Smith v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Patricia J. Smith
Defendant: United States of America and United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 2:2011cv00616
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ATHENS
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 83 Joint Motion to Substitute Mediation for Settlement Conference. The Court vacates the 10/14/14 deadline for the parties' confidential assessments and vacates the 10/21/14 settlement conference. The parties are directed to file a joint status report to update the Court on progress toward settlement within 2 days of the 10/10/14 mediation. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 09/30/2014. (dh1) Modified text on 9/30/2014 (agm1).
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION AND ORDER granting 53 the United States' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff's claim relating to the VA's medical record and radiology system is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 09/16/2014. (dh1)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER denying 61 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File, Instanter, Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitations; and denying 63 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/28/2014. (dh1)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE: Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2014 at 11:00 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2014 at 9:00 AM; and Jury Trial set for 12/1/2014 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 06/20/2014. (dh1)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration within the parameters discussed during the Court's 6/9/14 telephone conference. The Court vacates the current trial schedule 40 and directs the Clerk to reschedule the trial for 12/1/14. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 06/09/2014. (dh1)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. The government shall file a response to that Motion on or before 05/30/14. A telephone conference on the motion is scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on 06/03/2014. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/28/2014. (dh1)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King for mediation, to be held on 05/12/14 at 10:00 a.m. Before mediation, Plaintiff must make a settlement demand and Defendant must respond. The parties must also submit to Judge King's chambers a confidential settlement position statement. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/06/2014. (dh1)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 01/15/2014. (sr1)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint to add the affidavit of merit and denying as moot 5 the Government's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 10/26/2011. (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia J. Smith
Represented By: Daniel N Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?