to Defendants' Motions to Dimiss] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2 of 23#2 Appendix Part 3 of 23#3 Appendix Part 4 of 23#4 Appendix Part 5 of 23#5 Appendix Part 6 of 23#6 Appendix Part 7 of 23#7 Appendix Part 8 of 23#8 Appendix Part 9 of 23#9 Appendix Part 10 of 23#10 Appendix Part 11 of 23#11 Appendix Part 12 of 23#12 Appendix Part 13 of 23#13 Appendix Part 14 of 23#14 Appendix Part 15 of 23#15 Appendix Part 16 of 23#16 Appendix Part 17 of 23#17 Appendix Part 18 of 23#18 Appendix Part 19 of 23#19 Appendix Part 20 of 23#20 Appendix Part 21 of 23#21 Appendix Part 22 of 23#22 Appendix Part 23 of 23)(Patrick, Kathy)
May 31, 2005 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Dismiss [UAT's Response to Kaye Scholer's Motion to Dismiss] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 31, 2005 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss of JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., #43 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED FILING - PLAINTIFFS RESP. TO THE MTS. TO DISMISS OF JPMCB AND BANK ONE] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 31, 2005 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss of JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., #43 MOTION to Dismiss [Plaintiff's Response to the Mts. to Dismiss of JPMCB and Bank One] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 31, 2005 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Dismiss UAT's Response to CSFB's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 31, 2005 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss, #45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #46 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THE UNENCUMBERED TRUST AND ERWIN I. KATZ, LTD., TRUSTEE, #37 MOTION to Dismiss, #38 MOTION to Dismiss, #39 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #41 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, #42 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss of JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., #43 MOTION to Dismiss [UAT's Consolidated Master Brief in Response and Opposition to ALL Motions to Dismiss its Claims] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Cotner, Jeffry)
May 31, 2005 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss, #39 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #46 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THE UNENCUMBERED TRUST AND ERWIN I. KATZ, LTD., TRUSTEE [UAT's Bankruptcy Brief in Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 31, 2005 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss, #41 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint [UAT's Response and Opposition to Deloitte & Touche's and Pricewaterhouse Coopers' Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint] filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Cotner, Jeffry)
May 31, 2005 Filing 82 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint,,, [The UAT's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint] by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Humphries, Scott)
May 31, 2005 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss, #45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #46 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THE UNENCUMBERED TRUST AND ERWIN I. KATZ, LTD., TRUSTEE [The UAT's Opposition to the Founders' and their Affiliated Companies' Motions to Dismiss] filed by Defendant Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee. (Patrick, Kathy)
May 31, 2005 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss [the UAT's Response to Rebecca Parrett's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction] filed by Defendant Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I#2 Exhibit J#3 Exhibit K-N#4 Exhibit O-T)(Humphries, Scott)
May 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Philip Beck, Andrew Goldman, Mark Levine & Allison Freedman's Motion to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendant Deloitte & Touche on the condition that they register for electronic filing within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 05/12/05. (dms)
May 11, 2005 Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 200 246552 for PHV apps of Beck, Goldman, Levine and Freedman. (dms)
May 10, 2005 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV Philip S. Beck, Andrew L. Goldman, Mark L. Levine and Allison W. Freedman by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Beck#2 Declaration Goldman#3 Declaration Levine#4 Declaration Freedman#5 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Philip)
May 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #47 , #48 & #49 William Maguire, Sarah Cave and Derek Adler's Motions to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendant Price Waterhouse on the condition that they register for electronic filing within 15 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 05/09/05. (dms )
May 9, 2005 Filing fee: $ 250.00, receipt number 200 246501 for PHV apps of Gimbel, Phillips, Rippey, Rubman, and Anthony. (dms)
May 6, 2005 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gary M. Rubman by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Alexander, David)
May 6, 2005 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward R. Rippey by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Alexander, David)
May 6, 2005 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of C. William Phillips by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Alexander, David)
May 6, 2005 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark P. Gimbel by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Alexander, David)
May 6, 2005 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen P. Anthony by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Alexander, David)
May 5, 2005 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
April 20, 2005 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Gastwirth, Seth)
April 18, 2005 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Long, Thomas)
April 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #51 , #52 & #53 . Nicholas J. Panarella, William A. Escobar, and Joel A. Hankin to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank on the condition that they register for electronic filing within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 04/18/05. (dms )
