Landrum v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Lawrence Landrum
Respondent: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2012cv00859
Filed: September 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ROSS
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 48 . It is ORDERED that the Petition be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Petitioner is DENIED any requested certificate of appealability and the Court certifies to the United States Court of Appeals that an appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 3-2-2017. (de)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealabili ty and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 2/15/2017. (kpf)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PETITIONERS OBJECTIONS (DOCS. 27 , 34 ); ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; TRANSFER ORDER (DOC. 24 ) AND SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION ON RECOMMITTAL (DOC. 32 ); AND TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SIXTH CIRCUIT FOR DETERMINATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3) WHETHER IT MAY PROCEED. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2/16/16. (pb)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION ON RECOMMITTAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 12/16/2015. (kpf)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; TRANSFER ORDER - The recommendation in the Report that the Petition be dismissed without prejudice is WITHDRAWN. It is respectfully recommended that no decision be rendered on the cognizability issue pending a decision by the Sixth Circuit on whether this case may proceed. Transfer to the Sixth Circuit is STAYED until Judge Rose has decided any objections which may be filed to this Report and Order or until the time for such objections has expired, whichever is later. Objections to R&R due by 11/16/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 10/28/2015. (kpf)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition be dismissed without prejudice for failure to plead a claim cognizable in habeas corpus with sufficient clarity to distinguish it from the claims Landrum has made in In re Ohio Lethal Injection Protocol Litig. Landrum is granted leave to move to file an amended petition not later than September 15, 2015. Should Landrum move to amend, he must restate his position on why this would not be a second or successive petition. This Court has previously allowed new lethal injection habeas petitions to avoid the second or successive bar on the basis that they were raising new claims which could not previously have been pled, based on the adoption of new lethal injection pro tocols by the State. But the Court questions whether that rationale can support a habeas claim that any lethal injection execution would be unconstitutional since lethal injection has been an available method of execution in Ohio since before Landrum filed his initial Petition and became the exclusive method while his Petition was pending. Objections to R&R due by 9/21/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/2/2015. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landrum v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence Landrum
Represented By: Randall Lee Porter
Represented By: Gerald William Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Represented By: Charles L Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?