Elliott v. Sims et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Elliott
Defendant: Gary Sims and Michael Sheets
Case Number: 2:2008cv01144
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter Judgment dismissing the claims of Plaintiffs Justin Watson and Eric Branham with prejudice for want of prosecution and the claims of Plaintiff Jamie Elliott with prejudice as settled. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/7/2010. (cw)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 5 Motion for Designation as a Class Action; adopting Report and Recommendations re 20 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/18/2009. (cw)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 49 Objection (non motion), Objection (non motion) filed by Gary Sims, Michael Sheets. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/03/2009. (cw)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 34 Defendants' Motion to deny plaintiff status; denying 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike; denying 10 Plaintiff's motion for federal funding; granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting 32 Defendats� 39; Motion for Discovery, granting 31 Defendants' motion for leave to File answer. Defendants' 30 Motion to Stay is GRANTED, and they shall have until 6/15/2009 to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for 11 summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/13/09. (rew ) Modified text on 5/20/2009 (er1 ).
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying re 5 MOTION for Designation as a Class Action Civil Suit filed by Jamie Elliott. Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/17/09. (rew )
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion for leave to join this action as a plaintiff. Branham is ORDERED to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs supported by his affidavit of indigence and the prison cashiers statement of his inmate funds. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 2/04/09. (rew )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Sims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?