Charvat v. Echostar Satellite, LLC
Plaintiff: Philip J Charvat
Defendant: Echostar Satellite, LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv01000
Filed: October 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: John D. Holschuh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: Plaintiff Charvats request to reopen discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 10/31/2014. (sr1)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER. Plaintiff may serve discovery. Scheduling order due 5/28/2014. If parties unable to agree on whether to reopen discovery, counsel will call magistrate judge's office by 5/28/2014 to schedule a telephone conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/6/2014. (Abel, Mark)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Granting 33 Sealed Motion ; Granting Dft's 49 Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plt's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge John D. Holschuh on 12/15/2009. (sln)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 40 , Denying plt's 35 Motion to Strike the affidavit of Blake Van Emst filed by Philip J Charvat. Signed by Judge John D. Holschuh on 9/11/2009. (sln )
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to deny re 35 MOTION to Strike. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time until seven days after the date of entry of this Order within which to file his memorandum contra 33 Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/16/09. (rew ) Modified text on 7/17/2009 (er1 ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charvat v. Echostar Satellite, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip J Charvat
Represented By: John William Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echostar Satellite, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?