Swanson v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Swanson
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories and Abbvie Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01052
Filed: July 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 OPINION AND ORDER granting 88 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 76 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. The pending Daubert motions 74 , 75 , 84 , 85 , 86 , 87 are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Defendants and close this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/28/2017. (dh1)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 , 60 Motions to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 29, 2017. (jlk)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/05/2014. (sr1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Swanson
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Represented By: Melanie Sue Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?