Rodgers v. State of Ohio et al

Plaintiff: Otis Lee Rodgers
Defendant: State Of Ohio, Ohio Parole Board, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Sara Andrew and Stu Sherman
Case Number: 2:2014cv00453
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 Amended Complaint filed by Otis Lee Rodgers. It is recommended that Plaintiff's claim for damages under 42:1983 be DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim for relief. It is further recommended that if Plaintiff decides pursues a habeas corpus claim he must file a petition. Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/21/14. (sem1)
June 24, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 6/24/14. (kn)
December 10, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 54 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Habeas Petition. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Respondents' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and that this action be DISMISSED. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Requ est Documents, ECF 43 , Motion for an Order directing the seizure of necessary documents, ECF 48 , Motion for Ancillary Order and Renewed Motion for Ancillary Order, ECF 52 , 60 , Motion for Counsel and Discovery, ECF 57 , Motion for Appointmen t of Investigator, ECF 61 , Motion to Strike, ECF 71 , and Motion for Telephonic Hearing, ECF 72 , and Respondent's Motion to Strike Petitioner's Motion for the Appointment of an Investigator, ECF 66 , are DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/10/2014. (pes1) (This document has been sent by the Clerks Office by regular and certified mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. 7009 2820 0003 5796 5250)
January 15, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 54 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Sara Andrew, Ohio Parole Board, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, State Of Ohio, 81 Motion for Leave to File filed by Otis Lee Rodgers, 77 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Otis Lee Rodgers, 73 Report and Recommendations, 82 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Otis Lee Rodgers, 84 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Otis Lee Rodgers. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 1/15/15. (kn)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 30, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion to Strike. The Court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 1/30/15. (kn)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. State of Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Lee Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.