April 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #54 & [65 Corrected Motion] John Callagy's Motion to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank on the condition that he registers for electronic filing within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 04/15/05. (dms )
April 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #57 David Liston's Motion to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers on the condition that he registers for electronic filing within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 04/15/05. (dms )
April 13, 2005 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Callagy (corrected, see docket entry 54) by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilkinson, William)
April 12, 2005 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, LLP. (Brown, Philip)
April 11, 2005 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 200 246158 for PHV app of David Liston. (dms)
April 11, 2005 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C.. (Haller, John)
April 11, 2005 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C.. (Haller, John)
April 11, 2005 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Kachina, Inc.. (Haller, John)
April 11, 2005 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Intercontinental Investment Associates. (Haller, John)
April 11, 2005 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Healthcare Capital, L.L.C.. (Haller, John)
April 11, 2005 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Flohaz Partners, L.L.C.. (Haller, John)
April 11, 2005 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David G. Liston) by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Miller, Tiffany) Certificate of Good Standing added on 4/12/2005 (dms)
April 11, 2005 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
April 8, 2005 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Kopf, John)
April 7, 2005 Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 200 246123 for PHV apps of Panarella, Escobar, Hankin, & Callagy. (dms)
April 7, 2005 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Callagy by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilkinson, William)
April 7, 2005 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joel A. Hankin by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilkinson, William)
April 7, 2005 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William A. Escobar by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilkinson, William)
April 7, 2005 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas J. Panarella by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilkinson, William)
April 5, 2005 Filing fee: $ 150.00, receipt number 200 246054 for PHV apps of Magurie, Cave & Adler. (dms)
April 5, 2005 Filing 50 NOTICE by Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC of Filing of Motion to Dismiss (Long, Thomas)
April 5, 2005 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Derek J.T. Adler) by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
April 5, 2005 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sarah Loomis Cave) by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
April 5, 2005 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (William Ruttledge Maguire) by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Miller, Tiffany)
April 1, 2005 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THE UNENCUMBERED TRUST AND ERWIN I. KATZ, LTD., TRUSTEE by Defendant Donald H Ayers. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Dickerson, Brian)
April 1, 2005 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendants Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Haller, John)
March 31, 2005 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Rebecca S Parrett. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum in Support)(Zacks, Benjamin)
March 31, 2005 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Garland, James)
March 31, 2005 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss of JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A. by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Stucke Statement of Facts#2 Exhibit B - Gibson Statement of Facts#3 Exhibit C - SEC Stucke Complaint#4 Exhibit D - SEC Snoble Complaint#5 Exhibit E - SEC Gibson Complaint#6 Exhibit F - ABA Article#7 Exhibit G - Leverich Deposition Transcript#8 Exhibit H - Sixth Supplemental Indenture, part 1 of 3#9 Exhibit H - Sixth Supplemental Indenture, part 2 of 3#10 Exhibit H - Sixth Supplemental Indenture, part 3 of 3#11 Exhibit I - Monthly Investor Report#12 Exhibit J - Collateral Coverage Report#13 Exhibit K - Lockbox Receipt Report#14 Exhibit L - Kantor Transcript Excerpt#15 Exhibit M - Captiva v. Viz)(Callagy, John)
March 31, 2005 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Defendant Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Miller, Tiffany)
March 31, 2005 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O)(Gastwirth, Seth)
March 31, 2005 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Lara Turcik)(Jacobs, Rebecca)
March 31, 2005 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Deloitte & Touche, LLP. Responses due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendant Deloitte & Touche LLP's Memorandum of Law in Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss The Amended Complaint#2 Exhibit A Summary of NCFE Actions Filed Against Deloitte#3 Exhibit B Statement of Facts#4 Exhibit C Statement of Facts in Civil Case No. CR2 03 207#5 Exhibit D Statement of Facts in Civil Case No. CR2 04 193#6 Exhibit E Deloitte & Touche, National Century Financial Enterprises, Inc. And Subsidiaries, Financial Statements for the Years Ended December 31, 1999 and 1998 and Independent Auditors' Report)(Brown, Philip)
March 31, 2005 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. Responses due by 5/31/2005 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Kaye Scholer's Motion To Dismiss (Part A)#2 Memorandum In Support Of Kaye Scholer's Motion To Dismiss (Part B)#3 Memorandum In Support of Kaye Scholer's Motion To Dismiss (Part C))(Gastwirth, Seth) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2005 (dms, ).
