Gorecki v. City of Cambridge et al
Plaintiff: Dale A. Gorecki
Defendant: City of Cambridge, John J. Jones, Richard Wayt, Samuel Williams, Officer Ferguson, Officer Delancy, Officer Milburn, Sgt. Hall and John Doe No 1-4
Case Number: 2:2007cv00420
Filed: May 11, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: GUERNSEY
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 12/15/09. (dh)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER vacating the trial scheduled for 10/26/09. A Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 11/2/2009 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 10/20/09. (dh)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 75 Defendants' Motion in Limine as to Claimed Damages; finding as moot 76 Defendants' Motion in Limine as to Citizen Complaints of Excessive Force; granting 83 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Regard ing Misdemeanor Charges or Conviction; denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Judicial Notice of 18 USC 926C; denying as moot 85 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Any Reference to Charges in the Court of Common Pleas; granting [86 ] Plaintiff's Alternate Motion in Limine to Preclude Any Reference that Plaintiff Pleaded to Charge of Aggravated Menacing; and denying 97 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 10/08/09. (dah)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part Defendants' 34 & 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 9/24/09. (aq1)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE vacating Settlement Conference scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on September 8, 2009. (dh)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE: Settlement Conference rescheduled for 9/8/2009 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 10/8/2009 at 9:00 AM; and Jury Trial rescheduled for 10/19/2009 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/06/09. (dh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorecki v. City of Cambridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale A. Gorecki
Represented By: David G Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cambridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wayt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Delancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Milburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?