Rutherlan Enterprises v. Zettler Hardware et al
Plaintiff: Rutherlan Enterprises
Defendant: Zettler Hardware, Nicholas Zettler, Substruct Systems, Luke A. Stratton, Alexander L. Rouse, Peter Michailidis, Does 1-10 and ABC Corps. 1-10
Case Number: 2:2014cv00019
Filed: January 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying 99 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/24/2019. (cw)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court denies Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees but Grants Defendants' Request for Taxation of Costs in the amount of $1071.10. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on December 28, 2017. (jlk)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment against Plaintiff. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/26/2016. (cw)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 8/3/15. (kn)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Default Judgment against Substruct. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 7/1/15. (kn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - re 55 Motion for Sanctions filed by Zettler Hardware, Alexander L. Rouse, Peter Michailidis, Luke A. Stratton, Nicholas Zettler, Non oral hearing on Motion set for 7/24/2015 08:00 AM before Judge Gregory L. Frost. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 6/5/15. (kn)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 11/14/14. (kn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutherlan Enterprises v. Zettler Hardware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rutherlan Enterprises
Represented By: Joseph Abraham Bahgat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zettler Hardware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Zettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substruct Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke A. Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander L. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Michailidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corps. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?