Wilson et al v. All Phase Masonry and Construction LLC
Plaintiff: Carol A. Wilson and Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Plan, Ohio Operating Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Education & Safety Fund
Defendant: All Phase Masonry and Construction LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv02760
Filed: August 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; GRANTING 8 Motion for Default Judgment. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/12/2017. (cw)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS granting 40 Motion for Default Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 11/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/13/2017. (ew)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Contempt. Defendant is hereby HELD IN CONTEMPT and ORDERED to pay a fine of $100.00 per day until it complies with the order. Defendant is further ORDERED to pay all attorneys fees and costs reasonably expended by Plaintiffs in connection with the contempt proceedings. Also, Adopting Report and Recommendations re 17 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/21/2016. (cw)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 11 Motion for Contempt filed by Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Plan, Ohio Operating Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Ohio Operating Engineer s Education & Safety Fund, Carol A. Wilson in that it is RECOMMENDED that the defendant be held in contempt and that a fine of $100.00 per day be imposed on Defendant until it complies with the 3/14/16 Order. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 8/25/16. (sem)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. All Phase Masonry and Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Wilson
Represented By: Bryan Charles Barch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Plan, Ohio Operating Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Education & Safety Fund
Represented By: Bryan Charles Barch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Phase Masonry and Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?