Roush et al v. Stone

Plaintiff: Manning K. Roush
Defendant: Charles Albert Stone
Case Number: 2:2008cv00141
Filed: February 13, 2008
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: MEIGS
Presiding Judge: John D. Holschuh
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. final Pretrial Conference 9/10/10 at 10:00 a.m. Conference prior to trial 10/4/10 at 10:00 a.m. and Trial to commence 10/4/10 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge John D. Holschuh on 8/2/10. (lvw1)
March 3, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference scheduled for 03/08/2011 is vacated. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/03/2011. (dh1)
March 31, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case for administrative purposes only, as parties have reached a tentative settlement which must be approved by the Ohio Court of Common Pleas, Probate Division. If settlement is not approved, this case shall be automatically reopened. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/31/2011. (dh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roush et al v. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manning K. Roush
Represented By: Gail M Zalimeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Albert Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.