March 31, 2005 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Kaye Scholer's Motion For Leave To File Memorandum Of Law In Excess Of Twenty Pages)(Gastwirth, Seth)
March 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV of R. Colby Allsbrook on behalf of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC; Credit Suisse First Boston, New York Branch; Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/25/05. (jk)
March 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #27 , #28 , #29 , #30 , #31 & #32 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV of Brandon T. Allen, Sydney G. Ballesteros, Jeffry J. Cotner, Scott A. Humphries, Robert J. Madden and Kathy D. Patrick on behalf of Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, LTD. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/25/05. (jk)
March 17, 2005 Filing 33 MOTION filed by Robert Colby Allsbrook for Leave to Appear PHV on behalf of Defendants Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston. (dms)
March 17, 2005 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 200 245802 (dms )
March 4, 2005 Filing fee: $ 300.00, receipt number 200 245624 for PHV apps of Brandon Allen, Sydney Ballesteros, Jerry Cotner, Scott Humphries, Robert Madden, & Kathy Patrick. (dms)
March 2, 2005 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kathy D. Patrick by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas)(Friedberg, Leon)
March 2, 2005 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert J. Madden by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas)(Friedberg, Leon)
March 2, 2005 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott A. Humphries by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas)(Friedberg, Leon)
March 2, 2005 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jerry J. Cotner by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas)(Friedberg, Leon)
March 2, 2005 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sydney G. Ballesteros by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Highest Court of State of Texas)(Friedberg, Leon)
March 2, 2005 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brandon T. Allen by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Highest Court of State of Texas)(Friedberg, Leon)
February 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Quinn's, Yohai's, Tsekerides', Pollack's and Gastwirth's Motion to appear PHV on behalf of Defendant Kaye Scholer LLP on the condition that they register for electronic filing within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 02/23/05. (dms)
February 14, 2005 Filing fee: $ 250.00, receipt number 200 245359 PHV Apps for Quinn, Yohai, Tsekerides, Pollack & Gastwirth. (dms)
February 11, 2005 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fees To Follow Via Federal Express) by Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - James W. Quinn Certificate of Good Standing and Declaration In Support#2 Exhibit B - David L. Yohai Certificate of Good Standing and Declaration In Support#3 Exhibit C - Theodore E. Tsekerides Certificate of Good Standing and Declaration In Support#4 Exhibit D - Jane G. Pollack Certificate of Good Standing and Declaration In Support#5 Exhibit E - Seth A. Gastwirth Certificate of Good Standing and Declaration In Support)(Makley, Roger)
February 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time within which Moving Defendant must Respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint AND for an extended schedule to accommodate the parties' full briefing of any responsive motions filed by Moving Defendant. Signed by Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/9/05. (jk)
February 8, 2005 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/31/2005. To Respond And For Extended Briefing Schedule (Agreed) by Plaintiffs Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, LTD, Defendant Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Makley, Roger)
February 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 the Motion for Protective Order . Signed by Judge James L Graham on 2/4/2005. (bw)
January 24, 2005 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information "Unencumbered Assets Trust's Omnibus Reply Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information and Motion for Entry of Protective Order" filed by Defendant Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 14, 2005 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust et al. