Exel, Inc. v. Southern Refrigerated Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Exel, Inc.
Defendant: Southern Refrigerated Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00994
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 189 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 8/22/2017. (ds)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 OPINION AND ORDER denying 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 5/8/2017. (ds)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 OPINION AND ORDER denying 131 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 1/23/2015. (ds)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 12/5/2014. (ds)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 8/26/2014. (ds)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER in re confidential materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/25/13. (sh1)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order reconsidering and denying in part 6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and denying without prejudice 29 and 30 Motions for Summary Judgment.. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 7/27/12. (ds)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER reconsidering in part ruling 24 on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and denying motion for judgment on the pleadings on the breach of contract claim based on provisions of the MTSA, and directing parties to file supplemental briefs in support of motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 5/25/12. (ds)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and SRT's request for an oral hearing Doc. No. 12 is denied. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 12/15/11. (ds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exel, Inc. v. Southern Refrigerated Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exel, Inc.
Represented By: Kendra Lynn Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Refrigerated Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?