Great West Casualty Co. v. Flandrich et al
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Co.
Defendant: Wayne Flandrich and Kevin's Towing
Case Number: 2:2007cv01002
Filed: October 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: UNION
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 00:0000 Cause Code Unknown
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, the parties have 14 days to file the their Dismissal Order dismissing this matter with prejudice. The Court will retain continuing jurisdiction over the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 04/12/2010. (cw)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 67 Motion in Limine; denying 68 Motion in Limine; denying 69 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 04/02/2010. (cw)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/03/2009. (cw)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution of Flandrich's petition for bankruptcy. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 05-06-2009. (cw, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. All claims brought by Great West Casualty Co. are terminated. The only remaining claims pending in this matter are with the Third Party Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/31/3009. (cw, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Algenon L. Marbley on 1/7/2009. (cw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great West Casualty Co. v. Flandrich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Co.
Represented By: James M Wherley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Flandrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin's Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?