Williams v. Sadler et al
Plaintiff: Gary L Williams
Defendant: Lisa Sadler, Lewis E Williams and Mark J Wodarcyk
Case Number: 2:2009cv01068
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ROSS
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1985 Conspiracy to Interfere with Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 30 Plaintiff's 03/20/13 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/22/2013. (dh1)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 26 Plaintiff Williams' 07/22/2010 Motion to Correct Clerical Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 09/20/2010. (dh)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 23 Order directing Plaintiff to either pay the filing fee or to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to either pay the filing fee or comply with the requirements of 28 USC § 1915(a)(2). The Court finds that Plaintiff's appeal is frivolous and is not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/12/2010. (dh)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT is entered pursuant to the Order filed 04/14/2010. This case is closed. (dh)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 6 Plaintiff's 12/01/09 Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge Abel's 11/25/09 Deficiency Order. Plaintiff must either pay the Court's $350 filing fee or move to proceed in forma pauperis within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 01/11/2010. (dh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Sadler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J Wodarcyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?