Lewis v. McClatchey et al
Appellant: Sidney T Lewis
Appellee: Larry J. McClatchey and Asst US Trustee (Col)
Case Number: 2:2009cv00944
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 9 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 11 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 06/15/2010. (cw)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE ON Sidney T. Lewis re Staff Notes. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 04/21/2010. (cw)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 04/16/2010. (cw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. McClatchey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sidney T Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Larry J. McClatchey
Represented By: Christy A Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Asst US Trustee (Col)
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?