International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium v. Degraphenreed et al Featured Case

Plaintiff International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium sued Defendants Miko Degraphenreed, Degrapheinread Information Systems Security Corporation, Google, Incorporated and Yahoo!, Incorporated for trademark infringement, unfair competition, false designation of origin, dilution, and deceptive trade practice, misappropriation and unjust enrichment. Plaintiff alleges that Defendants infringed and violated (ISC2)'s rights to its long-standing and valuable registered mark CISSPĀ®.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium
Defendant: Miko Degraphenreed and Degrapheinread Information Systems Security Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv01195
Filed: November 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2008 Filing 41
RULE 26(f) REPORT of Plaintiff by Plaintiff International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium. (Kimsey, Joshua)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40
ORDER denying 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Norah McCann King on 6/4/2008. (kk2).
June 4, 2008 Filing 39
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2008 @ 03:15 PM in chambers before Norah McCann King. (jm1, )
June 3, 2008 Filing 38
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Defendant Miko Degraphenreed. (kk2)
May 27, 2008 Filing 37
SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium. Last publication date 5/14/08. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit in support of notice of service by publication) (Kimsey, Joshua)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36
ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 35 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Algenon L. Marbley on 3/19/2008. (cw, )
February 11, 2008 Filing 33
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Yahoo!, Inc. by Plaintiff International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium. Responses due by 3/6/2008 (Kimsey, Joshua)
January 30, 2008 Filing 30
Notice of Correction re: # 28 Mail Returned the document was deleted and re filed as Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant Miko Degraphenreed entry # 29. (rew )
January 28, 2008 Filing 27
STIPULATION OF 20-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT YAHOO! INC. TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Defendant Yahoo!, Incorporated. (Michael, Howard)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26
ORDER : Attorney David S. Fleming is directed to register to file electronically within ten (10) days of this Order. Signed by Norah McCann King on 1/24/08 (rew )
January 22, 2008 Filing 25
CERTIFICATE of mailing by clerk. A copy of the summons and complaint was mailed to Miko Degraphenreed by ordinary mail service. (rew )
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23
ORDER granting 22 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Google as a defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 1/11/2008. (er )
January 10, 2008 Filing 22
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google, Inc. by Plaintiff International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium.Responses due by 2/4/2008 (Kimsey, Joshua)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21
ORDER granting # 18 Motion for attorney David S. Fleming to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant Yahoo Incorporated; and granting # 19 Motion for attorney Howard S Michael to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant Yahoo Incorporated. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 1/08/08. (rew )
January 4, 2008 Filing 15
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. A copy of the complaint and summons Mail by certified mail #7003 2260 0000 2527 2390 to Miko Degraphenreed 3502 E. 39th Street Indianapolis, IN 43205. (rew )
December 24, 2007 Filing 14
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Miko Degraphenreed. (er )
December 21, 2007 Filing 13
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plaintiff International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium, Defendant Yahoo!, Incorporated. Yahoo!, Incorporated waiver sent on 11/30/2007, answer due 1/29/2008. (Kimsey, Joshua)
December 18, 2007 Filing 12
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE : Summons, and complaint mailed by certified mail from Clerks office to re Miko Degraphenreed # 7003 2260 0000 2527 2406 # 7 Summons Issued,,# 10 Summons Issued - Miko Degraphenreed # 7003 2260 0000 2527 2390, and # 11 Summons Issued to Miko Degraphenreed # 7003 2260 0000 2527 2413. (rew )
December 3, 2007 Filing 11
Summons Issued as to Miko Degraphenreed. (rew )
November 28, 2007 Filing 9
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Kimsey, Joshua)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8
ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO; Preliminary Injunction is set for 12/19/07 at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/21/07. (sem1, )
November 20, 2007 Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C Sasse Defendant Google, Incorporated (Sasse, Benjamin)
November 16, 2007 Filing 5
CERTIFICATE of Trial Attorney by Craig R Carlson Plaintiff International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium. (er )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium v. Degraphenreed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Information Systems Security Certifications Consortium
Represented By: Joshua A Kimsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miko Degraphenreed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Degrapheinread Information Systems Security Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?