December 4, 2017 |
Filing
80
OPINION and ORDER denying 67 Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion; granting 70 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 75 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting and affirming 76 the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/4/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
September 13, 2017 |
Filing
76
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS denying 67 Dispositive Motion, granting 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment, denying as moot 75 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Objections to R&R due by 9/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/13/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
July 24, 2017 |
Filing
74
OPINION and ORDER adopting 65 the Report and Recommendation and denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/24/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 31, 2017 |
Filing
65
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER - It is RECOMMENDED that 57 MOTION Requesting Leave To Supplement The Complaint, Pursuant To FRCP 15(E), And To Demand Judgment For Defendants Default Pursuant To FRCP 54(c) And 55, In Reference To Defendants A ttempt To Commit Fraud Upon the Court be DENIED AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2017. The following motions are DENIED AS MOOT: 58 MOTION for Leave to File (Supplement) Discovery and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Doc. 57, 62 MOTION of Judicial Inquiry for Possible Outstanding Motions, and 63 MOTION of Judicial Inquiry for Possible Outstanding Motions re 57 & 58. Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 60 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/31/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 29, 2017 |
Filing
64
OPINION and ORDER adopting and affirming 52 the Report and Recommendation; denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; granting 54 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/29/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
October 14, 2016 |
Filing
52
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court RECOMMENDS that the Motion for Default Judgment for Failing to Obey a Discovery Order be DENIED. (Doc. 50 ). The Motion to Compel (Doc. 42 ) and Motion of Judicial Inquiry (Doc. 51 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/16/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing
37
OPINION and ORDER adopting 34 the Report and Recommendation; denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/17/16. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 5, 2016 |
Filing
34
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Perrin Burse. It is RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Objections to R&R due by 5/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/5/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 4, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER withdrawing 20 Report and Recommendations. Defendants may have until 3/25/2016 to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/4/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 17, 2016 |
Filing
20
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Perrin Burse. It is RECOMMENDED that the Motion be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/17/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 9, 2016 |
Filing
19
ORDER adopting 14 the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/9/16. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
14
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint, filed by Burse Investment Management Group, Inc., Burse Fund I, Perrin Burse. The action may proceed on plaintiff Perrin Burse's claim of denial of access to the courts, and retalia tion in violation of the First Amendment to the United States Constitution. It is RECOMMENDED that the claims asserted on behalf ofplaintiffs Burse Investment Management Group, Inc., and Burse Fund I be dismissed, that the claim against defendant &qu ot;Post Master General U.S. Postal Service" be dismissed, and that all state law claims be dismissed without prejudice to renewal should the Ohio Court of Claims determine that the state employees are not entitled to immunity under O.R.C. § 9.86. Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 1/15/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing
2
ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit to the Court, within 30 days, a certified account from the prison cashier which indicates both the average monthly balance in his account for the last six months and the amount of income credited to his account during those months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 11/16/2015. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|