Baily v. Commissioner Social Security
Plaintiff: James C. Baily
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv00344
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:425 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting Report and Recommendations re 29 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff is AWARDED an attorney fee under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412, in the total amount of $3,243.75, plus $12.00 in expenses, for a total award of $3,255.75. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/6/2015. (cw)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, Doc. No. 28 , be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 10/27/2014. (pes1)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, REVERSING the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security, this action is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further consideration of Listing 12.05C. The Clerk is directed to enter Final Judgment pursuant to Sentence 4 of U.S.C. §405 (g). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/30/2014. (cw)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint filed by James C. Baily. It is RECOMMENDED that the decision of the Commissioner be REVERSED and this action be REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security. Objections to R&R due by 1/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/26/2013. (pes1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baily v. Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Baily
Represented By: Gregory R Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?