AMCO Insurance Company v. Lauren Spencer, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company filed a claim for declaratory relief seeking a determination on Plaintiff's obligations under a commercial general liability policy to cover claims asserted by George Harris against Defendant Lauren Spencer, Inc. for copyright infringement of ornamental jewelry designs.

Plaintiff: AMCO Insurance Company
Defendant: Lauren Spencer, Inc., Shirley Lee, Bowen Lee, Popphie Lee and George Harris
Counter Claimant: Lauren Spencer, Inc., Shirley Lee, Bowen Lee and Popphie Lee
Counter Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Mediator: Robert Kaiser
Case Number: 2:2006cv00472
Filed: June 14, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION AND ORDER. The motion to amend # 38 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 06/16/2009. (sr)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31
ORDER: This case remains stayed pending resolution of case no. 2:04-cv-884 or until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 11/21/2007. (kk2)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Bob Kaiser. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 9/28/07. (sem1, )
August 16, 2007 Filing 29
NOTICE of Hearing: Continued Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2007 @ 01:30 PM in chambers before Norah McCann King. (jm1, )
August 15, 2007 Filing 28
NOTICE by Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company, Defendants Lauren Spencer, Inc., Shirley Lee, Bowen Lee, Popphie Lee of Joint Report Regarding Status of Mediation (Pohlman, William)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27
CONTINUED PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The parties to this action shall consider private mediation & will file a written Status Report of the mediation by 8/15/2007. A continued preliminary pretrial will be held upon the resolution of the pending motions in the underlying case or in four (4) months, whichever is earlier. Consistent with the 14 PPTO & without objection by plaintiff, the claims against defendant Daniel Lee are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 7/26/2007. (er )
July 11, 2007 Filing 26
NOTICE of Hearing: The Continued Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2007 @ 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled. The Continued Preliminary Pretrial Conference is now set for 7/26/2007 @ 03:00 PM in chambers before Norah McCann King. (jm1, )
June 21, 2007 Filing 25
NOTICE of Hearing: Continued Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2007 @ 01:30 PM in chambers before Norah McCann King. (jm1, ) Modified on 6/22/2007 (jm1, ).
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24
ORDER granting 20 Lauren-Spencer Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and denying 21 AMCO's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 6/20/07. (sem1, )
April 2, 2007 Filing 23
RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company. (Thomas, Amy)
February 28, 2007 Filing 21
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/31/2007 (Thomas, Amy)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to File Joint Submission of Undisputed Facts & exhibits manually with the Court. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 2/1/07. (er )
January 31, 2007 Filing 17
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Paper Documents by Defendants George Harris, Lauren Spencer, Inc., Lauren Spencer, Inc., Shirley Lee, Bowen Lee, Daniel Lee, Popphie Lee, Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company, Counter Claimants Lauren Spencer, Inc., Shirley Lee, Bowen Lee, Popphie Lee, Counter Defendant AMCO Insurance Company. (McGinnis, Anna)
November 22, 2006 Filing 16
ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendants Lauren-Spencer, Inc., Shirley Lee, Bowen Lee, and Popphie Lee by Plaintiff and Counter Defendant AMCO Insurance Company. (Thomas, Amy)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15
ORDER: Non-oral hearing on all Motions for Partial Summary Judgment set for 4/6/2007. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 11/21/06. (sem1, )
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Plaintiff will reply to the counterclaim by 11/22/06. Counsel for defendant Lauren Spencer will prepare a proposed set of stipulated facts/record by 11/30/06. The Parties will produce a joint stipulation of facts/record by 1/31/07. Cross-motions for partial summary judgment on the principal coverage issue due by 2/28/07. Memoranda in opposition to those motions will be filed by 3/31/07. The Claims asserted against defendant Daniel Lee will be dismissed effective 11/22/06 unless plaintiff show good cause to the contrary by that date. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 11/20/06. (rew )
November 8, 2006 Filing 13
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants George Harris, Lauren Spencer, Inc., Shirley Lee, Bowen Lee, Popphie Lee, Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company. (Thomas, Amy)
August 14, 2006 Filing 9
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendant George Harris.(King, Michael)
July 27, 2006 Filing 8
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed George Harris waiver sent on 6/14/2006, answer due 8/14/2006. (Thomas, Amy)
June 29, 2006 Filing 7
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Shirley Lee waiver sent on 6/15/2006, answer due 8/14/2006. (Thomas, Amy)
June 14, 2006 Filing 3
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company. (er )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMCO Insurance Company v. Lauren Spencer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy S Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Spencer, Inc.
Represented By: William J Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Lee
Represented By: William J Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowen Lee
Represented By: William J Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popphie Lee
Represented By: William J Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Harris
Represented By: William M Mattes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lauren Spencer, Inc.
Represented By: William J Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shirley Lee
Represented By: William J Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Bowen Lee
Represented By: William J Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Popphie Lee
Represented By: William J Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy S Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Robert Kaiser
Represented By: Robert S Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?