Pullen v. Howard et al
Plaintiff: Terry Tyrone Pullen, Jr
Defendant: Lisa Howard, Fultz, Church and Richard
Case Number: 2:2014cv00104
Filed: January 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: PICKAWAY
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 100 the Magistrate Judge's 09/13/16 Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Genuine issues of fact preclude summary judgment with regard to Plaintiff's excessive force claim against Escorting Officers Gleason, Harris and Newsome that is premised upon his allegations in Paragraph 30 of his Amended Complaint 11 . Summary Judgment is granted in favor of Defendants on all of Plaintiff's remaining claims. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 01/03/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 92 AMENDED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Fultz, Church, Newsome, Gleason, Anthony Russell, Klinton Hill, Nathan A. Harris, David L. Rispress, Crystal Murphy and Lisa Howard in that it is RECOMMENDED that the motion be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Plaintiff's Motions to Compel 76 81 are DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/13/16. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER adopting 64 the Magistrate Judge's 12/17/15 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint 44 is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/14/2016. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is RECOMMENDED that the 44 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint be DENIED - objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/17/2015. (sr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Terry Tyrone Pullen, Jr. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/13/2015. (mas1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION and ORDER denying 14 Motion to Stay; denying 22 Motion to Stay.Defendants are ORDERED to answer or otherwise plead WITHIN FOURTEEN (14)DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/12/2015. (mas1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullen v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Tyrone Pullen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?