Crozier v. Food Concepts International, LP et al
Plaintiff: Teddy Crozier
Defendant: Food Concepts International, LP, Abuelo's International LP, Mark Myers, Darren DelVecchio and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2013cv00125
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING with modifications Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees that was filed in 2:13CV124, Miller v. Food Concepts Case (Doc. 191). Plaintiffs are awarded $420,102.38 in fees and $51,263.40 in costs. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/13/2017. (cw)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants DelVecchio and Myers are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/29/2017. (cw)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING [Doc. 125] Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' opinion witenss Stephen C. Oberhousen in Case No. 2: 13CV0124. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/13/2016. (cw)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 37 Report and Recommendations.; denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/18/2014. (cw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crozier v. Food Concepts International, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Crozier
Represented By: Wesley Trenton Fortune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Concepts International, LP
Represented By: Ryan W Green
Represented By: Faith Clair Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abuelo's International LP
Represented By: Ryan W Green
Represented By: Faith Clair Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Myers
Represented By: Ryan W Green
Represented By: Faith Clair Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren DelVecchio
Represented By: Ryan W Green
Represented By: Faith Clair Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?