Brown v. Mohr et al
Plaintiff: Steven S. Brown
Defendant: Director Mohr, Austin Stout, Greg Trout, Trevor Clark, Dr. Krisner, Warden Jeffries, Nurse Smith, Ryan Dolan, Ed Voorhies, Insp. Whitten, DW Upchurch, Ward, Mr. Seacrest, Yates, Gary Croft, Mr Heiss and Ron Eleby
Case Number: 2:2013cv00006
Filed: August 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: LUCAS
Presiding Judge: Peter C Economus
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 DECISION AND ORDER- For these reasons, and for the reasons stated in the Courts previous Order (Doc. # 274 ), Plaintiff is not entitled to a 30-day extension. He shall file his response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by July 16, 2019. No f urther extension will be permitted. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT:Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Summary Judgment (Doc. # 280 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 7/2/19. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 DECISION AND ENTRY - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Or Summary Judgment (Doc. # 266 ) is DENIED; 2. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment (Doc. # 275 ) is DENIED; and 3. Plaintiffs Motion To Expand Time To Respond To Defendants Summary Judgment (Doc. # 276 ) is GRANTED, in part, and Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by June 17, 2019; Plaintiffs Motion To Expand Time To Respond To Def endants Summary Judgment (Doc. # 276 ) is DENIED in remaining part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 6/3/19. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER denying 269 Plaintiff's Motion For An Order Of Protection and Motion For An Order To The Defendants To Send Their Motion For Summary Judgment By Certified Mail is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 5-6-19. (slo1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER - GRANTING, in part, Plaintiff's 247 MOTION for Protective Order to the extent that his present deposition is continued and rescheduled to occur on 12/7/2018. The deadline to complete Discovery is due 12/7/2018; Plaintiff's 247 MOTION for Protective Order is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11/19/18. (rp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER denying 237 Motion to Compel; adopting and affirming 238 Report and Recommendations.; denying 231 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 231 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 11/7/18. (sh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 231 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED. ORDER that 237 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Motion for Appointment of Counsel are DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 10-19-18. (mcm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 224 in that Plaintiffs Emergency Motion 223 is hereby DENIED. For the same reasons as set forth in the Report and Recommendation and this Order, Plaintiffs Additional Motion in Support of Request for an Injunction and RestrainingOrder 225 is also DENIED. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 6/15/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's 223 Emergency Motion/Addendum to Motion for Protection and for a Preliminary Injunction be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/23/2018. (kpt)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 217 in that Plaintiffs request for issuance of a preliminary injunction is hereby DENIED and Plaintiffs requests for appointment of counsel and issuance of a subpoena are DENIED. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 1/19/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in that it is RECOMMENDED that 211 Plaintiff's Request for Injunctive Relief be DENIED. Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel and for the Issuance of a Subpoena are DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/8/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER that the Order 202 denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 11/6/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 198 Motion to Compel. Any party may, within fourteen days after this Order is filed, file and serve on the opposing party a motion for reconsideration by a District Judge. Responses to objections are due fourteen days after objectio ns are filed and replies by the objecting party are due seven days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 6/30/2017. (kdp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 177 in that 173 Defendant Mohr's Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part and 161 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Insp. Whitten, Mr. Seacrest, Mr H eiss, Warden Jeffries, Dr. Krisner, DW Upchurch and Ryan Dolan is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 1/13/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER - It is RECOMMENDED that 161 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and 173 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Failure of Service both be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Object ions to R&R due by 9/26/2016. Further, 159 MOTION Seeking an Order to Reserve Defendants Stout and Trout is GRANTED, 155 MOTION to Reserve Defendants is DENIED AS MOOT, 158 MOTION to Amend/Correct is GRANTED, 160 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is DENIED, 156 MOTION for an Order to Serve Nurse Smith is GRANTED, 174 MOTION for Extension of Time is DENIED AS MOOT, 162 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 9/9/2016. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER adopting 139 Report and Recommendations & denying 135 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 2/2/2016. (kk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification [Steven S Brown, 411-609 @ Ohio State Penitentiary, 878 Coitsville-Hubbard Rd, Youngstown OH 44505])
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and ORDER - it is RECOMMENDED that 135 MOTION to Dismiss be DENIED. Further, 124 MOTION for Extension of Time is DENIED as MOOT; 126 MOTION For Status and To Correct The Record is DENIED as MOOT; 127 MOTION to "unstrike" the Amended Complaint is DENIED; and 128 MOTION to serve third amended complaint is GRANTED. Objections to R&R and ORDER due within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 12/17/2015. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 106 Motion for Contempt; denying 107 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 9/23/2015. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 OPINION AND ORDER denying 96 Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Peter C. Economus on 5/13/2015. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 117 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 3/31/2015. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER finding as moot 72 Motion ; finding as moot 73 Motion ; denying 78 Motion ; denying 79 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 82 Motion for Order to; denying 90 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 94 Motion to Stay; finding as moo t 94 Motion ; finding as moot 95 Motion ; denying 102 Motion ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 109 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Senior Judge Peter C. Economus on 3/11/2015. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (CORRECTED ORDER - CASE STILL OPEN0 Modified on 3/11/2015 (ds).
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 47 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 97 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Peter C. Economus on 2/25/2015. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 64 MOTION for Order as supplemented by 72 ADDENDUM and 73 Further Proof of Retaliation be denied as moot. It is further recommended that 78 MOTION for Default, 79 MOTION to Dismiss, 90 MOTION for Sanct ions, and Motions to Supplement (Docs 95 and 102 ) be denied and that 94 MOTION to Stay be denied as moot. Finally, the court recommends that the Court decline to consider 82 MOTION for Order. Objections due within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 2/23/2015. (agm1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 56 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot 61 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 62 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 65 Motion to lift requested stay ; denying as moot 65 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot 69 Motion to supplement amended complaint ; denying 75 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/6/2014. (agm1)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Further, 38 MOTION for Extension of Time & 41 MOTION Requesting Re-Service of Some Defendants are granted. Finally, 34 MOTION to Dismiss Lt. Yates, 35 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis & 44 MOTION for More Definite Statement are moot. Defendants are directed to provide the USMS w/the last known addresses for defendants Dolan, Smith & Eleby w/in 14 days of the date of this Order. Mr. Brown shall submit a service copy of the complaint, completed summons & a USM-285 for defendants Stout, Trout, Clark, Mohr, Dolan, Eleby, Voorhies & Smith w/in 14 days of the date of this order. Objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 4/29/2014. (kk2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Mohr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Krisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Voorhies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insp. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DW Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Seacrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Heiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Eleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?