Harper v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: James W Harper
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00049
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/26/2014. (dh1)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER rescheduling Final Pretrial Conference to 3/25/2014 at 2:00 PM and rescheduling Jury Trial to 4/7/2014 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/28/2014. (dh1)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 80 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 01/31/2014. (dh1)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION AND ORDER granting 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the issues of negligence per se and causation. Any issues relating to the nature of Plaintiff's injuries and the related damages remain for trial. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 01/13/2014. (dh1)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE: The Court's Order Setting Trial Date 62 is vacated in its entirety. The parties shall adhere to the amended trial schedule: Settlement Conference set for 1/16/2014 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 02/20/14; and Jury Trial set for 3/3/2014 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/20/13. (dh1)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING THE CASE SCHEDULE: Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2013 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2014 at 9:00 AM, and Jury Trial set for 1/13/2014 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/29/2013. (dh1)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER scheduling a telephone status conference for 07/16/13 at 2:00 p.m. to discuss 45 Plaintiff's pending motion for Leave to file its proposed Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/11/2013. (dh1)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/30/2013 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2013 at 9:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 9/9/2013 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/27/2012. (Attachment: FPTO Form) (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Harper
Represented By: Robert Bruce Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?