Kendell et al v. Phoenix Home Health Care Services Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Kellee Kendell and Home Health Care Resources LLC
Defendant: Phoenix Home Health Care Services Ltd. and Lilly Peng
Case Number: 2:2015cv03009
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 97 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/12/17. (jlk)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER finding as moot 34 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 53 Motion to Dismiss; denying 71 Motion for Contempt; granting 84 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/29/17. (ew)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 28 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 30 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/7/2016. (mas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendell et al v. Phoenix Home Health Care Services Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellee Kendell
Represented By: Joseph Semmer Tann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Health Care Resources LLC
Represented By: Joseph Semmer Tann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Home Health Care Services Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilly Peng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?