Ogle v. Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Petitioner: Melanie A. Ogle
Respondent: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Case Number: 2:2015cv00776
Filed: March 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER adopting and affirming 89 the Magistrate Judge's 03/10/17 Report and Recommendation and 99 the Magistrate Judge's 05/01/17 Supplemental Report and Recommendation on Petitioner's Objections. Petitioner's Obje ctions to the Report and Recommendation and Supplemental Report and Recommendation 91 100 are overruled. This action is hereby dismissed. The Court certifies that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and that Petitioner therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 05/31/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Having reconsidered the case in light of the Objections, the Magistrate Judge again respectfully recommends that the Petition be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 5/1/2o017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CORRECT THE RECORD WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Petitioner's Motion to Correct the Record 93 is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal not later than April 17, 2017, if supported by an affidavit of Petitioner stating in as muc h detail as she can recall (1) the nature and extent of the car trouble and (2) the content of the conversation with Chief Judge Sargus' chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 4/5/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is recommended that Ogle's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealabili ty and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 3/10/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO HOLD IN ABEYANCE re 76 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 09/06/16. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION ON MOTIONS FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND TO EXPAND THE RECORD - Because Petitioner has not tendered new evidence of the quality required by Schlup, supra, it is inappropriate to grant her an evidentiary hearing or expansion of the record to allow the evidence she has tendered. Her Objections to the Decision and Order should be OVERRULED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 4/14/2016. (kpf)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION FOR STAY OF SENTENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 8/1/2015. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY 8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 5/4/2015. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogle v. Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melanie A. Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Represented By: William H Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?