Ohio Power Company v. General Hydrogen Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Power Company
Defendant: General Hydrogen Corporation, General Hydrogen of West Virginia Corporation, CGI International Inc, Matrix Metal Products Inc, Western Sales & Testing of Amarillo Inc, Portersville Sales and Testing Inc and John Does
Case Number: 2:2009cv00016
Filed: January 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER: With the agreement of all Parties, this action, including all claims and cross-claims, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions are also dismissed without prejudice. The Court takes no position on the applicability of the doctri nes of collateral estoppel or res judicata, and Defendants may raise these defenses should Plaintiff refile this action. This Order does not apply to the pending settlement of claims between Plaintiff and Defendants General Hydrogen Corp. and General Hydrogen of West Virginia Corp. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 09/08/2011. (dh1)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER amending 183 the Court's Order of 05/26/2011. Given the pending cross-claims, Defendant Western Sales and Testing of Amarillo, Inc. will remain a party to this action absent the granting of a motion to dismiss or the entry of a proper stipulation by the Parties. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/27/2011. (dh1)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 OPINION AND ORDER granting 76 Portersville and Western Sales' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The second and third causes of action are dismissed as to those Defendants unless, within 20 days, Plaintiff seeks leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/28/2011. (dh1)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER withdrawing Matrix's Motions to Dismiss ( 6 and 24 at the request of Defendant, Matrix Metal Products, Inc. Matrix may file a motion for leave to file another motion to dismiss on the basis of abstention and/or convenience within 14 days from the date of this Order. In reference to Plaintiff's request for a default against Matrix, the Clerk is directed to decline to enter default until further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/22/2010. (dh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Power Company v. General Hydrogen Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Power Company
Represented By: Donald Michael Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Hydrogen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Hydrogen of West Virginia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGI International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Metal Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Sales & Testing of Amarillo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portersville Sales and Testing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?