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Part 2 of 13 #2 Amended Complaint Part 3 of 13#3 Amended Complaint Part 4 of 13 #4 Amended Complaint Part 5 of 13 #5 Amended Complaint Part 6 of 13 #6 Amended Complaint Part 7 of 13 #7 Amended Complaint Part 8 of 13 #8 Amended Complaint Part 9 of 13 #9 Amended Complaint Part 10 of 13 #10 Amended Complaint Part 10 of 13#11 Amended Complaint Part 12 of 13#12 Amended Complaint Part 13 of 13#13 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 1 of 4#14 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 2 of 4#15 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 3 of 4#16 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 4 of 4#17 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1 of 4#18 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2 of 4#19 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 3 of 4#20 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 4 of 4#21 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1 of 3#22 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2 of 3#23 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 3 of 3)(Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc. waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Intercontinental Investment Associates waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Healthcare Capital, L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Flohaz Partners, L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Rebecca S Parrett waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Kachina, Inc. waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Lance K Poulsen waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Barbara L. Poulsen waiver sent on 11/17/2004, answer due 1/18/2005. (Cotner, Jeffry)
January 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/31/2005 for moving defts to answer the complaint, and until 5/31/2005 for pltf to file responses to motion and to 6/30/2005 for moving defts to file reply briefs. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 1/10/2005. (bw)
January 4, 2005 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/31/2005. by Defendant Bank One, N.A.. (Garland, James)
January 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to pltf that a RICO statement is not required to be filed. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 1/3/2005. (bw)
December 23, 2004 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Unencumbered Assets Trust. Amendment to #3 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information [AMENDED EXHIBIT O]. (Cotner, Jeffry)
December 23, 2004 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order AND Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Court Approval of Voluntary Production of Information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B#2 Exhibit C#3 Exhibit D#4 Exhibit E-I#5 Exhibit J-M#6 Exhibit N-R)(Cotner, Jeffry)
November 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge James L Graham for all further proceedings. Judge Edmund A Sargus no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James L Graham and Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/23/04. (aq)
November 17, 2004 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs The Unencumbered Assets Trust and Erwin I. Katz, LTD against Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank One, N.A., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC, CSFB USA, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP, The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP, Intercontinental Investment Associates, Healthcare Capital, L.L.C., Flohaz Partners, L.L.C., South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C., Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C., Kachina, Inc., Lance K Poulsen, Barbara L. Poulsen, Donald H Ayers, Rebecca S Parrett, and Task Holdings, LTD. (Filing fee $ 150.00). (Attachments: #1 Complaint - pp 36-92 #2 Complaint 93-149 #3 Complaint 150-196 #4 Complaint 197-240 #5 Complaint 241-293 #6 Complaint 294-349 #7 Exhibit A Part 1 #8 Exhibit A Part 2 #9 Exhibit A Part 3 #10 Exhibit B Part 1 #11 Exhibit B Part 2 #12 Exhibit B Part 3 #13 Exhibit C Part 1 #14 Exhibit C Part 2 #15 Exhibit C Part 3)(dms )
November 17, 2004 Filing fee: $ 150.00, receipt number 200 244155. (dms )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unencumbered Assets Trust et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Robert Colby Allsbrook
Represented By: Jeffrey Q Smith
Represented By: William H O'Brien
Represented By: Jason M. Koral
Represented By: Steven G Brody
Represented By: Susan F DiCicco
Represented By: Mina Audrey Kim
Represented By: William J Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Leslie Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Investment Associates
Represented By: Jennifer Temchine
Represented By: John Edward Haller
Represented By: Thomas J. Fellig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Beacon Group III-Focus Value Fund, LP
Represented By: Rebecca Beata Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flohaz Partners, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Temchine
Represented By: John Edward Haller
