The W.W. Williams Company v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: The W.W. Williams Company
Defendant: Google, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2013cv00713
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff The W.W. Williams Company (True, Mary)
August 23, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff The W.W. Williams Company (True, Mary)
August 23, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff The W.W. Williams Company (True, Mary)
July 24, 2013 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Order to Modify Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Correspondence from Ms. Herlihy to Mr. Dreitler and Ms. True, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- Declaration of David Lopez, # 3 Exhibit 3 -- Email thread from Dreitler True LLC to Ms. Herlihy) (Rubin, Kenneth)
July 23, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing - Status Conference set for 7/24/2013 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk1)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 3 Motion for TRO. This Order will expire fourteen days from the date of entry unless Google consents to a longer extension or the Court extends it for a like period of time for good cause. The parties should contact the Court with proposed times for a preliminary injunction hearing.Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/22/2013. (ddo1)
July 22, 2013 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (er1)
July 22, 2013 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The W.W. Williams Company. (True, Mary)
July 19, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Informal Hearing regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 7/19/2013. (Court Reporter Laura Samuels) (jk1)
July 19, 2013 Cash BOND in the amount of $10.00 posted. (receipt no 200COL028390). (er1)
July 19, 2013 Filing fee for cv action: $ 400, receipt number 200COL028387. (er1)
July 19, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiff The W.W. Williams Company. (er1)
July 19, 2013 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Janet D. Gibson by Plaintiff The W.W. Williams Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-G) (er1)
July 19, 2013 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff The W.W. Williams Company. (er1)
July 19, 2013 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by The W.W. Williams Company against Google, Inc. and John Does 1-10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-E, # 3 Exhibit F-J) (er1)
July 19, 2013 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet. (er1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The W.W. Williams Company v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The W.W. Williams Company
Represented By: Joseph Richard Dreitler
Represented By: Mary R True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth J Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?