Represented By: Thomas J. Fellig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte & Touche, LLP
Represented By: Philip Albert Brown
Represented By: Andrew L Goldman
Represented By: Philip S Beck
Represented By: Allison W Freedman
Represented By: Mark Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Q Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Waterhouse Coopers, LLP
Represented By: Sarah Loomis Cave
Represented By: David Guerrero Liston
Represented By: Derek J.T. Adler
Represented By: William Ruttledge Maguire
Represented By: Tiffany C Miller
Represented By: Matthew J. Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H Ayers
Represented By: Brian Edward Dickerson
Represented By: Sharlene I Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse, New York Branch
Represented By: Jeffrey Q Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC
Represented By: Robert Colby Allsbrook
Represented By: Jeffrey Q Smith
Represented By: William H O'Brien
Represented By: Jason M. Koral
Represented By: Steven G Brody
Represented By: Susan F DiCicco
Represented By: Mina Audrey Kim
Represented By: Sherri Blank Lazear
Represented By: William J Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Leslie Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance K Poulsen
Represented By: Jennifer Temchine
Represented By: John Edward Haller
Represented By: Thomas J. Fellig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank One, N.A.
Represented By: C William Phillips
Represented By: Edward H Rippey
Represented By: Stephen P Anthony
Represented By: David Warren Alexander
Represented By: Mark P Gimbel
Represented By: Gary Rubman
Represented By: James M Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Capital Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Temchine
Represented By: John Edward Haller
Represented By: Thomas J. Fellig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca S Parrett
Represented By: Benjamin Scot Zacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara L. Poulsen
Represented By: Jennifer Temchine
Represented By: John Edward Haller
Represented By: Thomas J. Fellig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kachina, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Temchine
Represented By: John Edward Haller
Represented By: Thomas J. Fellig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Capital, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Temchine
Represented By: John Edward Haller
Represented By: Thomas J. Fellig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: William Chester Wilkinson
Represented By: John M Callagy
Represented By: William A Escobar
Represented By: Nicholas J Panarella
Represented By: Joel A Hankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaye Scholer, LLP
Represented By: Roger John Makley
Represented By: Theodore E Tsekerides
Represented By: David R Singh
Represented By: Seth A Gastwirth
Represented By: Jane G Pollack
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: Kevin F Meade
Represented By: David L Yohai
Represented By: Salvatore A Romanello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purcell & Scott, L.P.A.
Represented By: Matthew B Andelman
Represented By: Matthew L Fornshell
Represented By: Robert M Cary
Represented By: Craig D Singer
Represented By: Katherine G Manghillis
Represented By: John K Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Atlantic Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Temchine
Represented By: John Edward Haller
Represented By: Thomas J. Fellig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Task Holdings, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSFB USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.
Represented By: Robert Colby Allsbrook
Represented By: Jeffrey Q Smith
Represented By: William H O'Brien
Represented By: Jason M. Koral
Represented By: Steven G Brody
Represented By: Susan F DiCicco
Represented By: Mina Audrey Kim
Represented By: William J Schwartz
Represented By: Thomas Leslie Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erwin I. Katz, LTD
Represented By: Brandon T Allen
Represented By: H. Ritchey Hollenbaugh
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Rawlings
Represented By: Sydney Gibbs Ballesteros
Represented By: Jeffry J Cotner
Represented By: Scott Humphries
Represented By: Leon Friedberg
Represented By: Robert J Madden
Represented By: Kathy D Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unencumbered Assets Trust
Represented By: Brandon T Allen
Represented By: H. Ritchey Hollenbaugh
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Rawlings
Represented By: Sydney Gibbs Ballesteros
Represented By: Jeffry J Cotner
Represented By: Scott Humphries
Represented By: Leon Friedberg
Represented By: Robert J Madden
Represented By: Kathy D Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?